Baca, et al v. Colorado Department of State
Original Case: 1:17-cv-01937
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:18-cv-01173 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 441 Civil Rights - Voting |
Case Filed: | Apr 26, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 01, 2020 |
Last checked: Friday Oct 02, 2020 2:28 AM MDT |
Amicus Curiae
INDEPENDENCE INSTITUTE
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
DAVID G. POST
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
DEREK T. MULLER
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
MICHAEL L. ROSIN
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
ROBERT M. HARDAWAY, Professor of Law, University of Denver Sturm College of Law
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
COLORADO REPUBLICAN COMMITTEE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
COLORADO DEPARTMENT OF STATE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
MICHEAL BACA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
POLLY BACA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ROBERT NEMANICH
|
Represented By
|
1. | Federal court undercuts progressive efforts to nullify Electoral College, rules electors can vote freely (foxnews.com) |
Submitted Sat 08/24/2019 | |
Docket last updated: 10/02/2020 2:28 AM MDT |
Thursday, April 26, 2018 | ||
[10554253] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 04/26/2018. Docketing statement, transcript order form and entry of appearance due 05/10/2018 for Micheal Baca, Polly Baca and Robert Nemanich. Notice of appearance due on 05/10/2018 for Colorado Department of State. 18-1173 | ||
Att: 1 60 pgs Preliminary ROA | ||
Att: 2 7 pgs Docket | ||
Att: 3 3 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil |