Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:William M Ray, II
Case #: 1:18-cv-02328
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:May 21, 2018
Last checked: Saturday Nov 17, 2018 4:49 AM EST
Defendant
Tanja D. Battle
Represented By
James William Cobb
Caplan Cobb LLP
contact info
Bryon A. Thernes
Georgia Department Of Law
contact info
Michael A. Caplan
Caplan Cobb LLP
contact info
Roger A. Chalmers
State Law Department -Atl
contact info
Benjamin Wayne Cheesbro
Caplan Cobb LLP
contact info
Defendant
Richard Bennett
Represented By
James William Cobb
Caplan Cobb LLP
contact info
Bryon A. Thernes
Georgia Department Of Law
contact info
Michael A. Caplan
Caplan Cobb LLP
contact info
Roger A. Chalmers
State Law Department -Atl
contact info
Benjamin Wayne Cheesbro
Caplan Cobb LLP
contact info
Defendant
Rebecca B. Bynum
Represented By
James William Cobb
Caplan Cobb LLP
contact info
Bryon A. Thernes
Georgia Department Of Law
contact info
Michael A. Caplan
Caplan Cobb LLP
contact info
Roger A. Chalmers
State Law Department -Atl
contact info
Benjamin Wayne Cheesbro
Caplan Cobb LLP
contact info
Defendant
Tracy Gay
Represented By
James William Cobb
Caplan Cobb LLP
contact info
Bryon A. Thernes
Georgia Department Of Law
contact info
Michael A. Caplan
Caplan Cobb LLP
contact info
Roger A. Chalmers
State Law Department -Atl
contact info
Benjamin Wayne Cheesbro
Caplan Cobb LLP
contact info
Defendant
Georgia Board Of Dentistry
Represented By
James William Cobb
Caplan Cobb LLP
contact info
Bryon A. Thernes
Georgia Department Of Law
contact info
Michael A. Caplan
Caplan Cobb LLP
contact info
Roger A. Chalmers
State Law Department -Atl
contact info
Benjamin Wayne Cheesbro
Caplan Cobb LLP
contact info
Defendant
Thomas P. Godfrey
Represented By
James William Cobb
Caplan Cobb LLP
contact info
Bryon A. Thernes
Georgia Department Of Law
contact info
Michael A. Caplan
Caplan Cobb LLP
contact info
Roger A. Chalmers
State Law Department -Atl
contact info
Benjamin Wayne Cheesbro
Caplan Cobb LLP
contact info
Defendant
Gregory G. Goggans
Represented By
James William Cobb
Caplan Cobb LLP
contact info
Bryon A. Thernes
Georgia Department Of Law
contact info
Michael A. Caplan
Caplan Cobb LLP
contact info
Roger A. Chalmers
State Law Department -Atl
contact info
Benjamin Wayne Cheesbro
Caplan Cobb LLP
contact info
Defendant
Steve Holcomb
Represented By
James William Cobb
Caplan Cobb LLP
contact info
Bryon A. Thernes
Georgia Department Of Law
contact info
Michael A. Caplan
Caplan Cobb LLP
contact info
Roger A. Chalmers
State Law Department -Atl
contact info
Benjamin Wayne Cheesbro
Caplan Cobb LLP
contact info
Defendant
Wendy Johnson
Represented By
James William Cobb
Caplan Cobb LLP
contact info
Bryon A. Thernes
Georgia Department Of Law
contact info
Michael A. Caplan
Caplan Cobb LLP
contact info
Roger A. Chalmers
State Law Department -Atl
contact info
Benjamin Wayne Cheesbro
Caplan Cobb LLP
contact info
Defendant
Logan Nalley, Jr.
Represented By
James William Cobb
Caplan Cobb LLP
contact info
Bryon A. Thernes
Georgia Department Of Law
contact info
Michael A. Caplan
Caplan Cobb LLP
contact info
Roger A. Chalmers
State Law Department -Atl
contact info
Benjamin Wayne Cheesbro
Caplan Cobb LLP
contact info
Defendant
Antwan L. Treadway
Represented By
James William Cobb
Caplan Cobb LLP
contact info
Bryon A. Thernes
Georgia Department Of Law
contact info
Michael A. Caplan
Caplan Cobb LLP
contact info
Roger A. Chalmers
State Law Department -Atl
contact info
Benjamin Wayne Cheesbro
Caplan Cobb LLP
contact info
Defendant
H. Bert Yeargan
Represented By
James William Cobb
Caplan Cobb LLP
contact info
Bryon A. Thernes
Georgia Department Of Law
contact info
Michael A. Caplan
Caplan Cobb LLP
contact info
Roger A. Chalmers
State Law Department -Atl
contact info
Benjamin Wayne Cheesbro
Caplan Cobb LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SmileDirectClub, LLC
Represented By
Madison Hunter Kitchens
contact info
Adam Reinke
King & Spalding Llp - Atl
contact info
Stephen B. Devereaux
contact info
Jeffrey S. Cashdan
contact info

Docket last updated: 06/16/2019 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, June 13, 2019
63 63 appeal USCA Acknowledgment Thu 3:55 PM
USCA Acknowledgment of57 Notice of Appeal, filed by Tracy Gay, Thomas P. Godfrey, Logan Nalley, Jr., Wendy Johnson, H. Bert Yeargan, Rebecca B. Bynum, Antwan L. Treadway, Steve Holcomb, Tanja D. Battle, Richard Bennett and Gregory G. Goggans. Case Appealed to USCA 11th- Circuit. Case Number 19-12227 HH. (pjm)
Related: [-]
appeal Appeal Record Certified Thu 3:56 PM
Pursuant to F.R.A.P.11(c), the Clerk certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal,57 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA 11th- Circuit. Case Number 19-12227 HH. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (pjm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2019
62 62 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 2:39 PM
ORDER granting61 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Interlocutory Appeal. The Court STAYS all proceedings pending resolution of Defendants' interlocutory appeal, with one exception: this stay shall not apply to briefing on or this Court's decision with respect to Defendants' Motion asking this Court to certify for interlocutory appeal certain portions of its Order that denied Defendants' motion to dismiss (dkt. 56). In the event this matter is remanded, Defendants' deadline to answer complaint is extended seven days. The Court further ORDERS discovery commences immediately upon any remand to this Court. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 6/11/19. (rlb)
Related: [-]
61 61 motion Stay Tue 9:23 AM
Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Interlocutory Appeal of the Court's May 8, 2019 Order, with Brief In Support by Tanja D. Battle, Richard Bennett, Rebecca B. Bynum, Tracy Gay, Thomas P. Godfrey, Gregory G. Goggans, Steve Holcomb, Wendy Johnson, Logan Nalley, Jr, Antwan L. Treadway, H. Bert Yeargan.(Cobb, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, June 10, 2019
60 60 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Mon 4:23 PM
Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, USCA Appeal Fees, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re:57 Notice of Appeal. (pjm)
Related: [-]
59 59 notice Notice of Filing Mon 4:14 PM
NOTICE Of Filing NOA Transmittal Letter re:57 Notice of Appeal. (pjm)
Related: [-]
appeal ~Util - Set/Reset Appeal Deadlines Mon 4:21 PM
Set Deadline re:57 Notice of Appeal: Fed.R.App.P. 11 Certification due on 6/24/2019. (pjm)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2019
58 58 appeal Transcript Order Form Fri 4:03 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM re57 Notice of Appeal,. (Cobb, James)
Related: [-]
57 57 appeal Notice of Appeal Fri 3:48 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to51 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,,, by Tanja D. Battle, Richard Bennett, Rebecca B. Bynum, Tracy Gay, Thomas P. Godfrey, Gregory G. Goggans, Steve Holcomb, Wendy Johnson, Logan Nalley, Jr, Antwan L. Treadway, H. Bert Yeargan. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AGANDC-8714717. Transcript Order Form due on 6/21/2019 (Cobb, James)
Related: [-]