Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited et al v. Petroleos De Venezuela, S.A. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Valerie E Caproni |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-03716 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 09:207 Application for order confirming award of arbitrators |
Case Filed: | Apr 26, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 23, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 23, 2018 5:24 AM EDT |
Petitioner
Conocophillips Petrozuata B.V.
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Corpoguanipa, S.A.
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
PDVSA Petroleo, S.A.
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Petroleos De Venezuela, S.A.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, November 13, 2019 | ||
misc
Certification of Judgment
Wed 11/13 3:44 PM
CERTIFICATION OF JUDGMENT issued on November 13, 2019, in favor of Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited against Corpoguanipa, S.A. and Petrleos de Venezuela, S.A., jointly and severally, in the liquidated amount of US $1,498,399,209, plus simple interest at a rate of 3-month LIBOR, running from April 26, 2018; in favor of ConocoPhillips Petrozuata B.V. against PDVSA Petrleo, S.A. and Petrleos de Venezuela, S.A., jointly and severally, in the liquidated amount of US $434,884,356, plus simple interest at a rate of 12-month LIBOR, running from April 26, 2018; and in favor of Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited and ConocoPhillips Petrozuata B.V. against Petrleos de Venezuela, S.A., Corpoguanipa, S.A. and PDVSA Petrleo, S.A., jointly and severally, in the liquidated amount of US $231,200.00, plus simple interest at a rate of 12-month LIBOR, running from April 26, 2018. (3 certifications issued), to be picked up by the party. (km) |
||
Tuesday, November 12, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Proposed Clerk's Certification of a Judgment to be Registered in Another District
Tue 11/12 3:55 PM
PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF A JUDGMENT TO BE REGISTERED IN ANOTHER DISTRICT. Filing fee $ 11.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18043551. Clerk's Certification of a Judgment to be Registered in Another District to be Picked up by Party. Document filed by Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited. Document Number of Related Judgment:25 . (Green, Marcus) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). |
|
28 | 28
misc
Proposed Clerk's Certification of a Judgment to be Registered in Another District
Tue 11/12 3:53 PM
PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF A JUDGMENT TO BE REGISTERED IN ANOTHER DISTRICT. Filing fee $ 11.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18043503. Clerk's Certification of a Judgment to be Registered in Another District to be Picked up by Party. Document filed by Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited. Document Number of Related Judgment:25 . (Green, Marcus) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). |
|
27 | 27
misc
Proposed Clerk's Certification of a Judgment to be Registered in Another District
Tue 11/12 3:51 PM
PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF A JUDGMENT TO BE REGISTERED IN ANOTHER DISTRICT. Filing fee $ 11.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18043332. Clerk's Certification of a Judgment to be Registered in Another District to be Picked up by Party. Document filed by Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited. Document Number of Related Judgment:25 . (Green, Marcus) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). |
|
Thursday, August 23, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
2
pgs
order
Judgment
Thu 08/23 11:26 AM
JUDGMENT: The Petition is granted; Final Money Judgment is entered in favor of Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited against Corpoguanipa, S.A. and Petrleos de Venezuela, S.A., jointly and severally, in the liquidated amount of US $1,498,399,209, plus simple interest at a rate of 3-month LIBOR, running from April 26, 2018; in favor of ConocoPhillips Petrozuata B.V. against PDVSA Petrleo, S.A. and Petrleos de Venezuela, S.A., jointly and severally, in the liquidated amount of US $434,884,356, plus simple interest at a rate of 12-month LIBOR, running from April 26, 2018; and in favor of Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited and ConocoPhillips Petrozuata B.V. against Petrleos de Venezuela, S.A., Corpoguanipa, S.A. and PDVSA Petrleo, S.A., jointly and severally, in the liquidated amount of US $231,200.00, plus simple interest at a rate of 12-month LIBOR, running from April 26, 2018. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/22/2018) (cf) |
|
Wednesday, August 22, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
order
Stipulation and Order
Thu 08/23 11:32 AM
STIPULATION AND CONSENT TO ENTRY OF JUDGMENT CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD: DO NOW STIPULATE to the entry of a judgment of this Court confirming the ICC Award as follows: 1. Each of the Respondents has accepted service of the Petition; 2. Each of the Parties consents to the jurisdiction of this Court to adjudicate the Recognition Action; 3. The Parties each irrevocably waive any and all defenses and/or objections to the confirmation and recognition of the ICC Award as a judgment of this Court; and 4. The Parties each stipulate to the entry by this Court of a judgment in the form of the proposed judgment appended hereto as Exhibit A. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/22/2018) (cf) |
|
24 | 24
misc
Proposed Stipulation and Order
Wed 08/22 4:26 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Conocophillips Petrozuata B.V., Corpoguanipa, S.A., PDVSA Petroleo, S.A., Petroleos De Venezuela, S.A., Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited. (Green, Marcus) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
23 | 23
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 08/22 2:01 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Corpoguanipa, S.A., Petroleos De Venezuela, S.A., PDVSA Petroleo, S.A.. (Pizzurro, Joseph) |
|
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/22 1:56 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph D. Pizzurro on behalf of Corpoguanipa, S.A., PDVSA Petroleo, S.A., Petroleos De Venezuela, S.A.. (Pizzurro, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, August 08, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
order
Memo Endorsement
Thu 08/09 8:52 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:20 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Marcus J. Green dated 08/07/2018 re: Status of Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Ltd., et al. v. Petrleos de Venezuela, S.A., et al. (Case No. 18-cv-3716). Document filed by Conocophillips Petro zuata B.V., Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited. ENDORSEMENT: Petitioners are ordered to update the Court on service in this matter by no later than October 9, 2018. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/8/2018) (rjm) |
|
Tuesday, August 07, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Letter
Tue 08/07 7:35 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Marcus J. Green dated 08/07/2018 re: Status of Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Ltd., et al. v. Petrleos de Venezuela, S.A., et al. (Case No. 18-cv-3716). Document filed by Conocophillips Petrozuata B.V., Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited.(Green, Marcus) |
|
Monday, July 30, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 07/30 3:56 PM
ORDER: WHEREAS no Respondent has yet appeared in this matter; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioners must update the Court as to the status of this matter, including Petitioners' efforts to serve Respondents, by letter dated no later than August 7, 2018. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/30/2018) (mro) |
|
Wednesday, May 09, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 05/09 4:16 PM
ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting17 Motion for D. Brian King to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/9/2018) (kgo) |
|
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 05/08 1:42 PM
MOTION for Donovan Brian King to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15041775. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Conocophillips Petrozuata B.V., Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited.(King, Donovan) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
misc
Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
Tue 05/08 1:47 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 17 MOTION for Donovan Brian King to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15041775. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc) |
||
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/27 1:58 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to PDVSA Petroleo, S.A.. (vf) |
|
15 | 15
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/27 1:56 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Corpoguanipa, S.A.. (vf) |
|
14 | 14
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/27 1:54 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Petroleos De Venezuela, S.A.. (vf) |
|
13 | 13
2
pgs
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/27 11:04 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Hamaca Holding LLC, Corporate Parent ConocoPhillips Hamaca B.V., Corporate Parent Phillips Investment Company LLC, Corporate Parent Phillips Petroleum International Investment Company LLC, Corporate Parent ConocoPhillips, Corporate Parent ConocoPhillips Company for Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited; Corporate Parent Conoco Orinoco Inc., Corporate Parent ConocoPhillips, Corporate Parent ConocoPhillips Company for Conocophillips Petrozuata B.V.. Document filed by Conocophillips Petrozuata B.V., Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited.(Kim, Michael) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient Docket Entry Error
Fri 04/27 10:27 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Michael Sangyun Kim to RE-FILE Document 7 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Fri 04/27 1:39 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael Sangyun Kim. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 04/27 1:46 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 04/27 1:48 PM
Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 04/27 1:48 PM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |
||
Thursday, April 26, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/26 10:41 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Samuel Edward Prevatt on behalf of Conocophillips Petrozuata B.V., Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited. (Prevatt, Samuel) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/26 10:37 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elliot Friedman on behalf of Conocophillips Petrozuata B.V., Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited. (Friedman, Elliot) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/26 10:15 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carrie Ann Tendler on behalf of Conocophillips Petrozuata B.V., Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited. (Tendler, Carrie) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/26 10:14 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marcus Johnson Green on behalf of Conocophillips Petrozuata B.V., Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited. (Green, Marcus) |
|
8 | 8
5
pgs
respoth
Declaration in Support (non-motion)
Thu 04/26 10:09 PM
DECLARATION of Elliot Friedman in Support re:1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by Conocophillips Petrozuata B.V., Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited.(Kim, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 442 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 87 pgs Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 88 pgs Exhibit B (continued), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C (continued), | ||
Att: 6 16 pgs Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit E (continued), | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit I | ||
7 | 7
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/26 10:03 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent ConocoPhillips for Conocophillips Petrozuata B.V., Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited. Document filed by Conocophillips Petrozuata B.V., Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited.(Kim, Michael) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Brief
Thu 04/26 8:54 PM
BRIEF re:1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration, . Document filed by Conocophillips Petrozuata B.V., Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited.(Kim, Michael) |
|
5 | 5
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 04/26 8:38 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PDVSA Petroleo, S.A., re:1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by Conocophillips Petrozuata B.V., Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited. (Kim, Michael) |
|
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 04/26 8:36 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Corpoguanipa, S.A., re:1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by Conocophillips Petrozuata B.V., Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited. (Kim, Michael) |
|
3 | 3
1
pgs
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 04/26 8:34 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A., re:1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by Conocophillips Petrozuata B.V., Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited. (Kim, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
2
pgs
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 04/26 8:30 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kim, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
16
pgs
cmp
Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration
Thu 04/26 8:27 PM
PETITION TO CONFIRM, RECOGNIZE AND ENFORCE ARBITRATION AWARD ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14995452).Document filed by Phillips Petroleum Company Venezuela Limited, Conocophillips Petrozuata B.V..(Kim, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order |