Fields v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Richard W Story |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00064 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal - E.R.I.S.A. |
Case Filed: | May 15, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 19, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Nov 11, 2018 3:36 AM EST |
Defendant
Life Insurance Company of North America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Fields
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
misc
Clerks Entry of Dismissal
Tue 06/19 10:08 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING7 Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii) (dgr) |
||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Tue 06/19 10:18 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (dgr) |
||
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 06/18 4:30 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Life Insurance Company of North America. (White, Brendan) |
|
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Settlement
Wed 06/06 2:19 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Life Insurance Company of North America (White, Brendan) |
|
Tuesday, May 22, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 05/22 11:19 AM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Life Insurance Company of North America Answer due 6/11/2018. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 05/22/2018. (rsg) |
|
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint
Mon 05/21 3:44 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Bondurant, Elizabeth) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, May 16, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons
Wed 05/16 5:18 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Life Insurance Company of North America identifying Corporate Parent CIGNA Corporation, Corporate Parent Connecticut General Corporation, Corporate Parent CIGNA Holdings Inc. for Life Insurance Company of North America. (Bondurant, Elizabeth) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Filing
Wed 05/16 2:29 PM
COURT NOTICE of Filing: Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation by Judge Richard W. Story. (sk) |
|
utility
Docket Correction
Wed 05/16 2:19 PM
Notification of Docket Correction: Magistrate Judge Referred in error (aar) |
||
Tuesday, May 15, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 05/16 2:02 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-7880707)(dgr) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A with Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |