Graham et al v. Rational Vaccines, Inc.
Illinois Central District Court | |
Judge: | Colin Stirling Bruce |
Referred: | Eric I Long |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-03096 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 27, 2018 |
Re-opened: | Feb 15, 2023 |
Terminated: | May 18, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 24, 2018 4:01 AM CDT |
Defendant
Rational Vaccines, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edd Biel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Erkelens
2805 S Oakland Pl
Aurora, CO 80014 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terry Graham
212 Shady Oaks Ln
Red Oak, TX 75154 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, May 18, 2023 | ||
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 05/18 10:33 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 5/18/2023. Pursuant to Stipulation of Dismissal70 and Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, this matter is hereby terminated. All pending motions are denied as moot and all scheduled deadlines and court settings are vacated.(DS) |
||
Wednesday, May 17, 2023 | ||
70 | 70
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 05/17 1:29 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Edd Biel, Elizabeth Erkelens, Terry Graham. (Milstein, Alan) |