LAWSON v. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | C Darnell Jones, II |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-01912 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | May 07, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Nov 03, 2018 6:08 AM EDT |
Defendant
FRANCES BECKLEY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
FRANK BRESLIN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
IOLA HARPER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ARNIE HARRIS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HARRIS & HARRIS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TINA LAWSON
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, March 02, 2020 | ||
46 | 46
2
pgs
order
Memorandum and/or Opinion Order Order Dismissing Case
Tue 03/03 12:34 PM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, FRANK BRESLIN, FRANCES BECKLEY, AND IOLA HARPERS MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS I THROUGH III IS GRANTED; PLAINTIFF SHALL NOT BE AFFORDED LEAVE TO AMEND COUNTS I THROUGH III; THE COURT DECLINES TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER THE REMAINING STATE LAW CLAIMS (COUNTS IV THROUGH XVII)1WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO PLAINTIFFS RIGHT TO RAISE SAME IN STATE COURT; DEFENDANT HARRIS MOTION TO DISMISS (ECF NO.39 ) IS DENIED AS MOOT; AND, THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS MATTER CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 3/2/20. 3/3/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) |
|
45 | 45
14
pgs
order
Memorandum and/or Opinion
Tue 03/03 12:21 PM
MEMORANDUM SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 3/2/20. 3/3/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) (Main Document 45 replaced on 3/3/2020) (md, ). (Main Document 45 replaced on 3/3/2020) (md, ) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2019 | ||
44 | 44
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 08/20 12:04 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by FRANCES BECKLEY, FRANK BRESLIN, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, IOLA HARPER. (GONZALES, JOHN) |
|
Friday, June 21, 2019 | ||
43 | 43
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 06/21 11:33 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Rule 12 (b)(6) filed by TINA LAWSON.(JALON, ANDRES) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Judge's Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2-Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, June 19, 2019 | ||
42 | 42
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 06/19 12:34 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re39 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Rule 12 (b)(6) filed by TINA LAWSON. (JALON, ANDRES) |
|
Tuesday, June 18, 2019 | ||
41 | 41
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 06/19 12:26 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re39 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Rule 12 (b)(6) filed by TINA LAWSON.(JALON, ANDRES) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Order, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2-Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3-Signed Joint Venture | ||
Monday, June 17, 2019 | ||
40 | 40
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 06/17 3:22 PM
NOTICE by ARNIE HARRIS OF STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL BY ALL PARTIES WITH RESPECT TO ARNIE HARRIS (LUDWIG, STEVEN) |
|
Tuesday, May 28, 2019 | ||
39 | 39
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Tue 05/28 8:01 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ARNIE HARRIS, HARRIS & HARRIS.Memorandum.(LUDWIG, STEVEN) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
38 | 38
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/28 7:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW M. MACDONALD on behalf of ARNIE HARRIS, HARRIS & HARRIS with Certificate of Service(MACDONALD, ANDREW) |
|
37 | 37
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Tue 05/28 2:08 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by FRANCES BECKLEY, FRANK BRESLIN, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, IOLA HARPER.Memorandum of Law and Certificate of Service.(GONZALES, JOHN) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A-B, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit C Part 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C Part 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C Part 3 | ||
Monday, May 13, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 05/14 4:46 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against FRANCES BECKLEY, FRANK BRESLIN, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, IOLA HARPER, ARNIE HARRIS, HARRIS & HARRIS, filed by TINA LAWSON. Jury Demand. Exhibits.(va, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Saturday, May 11, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
motion
Amend/Correct
Sat 05/11 10:45 PM
Second MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by TINA LAWSON.Second Amended Complaint.(JALON, ANDRES) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits | ||
Tuesday, April 16, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines
Tue 04/16 5:19 PM
ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT BY 5/13/2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 4/12/19. 4/16/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
Mon 04/15 11:50 AM
ORDER DENYING32 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 4/11/19. 4/15/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Reconsideration
Fri 03/15 2:55 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re28 Memorandum and/or Opinion,29 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion), filed by ARNIE HARRIS, HARRIS & HARRIS.Memorandum of Law in Support, Certificate of Service.(LUDWIG, STEVEN) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Memorandum of Law, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Joint Venture Agreement, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B - July, 2016 email from t. Lawson with Joint Venture Agreement draft | ||
Thursday, March 14, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Fri 03/15 11:26 AM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION IS GRANTED AND PLAINTIFF IS GRANTED LEAVE TO AMEND WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE FOLLOWING, OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 3/13/2019.3/15/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
Wednesday, March 13, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines
Thu 03/14 12:19 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER HAT THE HARRIS DEFENDANTS SHALL HAVE UNTIL MARCH 15, 2019 TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION REGARDING THE COURT'S ORDER DENYING THE MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION (DOCKET#28 ;29 ). SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 3/13/19. 3/14/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) |
|
Monday, February 25, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
1
pgs
order
Memorandum and/or Opinion Order
Mon 02/25 5:17 PM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS ARNIE HARRIS AND HARRIS & HARRIS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION (ECF NO.18 ) MOTION IS DENIED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THIS COURTS ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS BECKLEY, BRESLIN, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA AND HARPERS MOTION TO STAY THE PROCEEDINGS PENDING ARBITRATION (ECF NO.26 ) IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 2/22/19. 2/25/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) |
|
28 | 28
14
pgs
order
Memorandum and/or Opinion
Mon 02/25 5:12 PM
MEMORANDUM SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 2/22/19. 2/25/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) |
|
Monday, February 11, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 02/11 1:08 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re26 MOTION to Stay the Proceedings Pending Arbitration filed by TINA LAWSON.(JALON, ANDRES) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Memorandum, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit | ||
Tuesday, September 04, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Stay
Tue 09/04 12:49 PM
MOTION to Stay the Proceedings Pending Arbitration filed by FRANCES BECKLEY, FRANK BRESLIN, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, IOLA HARPER.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(GONZALES, JOHN) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Memorandum, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B | ||
Friday, August 24, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
11
pgs
respm
Memorandum
Mon 08/27 11:44 AM
REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF18 MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF HARRIS & HARRIS, LTD. AND ARNOLD HARRIS, filed by ARNIE HARRIS, HARRIS & HARRIS. (va, ) |
|
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Mon 08/27 11:37 AM
ORDER GRANTING23 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 8/24/18. 8/27/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) |
|
Friday, August 17, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 08/17 5:53 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re18 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by ARNIE HARRIS, HARRIS & HARRIS.(LUDWIG, STEVEN) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Brief Reply Brief | ||
Friday, August 10, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 08/10 9:41 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re18 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by TINA LAWSON.(JALON, ANDRES) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Denying Motion to Compel Arbitration by Plaintiff Tina Lawson, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibits for Motion to Compel Arb_ | ||
21 | 21
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 08/10 8:51 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re18 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by TINA LAWSON.(JALON, ANDRES) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Motion to Compel Arbitration by Defense, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibits for Motion to Compel Arb_ | ||
Tuesday, July 31, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
order
Stipulation and Order
Wed 08/01 1:00 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF RESPOND TO MOTION TO COMPEL BY 8/10/18. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 7/24/18. 8/1/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) |
|
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 08/01 3:06 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to18 MOTION to Compel Arbitration . RESPONSES DUE BY 8/10/2018. (va, ) |
||
Sunday, July 29, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Response to Motion
Sun 07/29 12:16 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by TINA LAWSON.(JALON, ANDRES) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Executive Order 3-12, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Executive Order 9-17, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Memo to Deputy Mayor Lazer | ||
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Compel
Mon 07/16 12:44 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by ARNIE HARRIS, HARRIS & HARRIS.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(LUDWIG, STEVEN) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Memorandum, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 07/13 4:08 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT ALL PARTIES, BY AND THROUGH THEIR UNDERSIGNED COUNSEL, THAT THE DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS BY DEFENDANTS IS EXTENDED TO JULY 28, 2018. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 7/13/18. 7/13/18 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) |
|
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Fri 06/29 2:24 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by FRANCES BECKLEY, FRANK BRESLIN, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, IOLA HARPER.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(GONZALES, JOHN) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A(1), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A(2) | ||
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
discov
Disclosure Statement Form 7.1
Wed 06/06 3:46 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by HARRIS & HARRIS.(LUDWIG, STEVEN) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 06/06 3:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN K. LUDWIG on behalf of ARNIE HARRIS, HARRIS & HARRIS with Certificate of Service(LUDWIG, STEVEN) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 06/06 3:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT L. VERNICK on behalf of ARNIE HARRIS, HARRIS & HARRIS with Certificate of Service(VERNICK, SCOTT) |
|
Thursday, May 31, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Affidavit
Mon 06/04 11:25 AM
AFFIDAVIT by TINA LAWSON. (jaa, ) |
|
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 05/30 2:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL L. TURNER on behalf of FRANCES BECKLEY, FRANK BRESLIN, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, IOLA HARPER with Certificate of Service(TURNER, MICHAEL) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 05/30 2:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH J. SANTARONE, JR on behalf of FRANCES BECKLEY, FRANK BRESLIN, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, IOLA HARPER with Certificate of Service(SANTARONE, JOSEPH) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 05/30 2:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN P. GONZALES on behalf of FRANCES BECKLEY, FRANK BRESLIN, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, IOLA HARPER with Certificate of Service(GONZALES, JOHN) |
|
Thursday, May 24, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 05/24 2:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN SCHATZ on behalf of TINA LAWSON (SCHATZ, STEVEN) |
|
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 05/24 9:46 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TINA LAWSON. ARNIE HARRIS waiver sent on 5/21/2018, answer due 7/20/2018. (JALON, ANDRES) |
|
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 05/24 9:45 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TINA LAWSON. HARRIS & HARRIS waiver sent on 5/21/2018, answer due 7/20/2018. (JALON, ANDRES) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Unexecuted
Thu 05/24 9:25 AM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by TINA LAWSON as to IOLA HARPER. (JALON, ANDRES) |
|
4 | 4
service
Affidavit of Service
Thu 05/24 9:22 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Joseph Connelly re: served SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, CIVIL COVER LETTER, DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, EXHIBIT A upon City of Philadelphia by Person in Charge on 05/22/18 (JALON, ANDRES) |
|
3 | 3
service
Affidavit of Service
Thu 05/24 9:21 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Joseph Connelly re: served SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, CIVIL COVER LETTER, DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, EXHIBIT A upon Frank Breslin by Person in Charge on 05-22-18 (JALON, ANDRES) |
|
2 | 2
service
Affidavit of Service
Thu 05/24 9:19 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Joseph Connelly re: served SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, CIVIL COVER LETTER, DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, EXHIBIT A upon Frances Beckley, Esquire by Person in Charge on 05-22-18 (JALON, ANDRES) |
|
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
service
Summons Issued
Tue 05/08 4:13 PM
Summons Issued as to FRANCES BECKLEY, FRANK BRESLIN, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, IOLA HARPER, ARNIE HARRIS, HARRIS & HARRIS. Six (6) summons forwarded to counsel on 5/8/18 (mbh, ) |
||
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 05/08 4:05 PM
Complaint against TINA LAWSON, FRANK BRESLIN, FRANCES BECKLEY, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, IOLA HARPER and ARNIE HARRIS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE177993) filed by TINA LAWSON.(mbh, ) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Case Managment Track form, | ||
Att: 3 Designation form | ||
misc
Jury Demand
Tue 05/08 4:16 PM
Demand for Trial by Jury. (mbh, ) |