WARNER CHILCOTT SALES (US), LLC et al v. JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Michael A Shipp |
Referred: | Douglas E Arpert |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-08155 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 15:1 Antitrust Litigation |
Case Filed: | Apr 20, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 22, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 17, 2018 4:42 AM EDT |
Defendant
JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
WARNER CHILCOTT (US), LLC
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
WARNER CHILCOTT COMPANY, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
WARNER CHILCOTT CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
WARNER CHILCOTT HOLDINGS COMPANY III, LTD.
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
WARNER CHILCOTT LABORATORIES IRELAND LIMITED
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
WARNER CHILCOTT PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
WARNER CHILCOTT SALES (US), LLC
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
WATSON LABORATORIES, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, June 26, 2018 | ||
qc
QC - Incorrect Document Attached
Tue 06/26 9:03 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please review the document attached to docket entry23 submitted by Ingrid Johnson on 6/25/2018. If this document was attached in error, PLEASE RESUBMIT THE CORRECT DOCUMENT with the email address of the pro hac vice attorney. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mmh) |
||
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
Mon 06/25 2:38 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Joanne C. Lewers to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8837623.) (JOHNSON, INGRID) |
|
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fee Received
Mon 06/25 8:53 AM
Pro Hac Vice fee received for Angela D. Daker. Esq.: $150, receipt number TRE092821 (mmh) |
||
Friday, June 22, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Compel Order on Motion to Quash Order on Motion to Transfer Case
Fri 06/22 2:03 PM
ORDER DENYING the Motion to Transfer (ECF No.7 ), GRANTING the Motion to Enforce (ECF No.2 ), and DENYING the Cross-Motion to Quash (ECF No.3 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 6/22/2018. (mmh) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Fri 06/22 2:09 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (mmh) |
||
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Transcript
Mon 06/25 10:14 AM
Transcript of MOTION TO COMPEL/MOTION TO ENFORCE SUBPOENAS, CROSS MOTION TO QUASH/COMPEL/ENFORCE PETITIONERS' DEPOSITION SUBPOENA, etc held on 6/15/2018, before Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Transcriber - Transcripts Plus, Inc. (215-862-1115). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 7/11/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/23/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/18/2018. (kas, ) |
|
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Seal
Fri 06/15 2:09 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 6/15/2018. (km) |
|
19 | 19
minutes
Motion Hearing
Fri 06/15 1:11 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Motion Hearing held on 6/15/2018 re2 MOTION to Compel /Motion to Enforce Subpoenas filed by WARNER CHILCOTT CORPORATION, WARNER CHILCOTT (US), LLC, WATSON LABORATORIES, INC., WARNER CHILCOTT HOLDINGS COMPANY III, LTD., WARNER CHILCOTT PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY, WARNER CHILCOTT COMPANY, LLC, WARNER CHILCOTT LABORATORIES IRELAND LIMITED, WARNER CHILCOTT SALES (US), LLC,7 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the District of Rhode Island / Motion to Transfer Petitioners/Defendants' Motion to Enforce Subpoenas to the United States District Court for the District of Rhode Island and Sup filed by WARNER CHILCOTT CORPORATION, WARNER CHILCOTT (US), LLC, WATSON LABORATORIES, INC., WARNER CHILCOTT HOLDINGS COMPANY III, LTD., WARNER CHILCOTT PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY, WARNER CHILCOTT COMPANY, LLC, WARNER CHILCOTT LABORATORIES IRELAND LIMITED, WARNER CHILCOTT SALES (US), LLC, 3 Cross MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Petitioners' Deposition Subpoena filed by JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. Ordered motion 2 - GRANTED. Ordered motion 3 DENIED. Ordered motion 7 - DENIED. Order to be submitted by counsel for Petitioners. (digitally recorded.) (ce3) |
|
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 06/13 2:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by VINCENT E. GENTILE on behalf of JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC(GENTILE, VINCENT) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 06/11 4:03 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Angela D. Daker, Esq. and Joanne C. Lewers, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 6/11/2018. (mmh) |
|
Thursday, June 07, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 06/07 1:27 PM
NOTICE by WARNER CHILCOTT (US), LLC, WARNER CHILCOTT COMPANY, LLC, WARNER CHILCOTT CORPORATION, WARNER CHILCOTT HOLDINGS COMPANY III, LTD., WARNER CHILCOTT LABORATORIES IRELAND LIMITED, WARNER CHILCOTT PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY, WARNER CHILCOTT SALES (US), LLC, WATSON LABORATORIES, INC. re2 MOTION to Compel /Motion to Enforce Subpoenas ,7 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the District of Rhode Island / Motion to Transfer Petitioners/Defendants' Motion to Enforce Subpoenas to the United States District Court for the District of Rhode Island and Sup /Notice of Supplemental Authority (GALLAGHER, MICHAEL) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
15 | 15
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 06/07 11:55 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by WARNER CHILCOTT (US), LLC, WARNER CHILCOTT COMPANY, LLC, WARNER CHILCOTT CORPORATION, WARNER CHILCOTT HOLDINGS COMPANY III, LTD., WARNER CHILCOTT LABORATORIES IRELAND LIMITED, WARNER CHILCOTT PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY, WARNER CHILCOTT SALES (US), LLC, WATSON LABORATORIES, INC..(GALLAGHER, MICHAEL) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of Angela D. Daker in Support of the Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, | ||
Att: 2 Certification of Joanne C. Lewers in Support of the Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 06/07 2:35 PM
Set Deadlines as to15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion set for 7/2/2018 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh) |
||
Monday, June 04, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Letter
Mon 06/04 1:34 PM
Letter from Michael Gallagher in response to Respondent Janssen's May 30, 2018, letter re13 Letter. (GALLAGHER, MICHAEL) |
|
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Letter
Wed 05/30 6:11 PM
Letter from Ingrid D. Johnson Requesting Court to Strike Respondents' Reply Brief. (JOHNSON, INGRID) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order
Wed 05/30 2:21 PM
TEXT ORDER - ORAL ARGUMENT re:2 MOTION to Compel/Motion to Enforce Subpoenas;3 Cross MOTION to Quash Petitioners' Deposition Subpoena; and7 MOTION to Transfer will be held on June 15, 2018 at 10:45AM in Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 05/30/2018. (jlb) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 05/30 9:07 AM
Set Deadlines as to11 Joint MOTION to Seal . Motion set for 7/2/2018 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh) |
||
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Seal
Tue 05/29 8:49 PM
Joint MOTION to Seal by WARNER CHILCOTT (US), LLC, WARNER CHILCOTT COMPANY, LLC, WARNER CHILCOTT CORPORATION, WARNER CHILCOTT HOLDINGS COMPANY III, LTD., WARNER CHILCOTT LABORATORIES IRELAND LIMITED, WARNER CHILCOTT PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY, WARNER CHILCOTT SALES (US), LLC, WATSON LABORATORIES, INC..(GALLAGHER, MICHAEL) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Angela D. Daker in Support, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
10 | 10
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 05/29 5:59 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by WARNER CHILCOTT (US), LLC, WARNER CHILCOTT COMPANY, LLC, WARNER CHILCOTT CORPORATION, WARNER CHILCOTT HOLDINGS COMPANY III, LTD., WARNER CHILCOTT LABORATORIES IRELAND LIMITED, WARNER CHILCOTT PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY, WARNER CHILCOTT SALES (US), LLC, WATSON LABORATORIES, INC. re7 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the District of Rhode Island / Motion to Transfer Petitioners/Defendants' Motion to Enforce Subpoenas to the United States District Court for the District of Rhode Island and Sup /Petitioners' Reply in Support (GALLAGHER, MICHAEL) |
|
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
12
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition of Motion
Mon 05/21 6:31 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC re7 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the District of Rhode Island / Motion to Transfer Petitioners/Defendants' Motion to Enforce Subpoenas to the United States District Court for the District of Rhode Island and Sup (JOHNSON, INGRID) |
|
Monday, May 14, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 05/14 8:57 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re2 MOTION to Compel /Motion to Enforce Subpoenas ,3 Cross MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Petitioners' Deposition Subpoena (GALLAGHER, MICHAEL) |
|
Thursday, May 10, 2018 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 05/10 8:24 AM
Set Deadlines as to7 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the District of Rhode Island / Motion to Transfer Petitioners/Defendants' Motion to Enforce Subpoenas to the United States District Court for the District of Rhode Island and Sup. Motion set for 6/4/2018 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh) |
||
Wednesday, May 09, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Transfer Case
Wed 05/09 8:47 PM
MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the District of Rhode Island / Motion to Transfer Petitioners/Defendants' Motion to Enforce Subpoenas to the United States District Court for the District of Rhode Island and Supporting Memorandum of Law (in re: 2 MOTION) by WARNER CHILCOTT (US), LLC, WARNER CHILCOTT COMPANY, LLC, WARNER CHILCOTT CORPORATION, WARNER CHILCOTT HOLDINGS COMPANY III, LTD., WARNER CHILCOTT LABORATORIES IRELAND LIMITED, WARNER CHILCOTT PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY, WARNER CHILCOTT SALES (US), LLC, WATSON LABORATORIES, INC..(GALLAGHER, MICHAEL) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Tue 05/08 7:33 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support filed by WARNER CHILCOTT (US), LLC, WARNER CHILCOTT COMPANY, LLC, WARNER CHILCOTT CORPORATION, WARNER CHILCOTT HOLDINGS COMPANY III, LTD., WARNER CHILCOTT LABORATORIES IRELAND LIMITED, WARNER CHILCOTT PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY, WARNER CHILCOTT SALES (US), LLC, WATSON LABORATORIES, INC. re2 MOTION to Compel /Motion to Enforce Subpoenas [Unredacted Versions](GALLAGHER, MICHAEL) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A to the Memorandum of Law in Support | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 05/08 8:41 AM
Set Deadlines as to3 Cross MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Petitioners' Deposition Subpoena . Motion set for 5/21/2018 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 05/08 11:00 AM
Reset Deadlines as to3 Cross MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Petitioners' Deposition Subpoena . Motion reset for 5/21/2018 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh) |
||
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
respm
Memorandum in Opposition of Motion
Mon 05/07 8:28 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC re2 MOTION to Compel /Motion to Enforce Subpoenas and in Support of Cross-Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena (Unredacted)(JOHNSON, INGRID) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of Joanne C. Lewers in Support of Opposition to Motion to Compel Deposition Testimony and in Support of Cross-Motion to Quash, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Certification of Joanne C. Lewers, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Certification of Joanne C. Lewers, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C to Certification of Joanne C. Lewers, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D to Certification of Joanne C. Lewers, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E to Certification of Joanne C. Lewers, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F to Certification of Joanne C. Lewers, | ||
Att: 8 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
4 | 4
12
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition of Motion
Mon 05/07 8:20 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC re2 MOTION to Compel /Motion to Enforce Subpoenas and in Support of Cross-Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena(JOHNSON, INGRID) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of Joanne C. Lewers in Support of Opposition to Motion to Compel Deposition Testimony and in Support of Cross-Motion to Quash, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Certification of Joanne C. Lewers, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Certification of Joanne C. Lewers, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C to Certification of Joanne C. Lewers, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D to Certification of Joanne C. Lewers, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E to Certification of Joanne C. Lewers, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F to Certification of Joanne C. Lewers, | ||
Att: 8 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
3 | 3
motion
Motion to Quash/Compel/Enforce
Mon 05/07 8:08 PM
Cross MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Petitioners' Deposition Subpoena by JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.(JOHNSON, INGRID) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 05/07 2:49 PM
Reset Deadlines as to2 MOTION to Compel /Motion to Enforce Subpoenas . Motion re-set for 5/21/2018 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (gxh) |
||
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 04/27 2:57 PM
Set Deadlines as to2 MOTION to Compel /Motion to Enforce Subpoenas . Motion set for 5/21/2018 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem) |
||
Friday, April 20, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Compel
Fri 04/20 7:11 PM
MOTION to Compel /Motion to Enforce Subpoenas by WARNER CHILCOTT (US), LLC, WARNER CHILCOTT COMPANY, LLC, WARNER CHILCOTT CORPORATION, WARNER CHILCOTT HOLDINGS COMPANY III, LTD., WARNER CHILCOTT LABORATORIES IRELAND LIMITED, WARNER CHILCOTT PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY, WARNER CHILCOTT SALES (US), LLC, WATSON LABORATORIES, INC..(GALLAGHER, MICHAEL) |
|
Att: 1 17 pgs Memorandum of Law in Support (Redacted), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A to the Memorandum of Law in Support, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition to Quash/Compel/Enforce Subpoenas
Fri 04/20 5:05 PM
PETITION to quash/compel/enforce Subpoenas ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8680539.), filed by WARNER CHILCOTT HOLDINGS COMPANY III, LTD., WARNER CHILCOTT PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY, WARNER CHILCOTT CORPORATION, WARNER CHILCOTT (US), LLC, WATSON LABORATORIES, INC., WARNER CHILCOTT COMPANY, LLC, WARNER CHILCOTT SALES (US), LLC, WARNER CHILCOTT LABORATORIES IRELAND LIMITED.(GALLAGHER, MICHAEL) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 04/20 5:13 PM
Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jjc, ) |