Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:18-bk-11078
Case Filed:May 04, 2018
Dismissed:Jun 20, 2018
Terminated:Jul 06, 2018

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
BioAmber Inc.
1000 Westgate Drive Suite 115
St. Paul, MN 55114
Represented By
Colin Robinson
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Colin R. Robinson
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 23, 2020 6:00 PM EDT
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation Shawn M. Christianson 55 Second Street, 17th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94105
Represented By
Shawn M. Christianson
Buchalter P.C.
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Benjamin A. Hackman
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 minutes ago
Wednesday, July 01, 2020
38 38 21 pgs misc Transcript Wed 07/01 3:24 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 6/20/2018 RE: Omnibus. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 9/29/2020. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For information about how to obtain a transcript, call the Clerk's Office or Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber, Reliable, at Telephone number 302 654-8080. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 7/8/2020. Redaction Request Due By 7/22/2020. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 8/3/2020. Transcript access will be restricted through 9/29/2020. (NAB)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 06, 2018
court Close Bankruptcy Case Fri 07/06 4:32 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (NAB)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 22, 2018
37 37 5 pgs court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 06/23 1:05 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 06/22/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 34
Thursday, June 21, 2018
36 36 11 pgs misc Certificate of Service Thu 06/21 4:00 PM
Certificate of Service Regarding [Signed] Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Chapter 11 Case Related [+] Filed by BioAmber Inc.. (Robinson, Colin)
Related: [-] 34
35 35 5 pgs misc Certificate of Service Thu 06/21 3:58 PM
Certificate of Service Regarding [Signed] Final Order Under Sections 105, 345, 363, 364, 503, 1107 and 1108 of The Bankruptcy Code Authorizing (I) Maintenance of Existing Bank Accounts; (II) Continuance of Existing Cash Management System, Bank Accounts, Checks and Related Forms; (III) Continued Performance of Intercompany Transactions; (IV) Limited Waiver of Section 345(b) Deposit and Investment Requirements and (V) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by BioAmber Inc.. (Robinson, Colin)
Related: [-] 32
Wednesday, June 20, 2018
34 34 2 pgs order Dismiss Case Wed 06/20 2:37 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Chapter 11 Case Related [+] Order Signed on 6/20/2018. Tickle due by: 7/5/2018. (CMB)
Related: [-] 17
33 33 2 pgs court Minute Entry Wed 06/20 2:34 PM
Minute Entry: Hearing Held and orders signed. Re:31 Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. - Appearances: See attached sign-in sheet. (LJJ)
Related: [-]
32 32 8 pgs order Order Wed 06/20 2:34 PM
Final Order Under Sections 105, 345, 363, 364, 503, 1107 and 1108 of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing (I) Maintenance of Existing Bank Accounts; (II) Continuance of Existing Cash Management System, Bank Accounts, Checks and Related Forms; (III) Continued Performance of Intercompany Transactions; (IV) Limited Waiver of Section 345(b) Deposit and Investment Requirements and (V) Granting Related Relie Related [+] Order Signed on 6/20/2018. (CMB)
Related: [-] 6 ,14
31 31 4 pgs notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice Wed 06/20 10:43 AM
Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Related [+] Filed by BioAmber Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 6/20/2018 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Robinson, Colin)
Related: [-] 30
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, June 18, 2018
30 30 4 pgs notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Mon 06/18 12:24 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by BioAmber Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 6/20/2018 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Robinson, Colin)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Certificate of No Objection(Aty) Mon 06/18 12:11 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Debtors Motion Pursuant To Section 305 Of The Bankruptcy Code For An Order Dismissing Chapter 11 Case Upon Recognition Of Foreign Main Proceeding Under Chapter 15 Related [+] Filed by BioAmber Inc.. (Robinson, Colin)
Related: [-] 17
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit A
Thursday, June 14, 2018
28 28 2 pgs misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Thu 06/14 1:57 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding Notice of Filing of Amended Schedule E/F for Debtor Related [+] Filed by BioAmber Inc.. (Robinson, Colin)
Related: [-] 25
Tuesday, June 12, 2018
27 27 1 pgs trustee Minute Sheet/341 Meeting Tue 06/12 2:54 PM
Minute Sheet 341 Meeting Held and Concluded Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Hackman, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
26 26 crditcrd none Tue 06/12 1:55 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Amended Schedules/Statements 18-11078 LSS) [misc,amdsch] ( 31.00). Receipt Number 8903028, amount $ 31.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
25 25 10 pgs misc Amended Schedules/Statements Tue 06/12 12:39 PM
Amended Schedules/Statements filed: Sch E-F, , Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Fee Amount $31. Filed by BioAmber Inc.. (Robinson, Colin)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 11, 2018
24 24 3 pgs claims Request for Service of Notices Mon 06/11 1:16 PM
Request for Service of Notices. Filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Christianson, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 08, 2018
23 23 13 pgs misc Schedules/Statements Fri 06/08 7:59 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by BioAmber Inc.. (Robinson, Colin)
Related: [-]
22 22 18 pgs misc Schedules/Statements Fri 06/08 7:58 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by BioAmber Inc.. (Robinson, Colin)
Related: [-]
21 21 16 pgs misc Initial Reporting Requirements Fri 06/08 3:23 PM
Initial Reporting Requirements In re: BioAmber Inc. Filed by BioAmber Inc.. (Robinson, Colin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, June 06, 2018
20 20 2 pgs order Extend Deadline to File Schedules Wed 06/06 12:47 PM
Order (I) Extending Time to File Schedules of Assets and Liabilities, Schedules of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, and Statements of Financial Affairs, (II) Extending Time to File Reports of Financial Information or to Seek Modification of Such Reporting Requirement, and (III) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Order Signed on 6/6/2018. (CMB)
Related: [-] 4
Tuesday, June 05, 2018
19 19 misc Certificate of No Objection(Aty) Tue 06/05 4:59 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Debtors Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Extending Time To File Schedules Of Assets And Liabilities, Schedules Of Executory Contracts And Unexpired Leases, And Statements Of Financial Affairs, (II) Extending Time To File Reports Of Financial Information Or To Seek Modification Of Such Reporting Requirement, And (III) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by BioAmber Inc.. (Robinson, Colin)
Related: [-] 4
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit A
Monday, June 04, 2018
18 18 misc Certificate of Service Mon 06/04 4:11 PM
Certificate of Service // Regarding Debtors Motion Pursuant To Section 305 Of The Bankruptcy Code For An Order Dismissing Chapter 11 Case Upon Recognition Of Foreign Main Proceeding Under Chapter 15 Related [+] Filed by BioAmber Inc.. (Robinson, Colin)
Related: [-] 17
Wednesday, May 30, 2018
17 17 7 pgs motion Dismiss Case - Motion Wed 05/30 11:59 PM
Motion to Dismiss Case Filed by BioAmber Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 6/20/2018 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 6/13/2018. (Robinson, Colin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Notice
Att: 2 19 pgs Exhibit A - CCAA Initial Order
Att: 3 3 pgs Exhibit B - Proposed Dismissal Order
Thursday, May 24, 2018
16 16 3 pgs notice Hearing - Notice Thu 05/24 2:18 PM
Notice of Hearing // Notice Of Entry Of Interim Order And Final Hearing Regarding Debtors Motion For Order Under Sections 105, 345, 363, 364, 503, 1107 And 1108 Of The Bankruptcy Code Authorizing (I) Maintenance Of Existing Bank Accounts; (II) Continuance Of Existing Cash Management System, Bank Accounts, Checks And Related Forms; (III) Continued Performance Of Intercompany Transactions; (IV) Limited Waiver Of Section 345(b) Deposit And Investment Requirements And (V) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by BioAmber Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 6/20/2018 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 6/13/2018. (Robinson, Colin)
Related: [-] 6 ,14
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, May 23, 2018
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Thu 05/24 1:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. Related [+] Notice Date 05/23/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5
14 14 8 pgs order Order Wed 05/23 3:52 PM
Interim Order under Sections 105, 345, 363, 364, 503, 1107 and 1108 of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing (I) Maintenance of Existing Bank Accounts; (II) Continuance of Existing Cash Management System, Bank Accounts, Checks and Related Forms; (III) Continued Performance of Intercompany Transactions; (IV) Limited Waiver of Section 345(b) Deposit and Investment Requirements and (V) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Order Signed on 5/23/2018. (LJJ)
Related: [-] 6
13 13 1 pgs court Minute Entry Wed 05/23 3:34 PM
Minute Entry: Hearing Held and Interim Order Signed. - Re:10 Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. - Appearance: See attached sign-in sheet (LJJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 22, 2018
12 12 2 pgs notice Meeting of Creditors/Commencement of Case - Notice Tue 05/22 4:00 PM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors/Commencement of Case Filed by BioAmber Inc.. 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/12/2018 at 02:00 PM at J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building, 844 King St., Room 3209, Wilmington, Delaware. (Robinson, Colin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Tue 05/22 3:44 PM
Certificate of Service Regarding Notice Of Debtors Motion For Order Under Sections 105, 345, 363, 364, 503, 1107 And 1108 Of The Bankruptcy Code Authorizing (I) Maintenance Of Existing Bank Accounts; (II) Continuance Of Existing Cash Management System, Bank Accounts, Checks And Related Forms; (III) Continued Performance Of Intercompany Transactions; (IV) Limited Waiver Of Section 345(b) Deposit And Investment Requirements And (V) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by BioAmber Inc.. (Robinson, Colin)
Related: [-] 9
10 10 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice Tue 05/22 3:18 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by BioAmber Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/23/2018 at 03:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Robinson, Colin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
9 9 notice Hearing - Notice Tue 05/22 1:30 PM
Notice of Hearing // Notice Of Debtors Motion For Order Under Sections 105, 345, 363, 364, 503, 1107 And 1108 Of The Bankruptcy Code Authorizing (I) Maintenance Of Existing Bank Accounts; (II) Continuance Of Existing Cash Management System, Bank Accounts, Checks And Related Forms; (III) Continued Performance Of Intercompany Transactions; (IV) Limited Waiver Of Section 345(b) Deposit And Investment Requirements And (V) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by BioAmber Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/23/2018 at 03:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Robinson, Colin)
Related: [-] 6 ,7 ,8
Att: 1 29 pgs Exhibit A
Att: 2 9 pgs Exhibits B
Att: 3 3 pgs Exhibit C
8 8 order Shorten Time Tue 05/22 10:44 AM
Order Granting Debtors' Motion to Shorten Time for Debtors' Motion for Order under Sections 105, 345, 363, 364, 503, 1107 and 1108 of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing (I) Maintenance of Existing Bank Accounts; (II) Continuance of Existing Cash Management System, Bank Accounts, Checks and Related Forms; (III) Continued Performance of Intercompany Transactions; (IV) Limited Waiver of Section 345(b) Deposit and Investment Requirements and (V) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Order Signed on 5/22/2018. (CMB)
Related: [-] 7
7 7 motion Shorten - Motion Tue 05/22 10:00 AM
Motion to Shorten Time for Debtors' Motion for Order under Sections 105, 345, 363, 364, 503, 1107 and 1108 of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing (I) Maintenance of Existing Bank Accounts; (II) Continuance of Existing Cash Management System, Bank Accounts, Checks and Related Forms; (III) Continued Performance of Intercompany Transactions; (IV) Limited Waiver of Section 345(b) Deposit and Investment Requirements and (V) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by BioAmber Inc.. (Robinson, Colin)
Related: [-] 6
Att: 1 Exhibit A
6 6 19 pgs motion Motion to Maintain Bank Accounts Tue 05/22 9:56 AM
Motion to Maintain Bank Accounts // Debtors' Motion for Order under Sections 105, 345, 363, 364, 503, 1107 and 1108 of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing (I) Maintenance of Existing Bank Accounts; (II) Continuance of Existing Cash Management System, Bank Accounts, Checks and Related Forms; (III) Continued Performance of Intercompany Transactions; (IV) Limited Waiver of Section 345(b) Deposit and Investment Requirements and (V) Granting Related Relief Filed by BioAmber Inc.. (Robinson, Colin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Form of Order
Monday, May 21, 2018
5 5 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11-Corp Mon 05/21 11:14 AM
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 - Corporation 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/12/2018 at 02:00 PM at J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building, 844 King St., Room 3209, Wilmington, Delaware. Related [+] (NAB)
Related: [-] 3
Friday, May 18, 2018
4 4 motion Extend Deadline to File Schedules - Motion Fri 05/18 11:36 PM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Filed by BioAmber Inc.. Objections due by 6/1/2018. (Robinson, Colin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Att: 3 4 pgs Certificate of Service and Service List
3 3 1 pgs misc Request to Schedule Section 341 Meeting Fri 05/18 4:34 PM
Request of US Trustee to Schedule Section 341 Meeting of Creditors for June 12, 2018, at 2:00 p.m. in Room 3209 of the J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building, 844 King Street, Wilmington, Delaware Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Hackman, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 06, 2018
2 2 crditcrd none Sun 05/06 9:43 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 18-11078 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8859602, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 04, 2018
1 1 13 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 05/04 3:57 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by BioAmber Inc.. (Jones, Laura Davis)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Fri 05/04 4:06 PM
Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein added to case (BA)
Related: [-]