National Rifle Association, et al v. Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, et al
Original Case: 5:10-cv-00140
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:11-cr-10959 |
Type | civil rights / united states |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Oct 07, 2011 |
Terminated: | Oct 25, 2012 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 02, 2018 3:06 PM CDT |
Amicus Curiae
NATIONAL SHOOTING SPORTS FOUNDATION, INCORPORATED
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
GRADUATE STUDENT ASSEMBLY AND STUDENT GOVERNMENT OF THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS AT AUSTIN
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
MOTHERS AGAINST TEEN VIOLENCE
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
STUDENTS FOR GUN-FREE SCHOOLS IN TEXAS
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
TEXAS CHAPTERS OF THE BRADY CAMPAIGN TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE, `
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
KENNETH MELSON, In His Official Capacity as Acting Director of the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
B. TODD JONES, In His Official Capacity as Acting Director of the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ERIC H. HOLDER, JR., U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INCORPORATED
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ANDREW M. PAYNE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
REBEKAH JENNINGS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
BRENNAN HARMON
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/02/2018 3:06 PM CDT |
Friday, October 07, 2011 | ||
CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Brennan Harmon, Ms. Rebekah Jennings, National Rifle Association of America, Incorporated and Mr. Andrew M. Payne 11-10959 (NFD) | ||
Att: 1 2 pgs NOA | ||
Att: 2 11 pgs Dkt Sht |