John Doe #1 et al v. Syracuse University et al
New York Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Brenda K Sannes |
Referred: | David E Peebles |
Case #: | 5:18-cv-00496 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 24, 2021 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 21, 2018 5:47 AM EDT |
Defendant
Teresa Abi-Nader Dahlberg
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert Hradsky
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kent Syverud
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Syracuse University
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Doe #4
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Doe #5
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Doe #3
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Doe #2
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Doe #1
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Doe #6
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Doe #7
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Doe #8
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Doe #9
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Pamela Peter
Terminated: 07/09/2018
|
Represented By
|
1. | 5 Theta Tau members file federal lawsuit against Syracuse University (cnn.com) |
Submitted Thu 04/26/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 24, 2021 | ||
144 | 144
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 03/24 3:50 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 3/24/2021. (rjb, ) |
|
143 | 143
misc
Stipulation
Wed 03/24 3:31 PM
STIPULATION of discontinuance as to plaintiff John Doe #1 by John Doe #1 submitted to Judge Brenda K. Sannes. (Felter, Karen) |
|
142 | 142
misc
Status Report
Wed 03/24 10:32 AM
STATUS REPORT advising case will be discontinued by John Doe #1. (Felter, Karen) |
|
Monday, March 22, 2021 | ||
140 | 140
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 03/23 4:28 PM
TEXT ORDER: For the reasons set forth on the record at the hearing on 3/22/2021, and pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(c): (1) Defendant's motion for a protective order in precluding the deposition of Abi-Nader Dahlberg is GRANTED; and (2) the joint oral application for a protective order limiting the use and dissemination of discovery materials marked confidential is GRANTED. On or before 4/2/2021, the parties shall file a joint written protective order regarding discovery materials marked confidential. A telephone conference is scheduled for 4/5/2021 at 4:00 p.m. Text Order 134 is rescinded to the extent that it directed the parties to file status reports by 4/5/2021. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 3/22/2021.(jdp) |
|
139 | 139
minutes
Telephone Conference
Tue 03/23 4:20 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric: a telephone conference was held on 3/22/2021, to address the disputes as set forth in Letter Motion136 and Letter Brief138 . The Court heard arguments from the parties and ruled on the discovery disputes. A telephone conference is scheduled for 4/5/2021 at 4:00 p.m. Text Order 134 is rescinded to the extent that it directed the parties to file status reports by 4/5/2021. Appearances: K. Felter, Esq., for Plaintiff; J. Powers, Esq., and M. DAgostino, Esq., for Defendant; and L. Tennyson, Court Reporter. (jdp ) |
|
Friday, March 19, 2021 | ||
138 | 138
misc
Letter Brief
Fri 03/19 2:21 PM
LETTER BRIEF setting forth the University's position regarding the scope of discovery for the 3/22/2021 court conference before the Hon. Miroslav Lovric by Syracuse University. (D'Agostino, Mary) |
|
Thursday, March 18, 2021 | ||
137 | 137
order
Order on Letter Request
Thu 03/18 1:26 PM
TEXT ORDER: Letter Motion136 is GRANTED, insofar as, an on the record hearing is scheduled for 3/22/2021 at 10:00 a.m., via telephone conference. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 3/18/2021. (jdp ) |
|
Wednesday, March 17, 2021 | ||
136 | 136
motion
Letter Request/Motion
Wed 03/17 5:08 PM
Letter Motion from Karen G. Felter for John Doe #1 requesting Discovery Conference submitted to Judge Lovric . (Felter, Karen) |