RMH Franchise Holdings, Inc.
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:18-bk-11092 |
Case Filed: | May 08, 2018 |
Terminated: | Feb 26, 2019 |
Plan Confirmed: | Dec 13, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 5,001-10,000 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
RMH Franchise Holdings, Inc.
One Concourse Parkway N.E. Suite 600
Atlanta, GA 30328 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 12:57 PM EST |
Attorney
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
|
Represented By
|
Claims Agent
Prime Clerk LLC
www.primeclerk.com 830 Third Avenue 9th Floor
New York, NY 10022 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ohio Edison Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Curtis James Investments
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Nueces County
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Noble County Treasurer
|
|
Creditor
Missouri Department of Revenue
Bankruptcy Unit PO Box 475
Jefferson City, MO 65105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Josephine Merriweather
922 New Road Suite 2
Wilmington, DE 19805 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
McLane Foodservice, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Maricopa County Treasurer
Maricopa County Attorney's Office c/o Peter Muthig 222 North Central Avenue #1100
Phoenix, AZ 85004 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
JIL Investments, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Chamora Ivery
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Hidalgo County
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Harlingen CISD
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Great East Mall, Inc. dba Great East Plaza
Cafaro Management Company 5577 Youngstown-Warren Road
Niles, OH 44446 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Grand Avenue Produce Co., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
GGP Limited Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Fair Harbor Capital, LLC
Ansonia Finance Station PO Box 237037
New York, NY 10023 |
|
Creditor
Everett D. Rivers Family Trust, dated 9/13/1994
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Direct Energy Business LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Gordon Food Service, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Yavapai-Prescott Indian Tribe
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Westfest, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
United States/USAO
U.S. Attorney's Office 1313 N. Market St. Suite 400
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
UNS Gas, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tucson Electric Power Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Toledo Edison Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Lagi Thomas
Guardian of Jessica Cemberci 7059 Longview Dr.
Liberty Township, OH 45011 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Macerich Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The East Ohio Gas Company, d/b/a Dominion East Ohio
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation Shawn M. Christianson 55 Second Street, 17th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Starwood Retail Partners, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Sirna & Sons, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Shelton's Farm Market
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
San Patricio County
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Salt River Project
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
STORE SPE Applebee's 2013-1, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
STORE Master Funding II, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pennsylvania Power Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
AppleLAND II, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cameron County
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
CRI Outparcels, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Jami Brown (McKee)
6446 E Hobart St.
Mesa, AZ 85205 |
|
Creditor
Brixmor Property Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Braeburn Investment Group, LLP
1297 E. Calvin Dr.
Hartsburg, MO 65039 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
BlueRoad Ventures, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bank of America, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Arizona Public Service Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cooley LLP
101 California St 5th Fl
San Francisco, CA 94111 |
|
Creditor
Amur Equipment Finance, Inc.
308 N. Locust St.
Grand Island, NE 68801 |
|
Creditor
American Electric Power
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Allen County Treasurer
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Agree Pensacola Nine Mile LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Agree Pensacola LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Agree Harlingen LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
ARC NPHUBOH001, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
5928 SW 17th, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
5605 Second Avenue, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Carolyn Rivers and Everett D. Rivers, Trustees for the Everett D. Rivers Family Trust, dated 9/13/1994
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cornhusker Bank
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Constellation NewEnergy, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
CenterPoint Energy Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Constellation NewEnergy Gas Division, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Commonwealth Edison Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
City of Weslaco, Weslaco ISD, & Edinburg CISD
3301 Northland Dr, Suite 505
Austin, TX 78731 |
|
Creditor
Kimberly Chrisman
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
City of McAllen
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Marvin Chrisman
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
City of Harlingen
|
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Ronald J Bommer and Camvic Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Jennifer Carol Marshall individually and as Executrix of Estate of Kenneth Marshall
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
WRI Trautmann, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
VPQCM, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Dine Brands Global Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
US Foods, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
ACON Investments LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
ARC CAFEUSA001, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
JMAC Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Brookfield Property REIT Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
FX Net Lease Holdings LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
JBJ Alt LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Fortress Credit Co. LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Tasha Dellagatta
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
City of Wichita Falls, Wichita Falls Independent School District and Wichita County
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Starwood Retail Partners LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
McCoy's Upholstery Service
|
|
Interested Party
Brixmor Operating Partnership L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Applebee's Franchisor LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Applebee's Restaurants LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Power & Ray, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Spec. Counsel
Witmer Karp Warner & Ryan LLP
|
Represented By
|
Transcriber
Reliable Companies
1007 North Orange Street Suite 110
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Creditor
Cafaro Management Company
Terminated: 05/10/2018
5577 Youngstown-Warren Rd
Niles, OH 44446 |
Represented By
|
1. | Big Applebee's franchisee with 163 stores files bankruptcy (stltoday.com) |
Submitted Wed 05/09/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 11 minutes ago |