EBH Topco, LLC
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:18-bk-11212 |
Case Filed: | May 23, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 17, 2023 |
Plan Confirmed: | Feb 13, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Health Care Business |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
EBH Topco, LLC
5000 Airport Plaza Drive Suite 100
Long Beach, CA 90815 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 12:37 PM EST |
Attorney
Polsinelli PC
|
|
Claims Agent
Donlin, Recano & Co., Inc.
www.donlinrecano.com 6201 15th Avenue
Brooklyn, NY 11219 |
|
Creditor
Sherry Robin Harris
|
|
Creditor
Dallas County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson,LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Daniels Holdings Tennessee, LLC and affiliated landlord entities
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Denton County
P O Box 1269
Round Rock, TX 78680 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Department of Treasury
Internal Revenue Service 550 Main Street Rm. 3525
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
|
Creditor
Timothy Doerr
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Texas Taxing Jurisdictions
PO Box 1269
Round Rock, TX 78680 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts
Kimberly A. Walsh P.O. Box 12548
Austin, TX 78711 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ellag LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Carole H Elmore
805 Montreux Ave
Colleyville, TX 76034 |
|
Creditor
Tarrant County
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ford Motor Credit Company LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
James Foster
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Daniels Holdings Mississippi, LLC and affiliated landlord entities
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Harris County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
TN Dept of Revenue
Bankruptcy Division P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Humble Independent School District
1235 North Loop West Suite 600
Houston, TX 77008 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Internal Revenue Service
|
|
Creditor
Iron Mountain Information Management, LLC
One Federal Street
Boston, MA 02110 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Sysco Houston, a division of Sysco USA I, Inc.
Arnall Golden Gregory LLP c/o Michael F. Holbein 171 17th Street NW, Suite 2100
Atlanta, GA 30363 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Steel House, Inc.
|
|
Creditor
George P. Joseph
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Lin Don Realty LLC
315 Deaderick Street Ste 1700
Nashville, TN 37238 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Spring Independent School District
1235 North Loop West Suite 600
Houston, TX 77008 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Denise Reaves
9843 N. 51st Place
Paradise Valley, AZ 85253 |
|
Creditor
UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
One Constitution Plaza
Hartford, CT 06103 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
20723 Rockcroft Drive, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
20725 Rockcroft Drive, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
20729 Rockcroft Drive, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
20786 Cool Oak Way, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Aetna Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Aetna Health Management, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
American Express Travel Related Services Co, Inc
PO Box 3001
Malvern, PA 19355 |
|
Creditor
Wimberley ISD
3301 Northland Dr, Suite 505
Austin, TX 78731 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Wells Fargo Vendor Financial Services
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kathryn Benson, LADAC II, NCAN II, QCS
45A Rutledge Street
Nashville, TN 37210 |
|
Creditor
Bexar County
711 Navarro, Suite 300
San Antonio, TX 78205 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Burnet CAD et al
P.O. Box 1269 2913 Todd Trail
Round Rock, TX 78680 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
COMERICA BANK
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Chase Internet Marketing, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cigna Behavioral Health of Texas, Inc. and Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cimarron Municipal Utility District
1235 North Loop West Suite 600
Houston, TX 77008 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
City of Frisco
Linebarger Goggan Blair &Sampson, LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Brad Umidi
53 High Rock Rd, N
Hanover, PA 17331 |
|
Creditor
Clear Creek Independent School District
1235 North Loop West Suite 600
Houston, TX 77008 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Department of Revenue
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Communications Workers of America, Local 6186, informally known as the Texas State Employees Union
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Winmark Capital Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
|
Represented By
|
Health Care Ombudsman
David N. Crapo, as Patient Care Ombudsman
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Olivia Scutta
|
|
Interested Party
Bethany Winfield
|
|
Interested Party
Zolfo Cooper, LLC
|
|
Interested Party
Project Build Behavioral Health, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Office of Unemployment Compensation Tax Services (UCTS) , Department of Labor and Industry, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
|
|
Interested Party
Laura McCabe Marcotte
|
|
Interested Party
David C. Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Ad Hoc Group of Second Lien Lenders
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Andrea Filosa
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
BYCO, Inc.
|
|
Interested Party
Brenna A. Dolphin
|
|
Interested Party
Michael Bazley
SB No. GB6177 WH 112 23500 Kasson Rd
Tracy, CA 95304 |
|
Interested Party
Craig Clatanoff
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Cheryl Sue Bolte
|
|
Other Prof.
The Ettin Group, LLC
|
|
Other Prof.
Donlin, Recano & Company, Inc.
|
|
Other Prof.
Houlihan Lokey Capital, Inc.
|
|
Transcriber
Reliable Companies
1007 North Orange Street Suite 110
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Interested Party
JMAC Group, LLC
Terminated: 07/13/2018
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 minutes ago |