Williams-Hampton v. Janssen Research & Development LLC et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Eldon E Fallon |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-04677 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death |
Case Filed: | May 08, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 03, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday Nov 04, 2018 3:32 AM CST |
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
SOP Department Corporation Service Company 2711 Centerville Rd, Ste 400
Wilimgton, DE 19808 |
|
Defendant
Bayer Pharma AG
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Ortho LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
CT Corporation System 116 Pine Street, Suite 320
Harrisburg, PA 17101 |
|
Defendant
Bayer AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Bayer HealthCare AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer HealthCare LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Research & Development LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Delores Williams-Hampton
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, November 03, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 11/03 10:53 AM
ORDER Dismissing Case with Prejudice - originally filed as rec. doc. 17884 in master case 14-md-2592. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/20/2020.(caa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, May 14, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
30+
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association
Mon 05/14 3:06 PM
PRETRIAL ORDERS #1 - #31. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon.(ADI) |
|
Wednesday, May 09, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 05/09 10:37 AM
Summons Issued as to Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson Company. (tk) |
|
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Tue 05/08 11:22 AM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Fee previously paid) filed by Delores Williams-Hampton.(Bradley, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Bayer Pharma AG, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Janssen Ortho LLC, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Janssen Research & Development, | ||
Att: 6 Summons Johnson & Johnson | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Tue 05/08 11:04 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 05/08 10:38 AM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6849446) filed by Delores Williams-Hampton.Attorney Edward Ryan Bradley added to party Delores Williams-Hampton(pty:pla).(Bradley, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Summons to Bayer Healthcare Pharma, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Summons Bayer Pharma AG, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Summons Janssen Ortho LLC, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Summons Janssen Pharmaceuticals, | ||
Att: 6 Summons Janssen Research & Development, | ||
Att: 7 Summons Summons Johnson & Johnson |