USA v. Yan et al
Mississippi Southern District Court | |
Case #: | 1:17-cr-00091 |
Case Filed: | Sep 07, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday May 23, 2018 4:29 PM CDT |
Defendant
9W Technology Co., LTD (2)
|
|
Defendant
Xiaobing Yan (1)
|
|
Interested Party
Probation Gulfport
|
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
1. | The Easiest Drug to Smuggle Into U.S. Is Also the Deadliest (bloomberg.com) |
Submitted Wed 05/23/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 05/07/2021 10:31 PM CDT |
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 1 pgs MOTION to Seal Case by John A. Meynardie-Federal Gov as to Xiaobing Yan, 9W Technology Co., LTD. (JCH) | |
2 | 2 1 pgs ORDERgranting1 Motion to Seal Case as to Xiaobing Yan (1), 9W Technology Co., LTD (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 9/7/17. (JCH) | |
3 | 3 15 pgs SEALED REDACTED INDICTMENT as to Xiaobing Yan (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3-4, 5-6, 7, 8-9, 9W Technology Co., LTD (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3-4, 5-6, 7, 8-9. (JCH) | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Criminal Cover Sheet - Yan, | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs Criminal Cover Sheet - 9W | ||
4 | 4 *RESTRICTED* DOCUMENT - Unredacted Indictment as to Xiaobing Yan, 9W Technology Co., LTD.(JCH) | |
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet - Yan, | ||
Att: 2 Criminal Cover Sheet - 9W | ||
5 | 5 1 pgs Praecipe for Warrant by USA as to Xiaobing Yan (JCH) |