Kimberly Jones
New Jersey Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 13 | |
Judge: | Vincent F Papalia |
Case #: | 2:18-bk-19397 |
Case Filed: | May 08, 2018 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jun 05, 2018 |
Claims Deadline: | Jul 17, 2018 |
Debtor
Kimberly Jones
1 Penn Plz Ste 440
New York,, NY 10119 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Thursday Jun 21, 2018 1:24 PM EDT |
Creditor
MTGLQ Investors, LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
RUSHMORE LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC, as servicer for MTGLQ INVESTORS, LP.
|
Represented By
|
Trustee
Marie-Ann Greenberg
Chapter 13 Standing Trustee 30 Two Bridges Rd Suite 330
Fairfield, NJ 07004 |
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102 |
1. | Rapper Lil Kim May Have Bankruptcy Claim Dismissed (xxlmag.com) |
Submitted Thu 06/21/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 06/21/2018 1:22 PM EDT |
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)([LINK 18-19397 ) [misc,volp13a] ( 310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A36304264, fee amount $ 310.00. (U.S. Treasury) | ||
1 | 1 Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Filed by Daniel E. Straffi on behalf of Kimberly Jones. Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (122C-1) Due 05/22/2018.Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income(122C-2) Due 05/22/2018.Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income (122C-2), If Applicable Due 05/22/2018. Chapter 13 Plan due by 05/22/2018. Schedule(s) due 05/22/2018.Statement of Financial Affairs for Individuals due 05/22/2018.Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information for Individuals due 05/22/2018. Incomplete Filings due by 05/22/2018. (Straffi, Daniel) | |
2 | 2 Certificate of Credit Counseling filed by Daniel E. Straffi on behalf of Kimberly Jones. (Straffi, Daniel) | |
4 | 4 Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets/Liabilities and Stat Info, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors, Statement of Financial Affairs For Individuals, Statement of Your Current Monthly Income & Calc of Commitment Period(122C-1), Calculation of Your Disposable Income (122C-2) - If Applicable, Ch. 13 Plan and Motions (LOCAL FORM), Schedules A/B,C,G,H,I,J,. If an objection is filed a hearing will be held on: June 7, 2018 at 11:00 am Courtroom 3B. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 5/8/2018. Objection to Order to Show Cause due by 5/22/2018. (dlr) Modified on 5/9/2018 (dlr). |