Granberry et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
West Virginia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph R Goodwin |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00907 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | May 09, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 09, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 19, 2019 7:42 PM EDT |
Defendant
Ethicon, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Curtis Granberry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terri Renee Granberry
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Thursday, May 09, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Dismiss
Thu 05/09 3:39 PM
ORDER granting5 JOINT MOTION by James Curtis Granberry, Terri Renee Granberry, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss Without Prejudice; no other defendants remain, each party to bear their or its own costs. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/9/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (kew) |
|
Tuesday, May 07, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss
Tue 05/07 5:41 PM
JOINT MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss Without Prejudice. (Gage, William) |
|
Monday, February 04, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
order
Pretrial Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Thu 02/07 4:17 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER # 328 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 11 Cases) The cases on Exhibit A are: 1. removed from the pending inactive docket; and 2. placed on the active docket. As to the cases on Exhibits A and B: 1. The cases are no longer eligible for return to the inactive docket nor may notices of settlement be filed to relieve the parties from scheduling deadlines ; 2. To the extent other defendants, in addition to Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson, are named in the cases on Exhibits A and B, the deadlines below also apply to them; 3. The Clerk will file this Docket Control Order in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in the main MDL, every case listed on Exhibits A and B (hereinafter referred to as "Wave 11 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order.; and 4. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Ethicon Wave 11 cases with one important exception. If any of the cases on any exhibit were previously on a docket control order and dispositive and Daubert deadlines had passed before such cases became inactive, the parties may not file or refile dispositive or Daubert motions without first seeking leave of court for good cause shown. A. SCHEDULING DEADLINES. . The following deadlines shall apply in all Ethicon Wave 11 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due 02/15/2019; Defendant Fact Sheets due 02/22/2019; Deadline for written discovery requests due 03/25/2019; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs due 05/24/2019; Expert disclosure served by defendants due 06/24/2019; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal due 07/01/2019; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due 08/01/2019; Filing of dispositive motions due 08/14/2019; Response to dispositive motions due 08/28/2019; Reply to response to dispositive motions due 09/04/2019; Filing of Daubert motions due 08/14/2019; Responses to Daubert motions due 08/29/2019; Reply to response to Daubert motions due 09/05/2019. B. MOTION PRACTICE. 3. Confidential Documents. Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 6/27/2019, and any response is due by 7/11/2019. Any reply is due by 7/18/2019. The court expects full compliance with Local Rule of Civil Procedure 26.4(c). C. CASES READY FOR TRANSFER, REMAND OR TRIAL 1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 7/8/2019, the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 7/15/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 2/4/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 11 cases identified on Exhibits A and B) (brn) (ADI) |
|
Monday, June 04, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice Of Attorney Appearance - ETHICON, INC. MDL CASE ONLY
Mon 06/04 10:45 AM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Susan M. Robinson on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Robinson, Susan) |
|
Friday, May 11, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
order
Pretrial Order 297 - ETHICON MDL MEMBER CASE ONLY
Fri 05/11 9:05 AM
TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 297 (Instructions for the Filing of an Election Form for Non-Revision Gynecare TVT Products Cases) entered on 05/02/2018 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (mmw) |
|
Wednesday, May 09, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 05/10 10:44 AM
SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-6477675. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mh) |