Designworks Homes, Inc. et al v. Columbia House of Brokers Realty, Inc. et al
Missouri Western District Court | |
Judge: | Brian C Wimes |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-04090 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | May 04, 2018 |
Re-opened: | Oct 13, 2021 |
Terminated: | Sep 29, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 31, 2018 4:29 AM CDT |
Defendant
Jacqueline Bulgin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Columbia House of Brokers Realty, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Carol S. Denninghoff
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Doe 1
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Deborah Ann Fisher
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Shannon L. O'Brien
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nicole Waldschlager
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Designworks Homes, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Lawrence James
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, December 22, 2023 | ||
173 | 173
respm
Reply Suggestions to Motion
Fri 12/22 2:35 PM
REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re160 MOTION for attorney fees and full costs filed by Patrick David Kuehl, Jr on behalf of Defendants Jacqueline Bulgin, Columbia House of Brokers Realty, Inc., Carol S. Denninghoff, John Doe 1, Deborah Ann Fisher, Shannon L. O'Brien, Nicole Waldschlager. (Kuehl, Patrick) |
|
Thursday, December 21, 2023 | ||
172 | 172
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 12/21 2:14 PM
RESPONSE to motion re160 MOTION for attorney fees and full costs filed by Patrick David Kuehl, Jr on behalf of Defendants Jacqueline Bulgin, Columbia House of Brokers Realty, Inc., Carol S. Denninghoff, John Doe 1, Deborah Ann Fisher, Shannon L. O'Brien, Nicole Waldschlager. Reply suggestions due by 1/4/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Kuehl, Patrick) Modified on 12/21/2023 to note documents removed as wrong filing event utilized. See Docket Modification to follow. (Woods, Gloria) |
|
notice
Notice of Docket Modification
Thu 12/21 2:57 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 12/21/2023 as Document No. 172, RESPONSE to motion. The document has been deleted as the incorrect event was used when filing the document. Counsel will refile the document using the correct event. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Woods, Gloria) |