Amazon Content Services, LLC et al v. Set Broadcast, LLC, et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Michael W Fitzgerald |
Referred: | Alka Sagar |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-03325 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:501 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 20, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 25, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 17, 2018 1:54 AM PDT |
Defendant
Set Broadcast, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nelson Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jason Labossiere
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Universal City Studios Productions LLLP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sony Pictures Television Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Universal Television LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amazon Content Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Universal Cable Productions LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paramount Pictures Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Netflix Studios, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Disney Enterprises, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
1. | Netflix, Amazon, Disney & More Launch a Lawsuit Against Alleged Piracy Service (hypebeast.com) |
Submitted Mon 04/23/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, April 30, 2020 | ||
71 | 71
textonly
Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail
Thu 04/30 4:05 PM
Notice of Electronic Filing re Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE)(AO 121),70 e-mailed to Michael DeSanctis bounced due to The email address you entered couldn't be found. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lmh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY |
|
Monday, April 27, 2020 | ||
70 | 70
misc
Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121)
Mon 04/27 1:12 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. Mailed closing report to the current address of the Copyright Office: U.S. Copyright Office 101 Independence Ave. S.E., Washington, D.C. 20559-6000. (Closing) (iv) |
|
Att: 1 Judgment |