United States of America v. California Stem Cell Treatment Center, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Jesus G Bernal |
Referred: | Kenly Kiya Kato |
Case #: | 5:18-cv-01005 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:0053(b) Prelim & Perm Inj Relief & Other Equitable Rel |
Case Filed: | May 09, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 30, 2022 |
Last checked: Friday Jul 17, 2020 7:20 PM PDT |
Defendant
California Stem Cell Treatment Center, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cell Surgical Network Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mark Berman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Elliott B. Lander
|
Represented By
|
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Jessica Kurzban
|
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, February 03, 2023 | ||
219 | 219
textonly
Notice of Filing Transcript
Fri 02/03 5:24 PM
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 1/13/20, 7/13/20, 10/19/20, 4/5/21, 4/26/21, 5/4/21, 5/5/21, 5/6/21, 5/7/21, 5/11/21, 5/12/21 re Transcript211 ,209 ,214 ,210 ,217 ,212 ,218 ,208 ,216 ,213 ,215 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Preston, Phyllis) |
|
218 | 218
transcript
-Transcript
Fri 02/03 5:22 PM
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 5/12/21. Court Reporter: Phyllis Preston, stenojag@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/24/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/6/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2023. (Preston, Phyllis) |
|
217 | 217
transcript
-Transcript
Fri 02/03 5:21 PM
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 5/11/21. Court Reporter: Phyllis Preston, stenojag@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/24/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/6/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2023. (Preston, Phyllis) |
|
216 | 216
transcript
-Transcript
Fri 02/03 5:19 PM
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 5/7/21. Court Reporter: Phyllis Preston, stenojag@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/24/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/6/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2023. (Preston, Phyllis) |
|
215 | 215
transcript
-Transcript
Fri 02/03 5:18 PM
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 5/6/21. Court Reporter: Phyllis Preston, stenojag@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/24/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/6/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2023. (Preston, Phyllis) |
|
214 | 214
transcript
-Transcript
Fri 02/03 5:15 PM
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 5/5/21. Court Report: Phyllis Preston, stenojag@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/24/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/6/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2023. (Preston, Phyllis) |
|
213 | 213
transcript
-Transcript
Fri 02/03 5:13 PM
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 5/4/21. Court Reporter: Phyllis Preston, stenojag@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/24/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/6/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2023. (Preston, Phyllis) |
|
212 | 212
transcript
-Transcript
Fri 02/03 5:11 PM
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 4/26/21. Court Reporter: Phyllis Preston, stenojag@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/24/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/6/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2023. (Preston, Phyllis) |
|
211 | 211
transcript
-Transcript
Fri 02/03 5:09 PM
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 4/5/21. Court Reporter: Phyllis Preston, stenojag@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/24/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/6/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2023. (Preston, Phyllis) |
|
210 | 210
transcript
-Transcript
Fri 02/03 5:08 PM
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 10/19/20. Court Reporter: Phyllis Preston, stenojag@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/24/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/6/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2023. (Preston, Phyllis) |
|
209 | 209
transcript
-Transcript
Fri 02/03 5:07 PM
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 7/13/20. Court Reporter: Phyllis Preston, stenojag@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/24/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/6/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2023. (Preston, Phyllis) |
|
208 | 208
transcript
-Transcript
Fri 02/03 5:05 PM
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 1/13/20. Court Reporter: Phyllis Preston, stenojag@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/24/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/6/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2023. (Preston, Phyllis) |