Galvez v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Robert E Blackburn |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-01047 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | May 04, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 16, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday May 05, 2018 2:26 AM MDT |
Defendant
Commissioner, Social Security Administration
|
|
Interested Party
SSA Noticing
|
|
Interested Party
USAO-SS-Noticing
|
|
Plaintiff
Edward Galvez
|
Represented By
|
GPO
May 15 2019
ORDER AFFIRMING COMMISSIONER entered by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/15/19. (lrobe) |
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Thursday, May 16, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
order
Judgment
Thu 05/16 4:06 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Commissioner, Social Security Administration and against Edward Galvez pursuant to20 Order Affirming Commissioner. Entered by Clerk on 5/16/19. (lrobe) |
|
Wednesday, May 15, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
15
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Wed 05/15 4:36 PM
ORDER AFFIRMING COMMISSIONER entered by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/15/19. (lrobe) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information
Fri 03/22 5:32 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information of Attorney by Teresa H. Abbott (Abbott, Teresa) |
|
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Letter Reassigning Case
Mon 09/24 10:12 AM
CASE REASSIGNED. Your AP case is at issue. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1 this case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-1047 REB. (Text Only Entry) (Case was re-drawn using JD4 Presider deck) (evana, ) Modified on 9/24/2018 (evana, ) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Letter Reassigning Case
Mon 09/24 10:03 AM
CASE REASSIGNED. Your AP case is at issue. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1 this case is randomly reassigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-01047 WYD. (Text Only Entry) (evana, ) |
|
Thursday, September 20, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
admapp
Social Security - Plaintiffs Reply Brief
Thu 09/20 4:24 PM
PLAINTIFF'S REPLY BRIEF re11 Social Security Administrative Record, by Plaintiff Edward Galvez. (Abbott, Teresa) |
|
Friday, September 07, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
admapp
Social Security - Defendants Response Brief
Fri 09/07 1:51 PM
DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE BRIEF re11 Social Security Administrative Record, by Defendant Commissioner, Social Security Administration. (Bellamy, Sara) |
|
Saturday, August 18, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
admapp
Social Security - Plaintiffs Opening Brief
Sat 08/18 2:23 AM
PLAINTIFF'S OPENING BRIEF re11 Social Security Administrative Record, by Plaintiff Edward Galvez. (Abbott, Teresa) |
|
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Joint Case Management Plan
Tue 07/17 7:23 AM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN ORDER for Social Security Cases: SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 8/17/2018; SS Defendants Brief due by 9/7/2018; SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 9/21/2018, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 7/16/2018. (evana, ) |
|
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Proposed Joint Case Management Plan
Fri 07/13 11:39 AM
Proposed Joint Case Management Plan by Plaintiff Edward Galvez. (Abbott, Teresa) |
|
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Social Security Administrative Record
Tue 07/03 11:07 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Defendant Commissioner, Social Security Administration.(Milano, Jessica) |
|
Att: 1 Continuation of Main Document, | ||
Att: 2 Continuation of Main Document, | ||
Att: 3 Continuation of Main Document, | ||
Att: 4 Continuation of Main Document, | ||
Att: 5 Continuation of Main Document, | ||
Att: 6 Continuation of Main Document, | ||
Att: 7 Continuation of Main Document, | ||
Att: 8 Continuation of Main Document, | ||
Att: 9 Continuation of Main Document | ||
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Fri 06/29 1:32 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jessica Milano on behalf of Commissioner, Social Security AdministrationAttorney Jessica Milano added to party Commissioner, Social Security Administration(pty:dft) (Milano, Jessica) |
|
Friday, May 25, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Fri 05/25 1:48 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by J. Benedict Garcia on behalf of Commissioner, Social Security AdministrationAttorney J. Benedict Garcia added to party Commissioner, Social Security Administration(pty:dft) (Garcia, J.) |
|
Friday, May 04, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
4
pgs
order
Order Regarding Instructions for Joint Case Management Plan
Fri 05/04 12:04 PM
ORDER REGARDING INSTRUCTIONS FOR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN for Social Security Cases, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 5/4/2018. (evana, ) |
|
Att: 1 Case Management form | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 05/04 12:03 PM
ORDER Granting2 the Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 5/4/2018. (evana, ) |
|
6 | 6
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings - PUBLIC
Fri 05/04 12:01 PM
Utility Setting Deadlines: Commissioner, Social Security Administration answer due 7/3/2018. Text Only Entry (evana, ) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Magistrate Judge Consent Form
Fri 05/04 9:25 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, ) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Administrative Notice
Fri 05/04 9:25 AM
Administrative Notice: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to the Letter of Agreement signed by the Clerk, U.S. District Court; U.S. Attorneys Office for the District of Colorado (USAO), and Social Security Administration (SSA), service of the initiating document(s) by the plaintiff to the SSA, the U.S. Attorney General, and USAO in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) is not necessary unless the court otherwise orders. A summons is not required and will not be issued. (Text Only Entry) (rvill, ) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Fri 05/04 9:24 AM
Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. Text Only Entry. (rvill, ) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 05/04 9:15 AM
Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Edward Galvez. (Abbott, Teresa) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 05/04 9:13 AM
COMPLAINT AND PETITION FOR REVIEW against Commissioner of Social Security Attorney Teresa H. Abbott added to party Edward Galvez(pty:pla), filed by Edward Galvez.(Abbott, Teresa) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |