California Northern District Court
Judge:Edward J Davila
Referred: Virginia K Demarchi
Case #: 5:18-cv-02813
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause15:2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Case Filed:May 11, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 07, 2018 12:54 AM PST
Defendant
Apple Inc.
Represented By
Purvi Govindlal Patel
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Penelope Athene Preovolos
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Kelsey Marie Stricker
Morrison And Foerster LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kyle Barbaro
Represented By
Adam E. Polk
Girard Sharp LLP
contact info
Andrew William Ferich
Chimicles And Tikellis LLP
contact info
Benjamin F. Johns
Chimicles & Tikellis LLP
contact info
Simon Seiver Grille
Girard Sharp LLP
contact info
Daniel C. Girard
Girard Sharp LLP
contact info
Steven Alan Schwartz
Chimicles And Tikellis, LLP
contact info
Angelica Maria Ornelas
Girard Sharp LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Zixuan Rao
Represented By
Adam E. Polk
Girard Sharp LLP
contact info
Andrew William Ferich
Chimicles And Tikellis LLP
contact info
Benjamin F. Johns
Chimicles & Tikellis LLP
contact info
Simon Seiver Grille
Girard Sharp LLP
contact info
Daniel C. Girard
Girard Sharp LLP
contact info
Steven Alan Schwartz
Chimicles And Tikellis, LLP
contact info
Angelica Maria Ornelas
Girard Sharp LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Joey Baruch
Represented By
Esther Shinjung Kim
Attorney At Law
contact info
Noah M. Schubert
Schubert Jonckheer & Kolbe LLP
contact info
Robert C. Schubert
Schubert Jonckheer & Kolbe LLP
contact info
Daniel C. Girard
Girard Sharp LLP
contact info
Willem F. Jonckheer
Schubert Jonckheer & Kolbe LLP
contact info
Angelica Maria Ornelas
Girard Sharp LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Diego Binatena
Represented By
Scott Craig Borison
contact info
E. Michelle Drake
Berger & Montague, P.C.
contact info
Joseph C Hashmall
Berger & Montague, P.C.
contact info
Daniel C. Girard
Girard Sharp LLP
contact info
Angelica Maria Ornelas
Girard Sharp LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Steve Eakin
Represented By
Daniel C. Girard
Girard Sharp LLP
contact info
Angelica Maria Ornelas
Girard Sharp LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Lorenzo Ferguson
Represented By
Daniel C. Girard
Girard Sharp LLP
contact info
Angelica Maria Ornelas
Girard Sharp LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Benjamin Gulker
Represented By
Daniel C. Girard
Girard Sharp LLP
contact info
Angelica Maria Ornelas
Girard Sharp LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Hopkins
Represented By
Daniel C. Girard
Girard Sharp LLP
contact info
Angelica Maria Ornelas
Girard Sharp LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kevin Kou
13002 Parkview Dr
Baldwin Park, CA 91706
Represented By
Esfand Nafisi
Migliaccio & Rathod LLP
contact info
Daniel C. Girard
Girard Sharp LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Adam Lee
Represented By
Daniel C. Girard
Girard Sharp LLP
contact info
Angelica Maria Ornelas
Girard Sharp LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher Martin
Represented By
Esther Shinjung Kim
Attorney At Law
contact info
Noah M. Schubert
Schubert Jonckheer & Kolbe LLP
contact info
Robert C. Schubert
Schubert Jonckheer & Kolbe LLP
contact info
Daniel C. Girard
Girard Sharp LLP
contact info
Willem F. Jonckheer
Schubert Jonckheer & Kolbe LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kevin Melkowski
Represented By
Daniel C. Girard
Girard Sharp LLP
contact info
Angelica Maria Ornelas
Girard Sharp LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Remy Turner
Represented By
Esther Shinjung Kim
Attorney At Law
contact info
Noah M. Schubert
Schubert Jonckheer & Kolbe LLP
contact info
Robert C. Schubert
Schubert Jonckheer & Kolbe LLP
contact info
Daniel C. Girard
Girard Sharp LLP
contact info
Willem F. Jonckheer
Schubert Jonckheer & Kolbe LLP
contact info

GPO Feb 19 2019
Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 85 Discovery Letter Brief re Apple's Responses to Plaintiffs' Interrogatories. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
GPO Feb 26 2019
appearances via CourtCall (866-582-6878). (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2019)Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 87 Discovery Letter Brief. Discovery Telephone Conference set for 3/12/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Parties shall arrange for
GPO Apr 22 2019
Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part 72 Motion to Dismiss Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila.(ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2019)
GPO Dec 02 2019
REDACTED Public Version of 164 Order Denying 130 Motion to Dismiss Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/22/2019.(ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
GPO Jan 17 2020
Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi terminating 170 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re 30(b)(6) Depositions; granting 169 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
GPO Mar 09 2020
Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting 189 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Clawback. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
GPO Mar 17 2020
Discovery Order re 190 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Clawback. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 3/17/2020. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2020)
Docket last updated: 03/29/2020 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, March 20, 2020
203 203 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 03/20 5:29 PM
Order granting 202 Stipulation Modifying Case Management Deadlines. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/20/2020. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
202 202 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 03/20 3:53 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re178 Case Management Scheduling Order,,,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,, filed by Apple Inc..(Vetesi, Claudia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Vetesi Declaration In Support of Joint Stipulation,
Att: 2 Polk Declaration In Support of Joint Stipulation,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Sat 03/21 2:27 PM
***Set Deadlines/Hearings per ECF203 Order: Class Certification Expert Discovery due by 10/28/2020. Opening Reports as to Class Certification due by 8/14/2020. Rebuttal Reports as to Class Certification due by 9/28/2020. Class Certification Motion due by 8/14/2020. Responses due by 9/28/2020. Replies due by 10/28/2020. Class Certification Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Joint Trial Setting Conference Statement due by 12/7/2020. Trial Setting Conference set for 12/17/2020 11:00 AM. (amkS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 17, 2020
201 201 misc Transcript Order Tue 03/17 10:44 AM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/10/2020 before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi by Apple Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Vetesi, Claudia)
Related: [-]
200 200 misc Transcript Order Tue 03/17 10:21 AM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/10/2020 before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi by Kyle Barbaro, Joey Baruch, Steve Eakin, Lorenzo Ferguson, Benjamin Gulker, Michael Hopkins, Adam Lee, Kevin Melkowski, Zixuan Rao, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Polk, Adam) Proceedings transcribed by [Joan Columbini]. Modified on 3/17/2020 (jy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
199 199 misc Document E-Filed Under Seal (Internal Use Only) Tue 03/17 10:17 AM
DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. Order re190 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Clawback. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (pmcS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (3/17/2020) Certificate/Proof of Service
198 198 order Discovery Order Tue 03/17 10:16 AM
Discovery Order re 190 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Clawback. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 3/17/2020. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]