Victor Memido Balogun v. Jefferson B. Sessions, III, et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Steve Kim |
Referred: | Steve Kim |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-03368 |
Nature of Suit | 463 Immigration - Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal) |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 31, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 20, 2018 1:42 AM PDT |
Petitioner
Victor Memido Balogun
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Thomas D. Homan
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Sandra Hutchens
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
David A. Marin
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Kirstjen Nielsen
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Jefferson B. Sessions, III
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, September 03, 2019 | ||
57 | 57
appeal
USCA Mandate
Tue 09/24 8:25 AM
MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,47 , CCA # 18-56258 The judgment of this Court, entered July 30, 2019, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [See USCA Order,56 DISMISSED.] (mat) |