Stewart v. Dollar General Corporation et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Harold L Murphy |
Case #: | 4:18-cv-00111 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | May 11, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 18, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 07, 2018 4:19 AM EST |
Defendant
Jane Doe 1
|
|
Defendant
Jane Doe 2
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 1
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 2
|
|
Defendant
Dolgencorp, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Anne Stewart
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Thursday, July 18, 2019 | ||
40 | 40
misc
Judgment - Clerk
Thu 07/18 3:45 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Dolgencorp, LLC against Patricia Anne Stewart for costs of action. (dob) |
|
39 | 39
29
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Thu 07/18 3:32 PM
ORDER granting34 Motion for Summary Judgment and dismissing claims against Defendant Dolgencorp, LLC and dismissing without prejudice claims against Defendants John Doe 1, John doe 2, Jane Doe 1, and Jane Doe 2. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 7/18/2019. (dob) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Thu 07/18 3:46 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (dob) |
||
Thursday, July 11, 2019 | ||
utility
Submission to District Judge
Thu 07/11 8:42 AM
Submission of34 MOTION for Summary Judgment, to District Judge Harold L. Murphy. (bjh) |
||
Wednesday, July 10, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
respm
Response to Statement of Material Facts
Wed 07/10 6:53 PM
Response to Statement of Material Facts re34 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants Reply to Plaintiffs Additional Statement of Material Fact filed by Dolgencorp, LLC. (Morton, Erica) |
|
37 | 37
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Wed 07/10 6:47 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re34 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Dolgencorp, LLC. (Morton, Erica) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 06/26 3:09 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re34 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Patricia Anne Stewart.(Satcher, James) |
|
Att: 1 Statement of Material Facts Plaintiffs' Response, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Plaintiff, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit | ||
Friday, June 07, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
utility
Remark
Fri 06/07 2:53 PM
Clerk received disk of video re34 -9 MOTION for Summary Judgment and placed in case file. (dob) |
|
Thursday, June 06, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
motion
Summary Judgment
Thu 06/06 4:33 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by Dolgencorp, LLC.(Morton, Erica) |
|
Att: 1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant Dolgencorp, LLCs Motion for Summary Judgment, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit EDefendant's Exhibit 1 (Deposition Excerpts), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Defendant's Exhibit 2 (Affidavit of Charles Ray), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Defendant's Exhibit 3 (checks), | ||
Att: 5 Statement of Material Facts Defendants Statement of Material Facts to Which There Is No Genuine Issue To Be Tried and Theories Denying Recovery, | ||
Att: 6 Notice of Filing Original Discovery, | ||
Att: 7 Deposition of Patricia Stewart, | ||
Att: 8 Request for Oral Argument, | ||
Att: 9 Notice of Manual Filing | ||
Wednesday, May 29, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Leave of Absence
Wed 05/29 3:05 PM
Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 07/01/19-07/05/19,10/24/19-10/29/19,11/06/19-11/08/19,11/15/19, by Erica L. Morton. (Morton, Erica) |
|
Friday, May 10, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
discov
Certificate of Service
Fri 05/10 5:40 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Dolgencorp, LLC.(Morton, Erica) |
|
Wednesday, May 08, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 05/08 11:57 AM
ORDER granting30 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney William H. Stoll, LLC terminated. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 5/8/2019. (dob) Modified on 5/8/2019 to edit applicable attorney (dob) |
|
Monday, May 06, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Withdraw As Attorney
Mon 05/06 10:42 AM
MOTION to Withdraw William H. Stoll, LLC as Attorney with Brief In Support by Patricia Anne Stewart. (Satcher, James) Modified on 5/6/2019 to edit atty's name (bjh) |
|
Friday, May 03, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice to Take Deposition
Fri 05/03 7:37 PM
Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Patricia Stewart filed by Dolgencorp, LLC (Morton, Erica) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice to Take Deposition
Tue 04/30 4:50 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dickey Stewart filed by Dolgencorp, LLC (Morton, Erica) |
|
27 | 27
notice
Notice to Take Deposition
Tue 04/30 4:50 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Patricia Stewart filed by Dolgencorp, LLC (Morton, Erica) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
discov
Certificate of Service
Wed 04/03 10:14 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 26.3 Certificate by Dolgencorp, LLC.(Morton, Erica) |
|
Friday, February 08, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
discov
Certificate of Service
Fri 02/08 7:31 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 26.3 Certificate by Dolgencorp, LLC.(Morton, Erica) |
|
Friday, February 01, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
discov
Certificate of Service
Fri 02/01 6:29 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Defendant Dolgencorp, LLCs Offer of Settlement Pursuant to O.C.G.A. § 9-11-68 by Dolgencorp, LLC.(Morton, Erica) |
|
Thursday, January 31, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Thu 01/31 2:54 PM
ORDER granting22 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery ends on 5/12/2019. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 1/31/2019. (dob) |
|
Monday, January 28, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Mon 01/28 10:04 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery with Proposed Order by Dolgencorp, LLC.(Morton, Erica) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Ex A: Proposed Order to Extend Discovery | ||
Monday, December 31, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
discov
Certificate of Service
Mon 12/31 2:43 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE DEFENDANT'S POD REQUEST by Patricia Anne Stewart.(Satcher, James) |
|
20 | 20
discov
Certificate of Service
Mon 12/31 2:38 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re17 Certificate of Service DISCOVERY by Patricia Anne Stewart.(Satcher, James) |
|
Friday, December 14, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Fri 12/14 11:33 AM
ORDER Granting Plaintiffs'18 Consented Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Defendants' First Discovery Request until 1/1/2019. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 12/14/18. (bjh) |
|
Thursday, December 13, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Thu 12/13 5:17 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery with Brief In Support by Patricia Anne Stewart.(Satcher, James) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, November 14, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
discov
Certificate of Service
Wed 11/14 9:07 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dolgencorp, LLC.(Morton, Erica) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Leave of Absence
Wed 11/14 9:05 PM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 02/01/2019,02/04/2019 to 02/08/2019,02/11/2019,03/27/2019 to 03/29/2019,04/05/19,04/08/2019, by Erica L. Morton. (Morton, Erica) |
|
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend
Fri 10/12 4:43 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion to Amend. The Court directs counsel for Plaintiff to file the proposed Amended Complaint attached as an exhibit to the Motion electronically with the Clerk within 14 days after the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 10/12/2018. (dob) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Amend
Fri 10/12 11:39 AM
First MOTION to Amend Complaint with Brief In Support by Patricia Anne Stewart.(Satcher, James) |
|
Att: 1 First Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, October 05, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
discov
Initial Disclosures
Fri 10/05 1:33 PM
First Initial Disclosures by Patricia Anne Stewart.(Satcher, James) |
|
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
discov
Certificate of Service
Mon 07/02 6:54 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Rule 26.3 Certificate of NPRPD) by Dolgencorp, LLC.(Morton, Erica) |
|
Friday, June 22, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 06/22 7:58 PM
NOTICE by Dolgencorp, LLC of Intent to Serve Subpoenas on Non-Parties (Morton, Erica) |
|
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 06/12 2:31 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re:6 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 2/11/2019. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 6/11/2018. (dob) |
|
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Party
Mon 06/11 4:03 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion to Substitute Party, Dolgencorp, LLC for Dollar General Corpoation. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 6/11/2018. (dob) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Substitute Party
Mon 06/11 2:46 PM
Consent MOTION to Substitute Party Dolgencorp, LLC d/b/a Dollar General in place of Dollar General Corporationby Dollar General Corporation.(Morton, Erica) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order Substituting Party Defendant | ||
7 | 7
discov
Initial Disclosures
Mon 06/11 2:40 PM
Initial Disclosures by Dollar General Corporation.(Morton, Erica) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Dec Page (DG Excess Policy) | ||
6 | 6
misc
Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan
Mon 06/11 2:38 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Dollar General Corporation. (Morton, Erica) |
|
Friday, May 18, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 05/18 4:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Satcher, Jr on behalf of Patricia Anne Stewart (Satcher, James) |
|
Thursday, May 17, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Clerks Notation for LOA/CIP
Thu 05/17 4:13 PM
Clerks Notation re3 Certificate of Interested Persons approved by Judge Harold L Murphy on 5/17/2018. (dob) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons
Thu 05/17 3:10 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Dollar General Corporation. (Morton, Erica) |
|
Friday, May 11, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
answer
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Fri 05/11 4:54 PM
ANSWER to1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Dollar General Corporation. Discovery ends on 10/9/2018.(dob) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 05/11 4:51 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT, filed by Dollar General Corporation. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-7874563)(dob) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |