Way To Grow, Inc., a Colorado corporation
Colorado Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Michael E Romero |
Case #: | 1:18-bk-14330 |
Case Filed: | May 18, 2018 |
Dismissed: | Dec 14, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 05, 2020 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Way To Grow, Inc., a Colorado corporation
2317 South Santa Fe Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90058 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Pure Agrobusiness, Inc., a Nevada corporation
2317 South Santa Fe Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90058 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Green Door Agro Inc., a California corporation
2317 South Santa Fe Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90058 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Way to Grow, Inc., a Colorado corporation
2317 S Santa Fe Ave
Los Angeles, CA 90058-1154 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 10:54 AM MST |
Accountant
Russ Boyer
16959 Bernardo Center Dr., Suite 202
San Diego, CA 92128 |
|
Creditor
Red Fisch, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
James Blaha
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Blue Moose, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Boscoe Children, L.L.L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cheyenne Avenue Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dean/Carson South Platte, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Isuzu Finance of America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Hawthorne Hydroponics LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Corey Inniss
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Susan Inniss
|
Represented By
|
Spec. Counsel
Bold Legal LLC
1600 Broadway Suite 1550
Denver, CO 80202 |
|
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Byron G. Rogers Federal Building 1961 Stout St. Ste. 12-200
Denver, CO 80294 |
Represented By
|
1. | Hydroponics chain works to emerge from bankruptcy -BizWest (bizwest.com) |
Submitted Wed 06/13/2018 | |
2. | Hydroponics supply chain files Ch. 11 bankruptcy following April lawsuit - BusinessDen (businessden.com) |
Submitted Tue 05/22/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 1 minutes ago |
Monday, April 26, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 04/26 11:21 AM
Adversary Case Number 19-1203 MER Closed. (klm) |