Meiburger v. Leiser
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-13452
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-13452
Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Klinette H Kindred |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-01052 |
Nature of Suit | 31 Bankruptcy - Approval of sale of property of estate and of a co-owner - §363(h) |
Case Filed: | May 03, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 30, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday May 07, 2018 3:11 AM EDT |
Defendant
Phillip B Leiser, Defendant
2295 Village Crossing Road #302
Falls Church, VA 22043 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Phillip B Leiser
2295 Village Crossing Road #302
Falls Church, VA 22043 |
|
Plaintiff
Janet M. Meiburger, Plaintiff
The Meiburger Law Firm, P.C. 1493 Chain Bridge Road, Suite 201
McLean, VA 22101 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janet M. Meiburger
The Meiburger Law Firm, P.C. 1493 Chain Bridge Road, Suite 201
McLean, VA 22101 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 1:11 PM EDT |
Tuesday, November 06, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
court
Pre-Trial Conference Cancelled
Tue 11/06 10:32 AM
Pre-Trial Conference Cancelled: Default Judgment Entered. (williamsr) |
|
Tuesday, October 30, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
court
Adversary Proceeding Closed
Tue 10/30 5:00 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Shepherd, Anthony) |
|
Tuesday, July 24, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
court
Hearing Cancelled
Tue 07/24 11:23 AM
Hearing Cancelled:Removed-Order Entered 7/10/1 (chandlerkj) |
|
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC certificate of mailing of order
Sat 07/14 12:24 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Tue 07/10 5:43 PM
Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment (Glenn, Jillinda) |
|
Tuesday, June 26, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
court
Hearing held; motion granted
Tue 06/26 10:45 AM
Hearing held; motion granted - Order to be Submitted. Appearance: Janet M. Meiburger Order/Disposition due by 07/10/2018. (williamsr) |
|
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
3
pgs
notice
Amended Notice of Hearing
Fri 06/15 4:10 PM
Amended Notice of Hearing on Motion for Default Judgment (Changing Hearing Date) filed by Janet M. Meiburger of The Meiburger Law Firm, P.C. on behalf of Janet M. Meiburger. Hearing scheduled for 6/26/2018 at 09:30 AM at Judge Kindred's Courtroom, 200 S. Washington Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom III, Alexandria, VA. (Meiburger, Janet) |
|
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 06/08 10:22 AM
Notice of Hearing filed by Janet M. Meiburger of The Meiburger Law Firm, P.C. on behalf of Janet M. Meiburger. Hearing scheduled for 7/24/2018 at 09:30 AM at Judge Kindred's Courtroom, 200 S. Washington Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom III, Alexandria, VA. (Meiburger, Janet) |
|
7 | 7
8
pgs
motion
Default Judgment
Fri 06/08 10:20 AM
Motion for Default Judgment filed by Janet M. Meiburger of The Meiburger Law Firm, P.C. on behalf of Janet M. Meiburger. (Meiburger, Janet) |
|
Wednesday, May 09, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
3
pgs
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 05/09 4:28 PM
Certificate of Service for Summons and Related Documents filed by Janet M. Meiburger of The Meiburger Law Firm, P.C. on behalf of Janet M. Meiburger. (Meiburger, Janet) |
|
Thursday, May 03, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
4
pgs
order
Initial Scheduling Order
Thu 05/03 4:31 PM
Initial Scheduling Order (Glenn, Jillinda) |
|
4 | 4
2
pgs
summon
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Thu 05/03 4:30 PM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference. Summons Issued to Phillip B Leiser Answer Due 6/4/2018 Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/6/2018 at 09:30 AM at Judge Kindred's Courtroom, 200 S. Washington Street, 2rd Floor, Courtroom II, Alexandria, VA, (Glenn, Jillinda) |
|
3 | 3
trustee
Trustee/DIP Deferral of Certain Fees
Thu 05/03 9:57 AM
I certify that I am trustee/debtor-in-possession in this case and have filed 1:18-ap-1052, as trustee; that the estate is without funds for payment of the required fee in the amount of $350.00 and the money on deposit in the debtor's estate is presently less than the fee for this Complaint; and, this deferral was not initiated by a creditor . I hereby defer payment of this filing fee until the conclusion of the case and the determination that there is any estate realized. A deferred fee (liability) shall be disclosed in the final report filed by Janet M. Meiburger of The Meiburger Law Firm, P.C. on behalf of Janet M. Meiburger. (Meiburger, Janet) |
|
2 | 2
2
pgs
misc
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
Thu 05/03 9:55 AM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet filed by Janet M. Meiburger of The Meiburger Law Firm, P.C. on behalf of Janet M. Meiburger. (Meiburger, Janet) |
|
1 | 1
4
pgs
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Thu 05/03 9:52 AM
Adversary case 18-01052 Complaint against Phillip B Leiser (Fee Amount of $350 is Deferred) filed by Janet M. Meiburger. Nature of Suit: (31 (Approval of sale of property of estate and of a co-owner - 363(h))) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 1:17-bk-13452 (Meiburger, Janet) |