Gibson Brands, Inc.
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher S Sontchi |
Case #: | 1:18-bk-11025 |
Case Filed: | May 01, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 20, 2018 |
Plan Confirmed: | Oct 04, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Gibson Brands, Inc., Debtor
309 Plus Park Blvd
Nashville, TN 37217-1005 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Gibson Brands, Inc.
309 Plus Park Blvd.
Nashville, TN 37217 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 1:16 PM EST |
Attorney
Goodwin Procter LLP
|
Represented By
|
Attorney
Pepper Hamilton LLP
|
Represented By
|
Claims Agent
Prime Clerk LLC
www.primeclerk.com 830 Third Avenue 9th Floor
New York, NY 10022 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tower Records Square, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
TN Dept of Revenue
Bankruptcy Division P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
FP Park Investors, L.L.C.
315 Deaderick St. Ste 1700
Nashville, TN 37238 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
GSO Capital Partners LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Somera Road Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Samick Musical Instruments Co., Ltd.
520 S Grand Avenue Suite 1070
Los Angeles, CA 90071 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
STORE Master Funding VI, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
HP Park Investors, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Hudson 1740 Technology, LLC
1250-I Newell Ave. Suite 149
Walnut Creek, CA 94596 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Hudson Concourse, LLC
c/o Montee & Associate 1250-I Newell Ave. Suite 149
Walnut Creek, CA 94596 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
IBM CHINA / HONG KONG LIMITED
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pacific Rim Tonewoods, Inc.
Miller Nash Graham & Dunn LLP 2801 Alaskan Way Suite 300
Seattle, WA 98121 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
PT Samick Indonesia
520 S Grand Avenue Suite 1070
Los Angeles, CA 90071 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Material Handling Resources, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
New York State Department of Taxation & Finance
15 MetroTech Center
Brooklyn, NY 11201 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
ASM Capital X LLC
7600 Jericho Turnpike Suite 302
Woodbury, NY 11797 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Vendor Recovery Fund IV, LLC
PO Box 669
SMITHTOWN, NY 11787 |
|
Creditor
Aimee Alden
|
|
Creditor
Walmart Inc.
702 S.W. 8th Street
Bentonville, AK 72716 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
BT Hong Kong Limited
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
United States/USAO
U.S. Attorney's Office 1007 N. Orange Street Suite 700
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tyco Integrated Security LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Brunk Industries, Inc.
Reinhart Boerner Van Deuren s.c. 1000 N. Water Street, Suite 1700
Milwaukee, WI 53202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
CIM Urban REIT Properties IX, LP
Higier Allen & Lautin, PC 2711 N. Haskell Ave., Suite 2400
Dallas, TX 75204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
CRG Financial LLC
100 Union Avenue Suite 240
Cresskill, NJ 07626 |
|
Creditor
AIG Companies
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Department of Revenue
Bureau of Compliance Department 280946
Harrisburg, PA 17128 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Travis County
P.O. Box 1748
Austin, TX 78767 |
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS
|
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
919 Market St., Suite 1800
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
|
Represented By
|
Fee Examiner
Maria Aprile Sawczuk
|
Represented By
|
Financial Advisor
Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Somera Road-Gibson Memphis, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Tronical GmbH
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Wurlitzer Corp.
309 Plus Park Blvd.
Nashville, TN 37217 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Wilmington Trust, National Association, in its capacity as successor trustee and collateral agent to the 8.875% Senior Secured Notes due 2018
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
TR Capital Management LLC
|
|
Interested Party
Moody's Investors Service, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Ad Hoc Group of Certain Noteholders
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Ad Hoc Minority Noteholders Committee
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Baldwin Piano, Inc.
309 Plus Park Blvd.
Nashville, TN 37217 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Consolidated Musical Instruments, LLC
309 Plus Park Blvd.
Nashville, TN 37217 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Cortland Capital Market Services LLC, in its capacity as DIP Agent
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Gibson Cafe & Gallery, LLC
309 Plus Park Blvd.
Nashville, TN 37217 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Gibson Europe B.V.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Gibson Holdings, Inc.
309 Plus Park Blvd.
Nashville, TN 37217 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Gibson Innovations USA, Inc.
309 Plus Park Blvd.
Nashville, TN 37217 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Gibson International Sales LLC
309 Plus Park Blvd.
Nashville, TN 37217 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Gibson Pro Audio Corp.
309 Plus Park Blvd.
Nashville, TN 37217 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Guitar Liquidation Corporation
179 Lincoln Street
Boston, MA 02111 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Jefferies LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
KPMG LLP
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Neat Audio Acquisition Corp.
309 Park Plus Blvd.
Nashville, TN 37217 |
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
FTI Consulting, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Spec. Counsel
Dentons US LLP
|
Represented By
|
Spec. Counsel
Bates & Bates
|
Represented By
|
Transcriber
Reliable Companies
1007 North Orange Street Suite 110
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
1. | It's Over: Gibson Guitar Is Officially Exiting Chapter 11 Bankruptcy (digitalmusicnews.com) |
Submitted Wed 10/03/2018 | |
2. | Gibson Brands Files For Chapter 11 Bankruptcy (newschannel5.com) |
Submitted Wed 05/02/2018 | |