New Jersey District Court
Judge:Madeline Cox Arleo
Referred: Steven C Mannion
Case #: 2:18-cv-08672
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:May 01, 2018
Last checked: Friday Jun 15, 2018 5:13 AM EDT
Defendant
U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Represented By
SAMUEL P. GO
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By
SAMUEL P. GO
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
FRANCIS CISSNA
DIRECTOR, US CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES OFFICE OF GENERAL COUNSEL DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
WASHINGTON, DC 20258
Represented By
SAMUEL P. GO
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
KIRSTJEN NIELSEN
SECRETARY, US DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY OFFICE OF GENERAL COUNSEL DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Washington, DC 20528
Represented By
SAMUEL P. GO
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Lead Plaintiff
SMALL AND MEDIUM ENTERPRISE CONSORTIUM, INC.
200 Metroplex Dr. Suite 408
EDISON, NJ 08817
Represented By
BRIAN CARNEY
Davis & Brusca
contact info
Plaintiff
DEREX TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
111 S. Frank E. Rodgers Blvd., Suite # 304/306
HARRISON, NJ 07029
Represented By
BRIAN CARNEY
Davis & Brusca
contact info
Plaintiff
NAM INFO, INC.
2525 US Highway 130 BLDG D Suite 2
CRANBURY, NJ 08512
Represented By
BRIAN CARNEY
Davis & Brusca
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/17/2018 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, July 09, 2018
31 31 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Mon 10:52 AM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by DEREX TECHNOLOGIES, INC., NAM INFO, INC., SMALL AND MEDIUM ENTERPRISE CONSORTIUM, INC. re30 MOTION for Leave to File Reply (CARNEY, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 10:48 AM
Set Deadlines as to30 MOTION for Leave to File Reply ,29 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 8/6/2018 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 06, 2018
30 30 motion Leave to File Document Fri 5:36 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Reply by All Defendants.(GO, SAMUEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
29 29 motion Dismiss Fri 4:44 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. Responses due by 7/23/2018(GO, SAMUEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, June 28, 2018
28 28 respoth Brief Thu 8:39 PM
BRIEF in reply to Defendants' Supplemental Brief (CARNEY, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 22, 2018
27 27 respoth Brief Fri 1:10 PM
BRIEF (Supplemental) Pursuant to the Court's June 15, 2018 Order (GO, SAMUEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 15, 2018
26 26 order Order Fri 2:43 PM
TEXT ORDER, the defendants Kirstjen Nielsen, et al., are directed to submit supplemental briefing on the narrow issue of whether PM-602-0157 is a legislative rule or an interpretive rule. The brief is to be submitted by 6/22/18 with opposition, if any, due one week thereafter. Briefs are not to exceed 10 pages. So Ordered by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 6/15/18. (aa, )
Related: [-]
Monday, May 28, 2018
25 25 respm Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion Mon 11:47 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by DEREX TECHNOLOGIES, INC., NAM INFO, INC., SMALL AND MEDIUM ENTERPRISE CONSORTIUM, INC. re7 First MOTION to Amend/Correct4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (CARNEY, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 23, 2018
24 24 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 9:48 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition filed by All Defendants re7 First MOTION to Amend/Correct4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (GO, SAMUEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Monday, May 21, 2018
misc Pro Hac Vice Fee Received Tue 11:48 AM
Pro Hac Vice fee for Jonathan Wasden: $ 150, receipt number NEW036464 (sm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 17, 2018
23 23 3 pgs order Order Thu 3:00 PM
ORDER ADMITTING JONATHAN D. WASDEN PRO HAC VICE and shall pay $150.00 to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey, etc. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 5/15/2018. (sm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 16, 2018
22 22 1 pgs order Order Wed 4:17 PM
ORDER that the Government may file an opposition or response to Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction no later than May 23, 2018. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 5/15/2018. (sm)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 14, 2018
21 21 misc Letter Mon 4:51 PM
Letter from Government Defendants.(GO, SAMUEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 4:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SAMUEL P. GO on behalf of All Defendants (GO, SAMUEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 10, 2018
19 19 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 1:50 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jonathan D. Wasden by DEREX TECHNOLOGIES, INC., NAM INFO, INC., SMALL AND MEDIUM ENTERPRISE CONSORTIUM, INC..(CARNEY, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification Certification of Brian Carney,
Att: 2 Certification Certification of Jonathan D. Wasden,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 09, 2018
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 4:53 PM
ORDER re15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan D. Wasden is Denied Without Prejudice for failure to comply with L. Civ. R. 7.1(e) and 101.1(c)(2), (4). *Contact the Court before submitting a new application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 5/9/2018. (sm)
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 4:51 PM
ORDER re14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Thomas V. Allen is Denied Without Prejudice for failure to comply with L. Civ. R. 7.1(e) and 101.1(c)(2), (4). *Contact the Court before submitting a new application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 5/9/2018. (sm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 08, 2018
16 16 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Tue 1:53 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by SMALL AND MEDIUM ENTERPRISE CONSORTIUM, INC., DEREX TECHNOLOGIES, INC., NAM INFO, INC.. FRANCIS CISSNA served on 5/7/2018, answer due 7/6/2018; KIRSTJEN NIELSEN served on 5/7/2018, answer due 7/6/2018; U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 5/7/2018, answer due 7/6/2018; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 5/7/2018, answer due 7/6/2018.(CARNEY, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Executed Summons on Defendants, US Attorney General, and US Attorney
15 15 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 10:06 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by DEREX TECHNOLOGIES, INC., NAM INFO, INC., SMALL AND MEDIUM ENTERPRISE CONSORTIUM, INC..(CARNEY, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
14 14 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 10:05 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by DEREX TECHNOLOGIES, INC., NAM INFO, INC., SMALL AND MEDIUM ENTERPRISE CONSORTIUM, INC..(CARNEY, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, May 07, 2018
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 2:28 PM
ORDER denying3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan D. Wasden without prejudice for failure to comply with L. Civ. R. 7.1(e) and 101.1(c)(2-3). Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 5/4/2018. (sm)
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 2:27 PM
ORDER denying2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice or Thomas V. Allen without prejudice for failure to comply with L. Civ. R. 7.1(3) and 101.1(c)(2-3). Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 54/2018. (sm)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 04, 2018
11 11 service Summons Issued Fri 3:29 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Susan Miller* (sm)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Issued Fri 11:39 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to FRANCIS CISSNA, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *CHRISTINE MELILLO* (cm, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 3:34 PM
Set Deadlines as to8 First MOTION to Amend/Correct2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thomas V. Allen ,7 First MOTION to Amend/Correct4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ,9 First MOTION to Amend/Correct3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jonathan D. Wasden . Motion set for 6/4/2018 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 03, 2018
9 9 motion Amend/Correct Thu 3:54 PM
First MOTION to Amend/Correct3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jonathan D. Wasden by DEREX TECHNOLOGIES, INC., NAM INFO, INC., SMALL AND MEDIUM ENTERPRISE CONSORTIUM, INC..(CARNEY, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Good Standing
8 8 motion Amend/Correct Thu 3:53 PM
First MOTION to Amend/Correct2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thomas V. Allen by DEREX TECHNOLOGIES, INC., NAM INFO, INC., SMALL AND MEDIUM ENTERPRISE CONSORTIUM, INC..(CARNEY, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Good Standing
7 7 motion Amend/Correct Thu 3:51 PM
First MOTION to Amend/Correct4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by DEREX TECHNOLOGIES, INC., NAM INFO, INC., SMALL AND MEDIUM ENTERPRISE CONSORTIUM, INC..(CARNEY, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Memorandum of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Declaration,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 3:48 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against FRANCIS CISSNA, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, filed by SMALL AND MEDIUM ENTERPRISE CONSORTIUM, INC., DEREX TECHNOLOGIES, INC., NAM INFO, INC..(CARNEY, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Exhibit (to Document) Thu 11:24 AM
Exhibit to4 Motion for TRO by DEREX TECHNOLOGIES, INC., NAM INFO, INC., SMALL AND MEDIUM ENTERPRISE CONSORTIUM, INC.. (CARNEY, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Document Not Signed by Attorney Thu 12:06 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Thomas V. Allen and the Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan D. Wasden DE Nos.2 and3 submitted by Brian Carney on 5/1/2018 do not contain proper electronic signatures. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH THE PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE (s/ Attorney's Name.) This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (sm)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Document contains an Electronic Signature of a Non-Attorney Thu 12:10 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Certifications submitted with the Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan D. Wasden and Thomas V. Allen DE Nos.2 and3 submitted by Brian Carney on 5/1/2018 contain improper signatures. Only Registered Users are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC OR SCANNED SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (sm, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Document Not Signed by Attorney Thu 12:13 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Memorandum DE4 submitted by Brian Carney on 5/1/2018 does not contain a proper electronic signature. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH THE PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE (s/ Attorney's Name.) This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (sm)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 12:14 PM
Set Deadlines as to4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ,3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jonathan D. Wasden ,2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thomas V. Allen . Motion set for 6/4/2018 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 01, 2018
4 4 motion Temporary Restraining Order Tue 4:49 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by DEREX TECHNOLOGIES, INC., NAM INFO, INC., SMALL AND MEDIUM ENTERPRISE CONSORTIUM, INC..(CARNEY, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of SMEC
3 3 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 4:27 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jonathan D. Wasden by DEREX TECHNOLOGIES, INC., NAM INFO, INC., SMALL AND MEDIUM ENTERPRISE CONSORTIUM, INC.. (CARNEY, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 4:25 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thomas V. Allen by DEREX TECHNOLOGIES, INC., NAM INFO, INC., SMALL AND MEDIUM ENTERPRISE CONSORTIUM, INC.. (CARNEY, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 4:21 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8706634), filed by SMALL AND MEDIUM ENTERPRISE CONSORTIUM, INC., DEREX TECHNOLOGIES, INC., NAM INFO, INC..(CARNEY, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons DHS,
Att: 3 Summons USAO,
Att: 4 Summons DOJ
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 1:14 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. (ak, )
Related: [-]