BIG3 LLC et al v. Ahmed Al-Rumaihi et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Dolly M Gee |
Referred: | Steve Kim |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-03466 |
Nature of Suit | 320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Libel,Assault,Slander |
Case Filed: | Apr 25, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 11, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Los Angeles Superior Court, BC700897 |
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 11:08 AM PST |
Defendant
Ahmed Al-Rumaihi
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ayman Sabi
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
BIG3 LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeff Kwatinetz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
O Shea Jackson
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Faisal Al-Hamadi
Terminated: 12/20/2018
|
|
Defendant
Sheikh Abdullah bin Mohammed bin Sau Al Thani
Terminated: 12/20/2018
|
|
Defendant
Akbar Al Baker
Terminated: 12/20/2018
|
1. | Qatari Investor in Ice Cube's BIG3 Claims Diplomatic Immunity Upon New Ambassadorship (hollywoodreporter.com) |
Submitted Thu 12/06/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Thursday, July 11, 2019 | ||
103 | 103
9
pgs
order
Compel Arbitration Dismiss Case
Thu 07/11 2:06 PM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION68 AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS84 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS Sabi's MCA, GRANTS Al-Rumaihi's MTD, DISMISSES without prejudice all of Plaintiffs' claims against Al-Rumaihi, and STAYS the remainder of this action and places it on inactive status pending the completion of Plaintiffs' arbitration against Sabi. Plaintiffs and Sabi shall notify the Court within ten days after the receipt of an arbitral ruling or other disposition of their dispute, whichever is later, and inform the Court how they wish to proceed with Plaintiffs' claims against Sabi. The July 12, 2019 hearing on Al-Rumaihi's MTD is VACATED. IT IS SO ORDERED. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (lom) |