Hop Hop Productions, Inc. et al v. Kneupper et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Alvin K Hellerstein |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-04670 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1051 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | May 25, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 22, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 21, 2018 4:02 AM EST |
Defendant
Jennifer Watson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tara Crescent
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hop Hop Productions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Faleena Hopkins
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Kevin Kneupper
Terminated: 06/05/2018
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/21/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 02, 2018 | ||
misc
Cashiers Registry Disbursement
Thu 08/02 10:59 AM
CASHIERS OFFICE REGISTRY DISBURSEMENT as per48 Order,, dated 7/25/2018, from Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein, on 7/27/2018 disbursed to pay C. Cardillo PC $5,000.00 Check No. 01901373 dated 7/27/2018 (cla) Modified on 8/2/2018 (cla) |
||
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
48 | 48
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 07/25 12:03 PM
ORDER: Plaintiffs having moved, unopposed, by Letter Motion dated July 19, 2018, seeking the release of a $5,000 bond that was posted by Plaintiffs with this Court on May 29, 2018, and the case having been disposed of via settlement on July 23, 2018: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The Court's Finance Department return the $5,000 to Plaintiffs; 2. The refund check be made payable to C. Cardillo, P.C. as attorney; and, 3. The check be mailed to C. Cardillo, P.C., 9728 3rd Avenue, Suite 308, Brooklyn, NY 11209. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ne) |
|
47 | 47
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Reopen
Wed 07/25 12:00 PM
ORDER granting46 Letter Motion to Reopen. The Clerk will re-close this case and terminate all pending motions. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2018) (ne) |
|
utility
Terminate Transcript Deadlines
Tue 10/16 12:21 PM
Terminate Transcript Deadlines (ne) |
||
Monday, July 23, 2018 | ||
46 | 46
motion
Reopen
Mon 07/23 10:12 PM
LETTER MOTION to Reopen re:45 Order on Motion to Expedite,44 LETTER MOTION to Expedite the release of bond/security addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Chris Cardillo, Esq. dated 07/19/2018.,36 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer,38 LETTER MOTION to Reopen Case and the Voluntarily Dismiss addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Chris Cardillo, Esq. dated 07/12/2018. addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Chris Cardillo, Esq. dated 07/23/2018. Document filed by Hop Hop Productions, Inc., Faleena Hopkins.(Cardillo, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Order - Proposed - Bond | ||
Friday, July 20, 2018 | ||
45 | 45
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Expedite
Fri 07/20 4:27 PM
ORDER with respect to44 Letter Motion to Expedite. Submit an order for me to sign, and elicit defedant's consent or "no opposition". (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/19/2018) (ne) |
|
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
44 | 44
motion
Expedite
Thu 07/19 1:29 PM
LETTER MOTION to Expedite the release of bond/security addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Chris Cardillo, Esq. dated 07/19/2018. Document filed by Hop Hop Productions, Inc., Faleena Hopkins.(Cardillo, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, July 17, 2018 | ||
43 | 43
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Reopen Case
Tue 07/17 5:52 PM
ORDER with respect to38 Letter Motion to Reopen Case. By July 27, 2018, defendant shall show that a binding, enforceable contract was made. Plaintiff shall have until Aug. 3, 2018 to oppose. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/17/2018) (ne) |
|
Saturday, July 14, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Sat 07/14 2:34 AM
LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Chris Cardillo, Esq. dated 07/14/2018 re:38 LETTER MOTION to Reopen Case and the Voluntarily Dismiss addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Chris Cardillo, Esq. dated 07/12/2018. . Document filed by Hop Hop Productions, Inc., Faleena Hopkins. (Cardillo, Christopher) |
|
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
41 | 41
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 07/13 9:58 PM
LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Cameron S. Reuber dated July 13, 2018 re:38 LETTER MOTION to Reopen Case and the Voluntarily Dismiss addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Chris Cardillo, Esq. dated 07/12/2018. (Defendants' Sur-Reply) . Document filed by Tara Crescent, Jennifer Watson. |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, July 12, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 07/12 7:31 PM
LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Chris Cardillo, Esq. dated 07/12/2018 re:38 LETTER MOTION to Reopen Case and the Voluntarily Dismiss addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Chris Cardillo, Esq. dated 07/12/2018. . Document filed by Hop Hop Productions, Inc., Faleena Hopkins. (Cardillo, Christopher) |
|
39 | 39
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 07/12 3:53 PM
LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Cameron S. Reuber dated July 12, 2018 re:38 LETTER MOTION to Reopen Case and the Voluntarily Dismiss addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Chris Cardillo, Esq. dated 07/12/2018. Requesting a Withhold of Entry of Dismissal Pending Finalization of Settlement . Document filed by Tara Crescent, Jennifer Watson. |
|
38 | 38
motion
Reopen Case
Thu 07/12 2:28 PM
LETTER MOTION to Reopen Case and the Voluntarily Dismiss addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Chris Cardillo, Esq. dated 07/12/2018. Document filed by Hop Hop Productions, Inc., Faleena Hopkins.(Cardillo, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Notice of Voluntary Dismissal | ||
Friday, June 22, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
misc
AO 120 Form Trademark - Case Terminated - Submitted
Fri 06/22 4:24 PM
AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE TERMINATED - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 6/22/2018 in a court action filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (ne) |
|
Att: 1 Order | ||
36 | 36
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 06/22 4:14 PM
ORDER granting35 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. A suggestion of settlement having been made, this case is dismissed. If the settlement is not consummated within 30 days of this order, of an authorized enlarged date, either party may apply by letter for restoration of the action within 10 days after the close of said period. All pending court dates are cancelled. The Clerk is directed to close the case. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/22/2018) (ne) |
|
35 | 35
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 06/22 12:52 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Cameron Reuber dated June 22, 2018. Document filed by Tara Crescent, Jennifer Watson |
|
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Notice of Filing Transcript
Tue 06/12 7:08 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a motion proceeding held on 6/1/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) |
|
33 | 33
misc
Transcript
Tue 06/12 7:08 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: motion held on 6/1/2018 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/3/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/13/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/10/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly) |
|
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 06/11 4:41 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lauren Beth Emerson on behalf of Tara Crescent, Jennifer Watson. (Emerson, Lauren) |
|
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 06/11 4:36 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cameron Sean Reuber on behalf of Tara Crescent, Jennifer Watson. |
|
Tuesday, June 05, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Tue 06/05 4:24 PM
ORDER DENYING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION: Upon the parties' submissions and oral argument held June 1, 2018, Plaintiffs' motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction is denied. For the reasons stated following oral argument, Plaintiffs fail to satisfy the four factors of Winter v. Nat. Res. Def. Counsil, Inc., 555 U.S. 7, 20 (2008), and the factors of Polaroid Corp. v. Polarad Elecs. Corp., 287 F.2d 492,495 (2d Cir.1961). Plaintiffs' motion to stay Defendant Kneupper's Petition for Cancellation before the Trademark Trial and Appeals Board is also denied. The application to stay the petition is the only justification for Kneupper's presence in this case. The application having been denied, Defendant Kneupper is dismissed from this case. The parties shall proceed to fact discovery, which will close September 7, 2018, and appear for a status conference on September 14, 2018, at 10:00 A.M. Defendants shall move to dismiss or otherwise answer the complaint by June 22, 2018. Oppositions to any such motions are due by July 13, 2018, and replies by July 20, 2018. (Jennifer Watson answer due 6/22/2018. Fact Discovery due by 9/7/2018. Motions due by 6/22/2018. Responses due by 7/13/2018. Replies due by 7/20/2018.) (Status Conference set for 9/14/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Kevin Kneupper terminated.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/4/2018) (ras) |
|
Friday, June 01, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Letter
Fri 06/01 5:02 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Jeremy S. Boczko dated June 1, 2018 re: color copy of the cover of Cocktales Anthology. Document filed by Jennifer Watson.(Boczko, Jeremy) |
|
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/01 3:56 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeremy Scott Boczko on behalf of Jennifer Watson. (Boczko, Jeremy) |
|
27 | 27
respoth
Reply Memorandum of Law in Support (non-motion)
Fri 06/01 8:27 AM
L-kq# REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:10 Order to Show Cause,,,,,,,,,, Set Deadlines,,,,,,,,,, Terminate Motions,,,,,,,,, . Document filed by Hop Hop Productions, Inc., Faleena Hopkins. (Cardillo, Christopher) |
|
26 | 26
respoth
Reply Affirmation in Support (non-motion)
Fri 06/01 8:25 AM
REPLY AFFIRMATION of Chris Cardillo, Esq. in Support re:10 Order to Show Cause,,,,,,,,,, Set Deadlines,,,,,,,,,, Terminate Motions,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Hop Hop Productions, Inc., Faleena Hopkins. (Cardillo, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, May 31, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
order
Memo Endorsement
Thu 05/31 1:21 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:5 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference (Preliminary Injunction Hearing) addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Scott J. Sholder (Counsel for Tara Crescent) dated May 29, 2018. filed by Kevin Kneupper, Jennifer Watson. ENDORSEMENT: Denied, with leave to renew at the scheduled hearing. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/31/2018) (ne) |
|
24 | 24
30+
pgs
respoth
Memorandum of Law in Support (non-motion)
Thu 05/31 1:09 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:10 Order to Show Cause,,,,,,,,,, Set Deadlines,,,,,,,,,, Terminate Motions,,,,,,,,, . Document filed by Hop Hop Productions, Inc., Faleena Hopkins.(Cardillo, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Ex A to D of the Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Ex E to F of the Complaint, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Ex G to I of the Complaint, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Ex J to N of the Complaint, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - E to P of the Complaint, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 2 - Notice | ||
23 | 23
30+
pgs
respoth
Memorandum of Law in Support (non-motion)
Thu 05/31 12:21 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:10 Order to Show Cause,,,,,,,,,, Set Deadlines,,,,,,,,,, Terminate Motions,,,,,,,,, TRO . Document filed by Hop Hop Productions, Inc., Faleena Hopkins. (Cardillo, Christopher) |
|
22 | 22
respoth
Affidavit in Support (non-motion)
Thu 05/31 12:18 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Faleena Hopkins in Support re:10 Order to Show Cause,,,,,,,,,, Set Deadlines,,,,,,,,,, Terminate Motions,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Hop Hop Productions, Inc., Faleena Hopkins. (Cardillo, Christopher) |
|
21 | 21
respoth
Declaration in Support (non-motion)
Thu 05/31 12:16 PM
DECLARATION of Chris Cardillo in Support re:10 Order to Show Cause,,,,,,,,,, Set Deadlines,,,,,,,,,, Terminate Motions,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Hop Hop Productions, Inc., Faleena Hopkins. (Cardillo, Christopher) |
|
20 | 20
respoth
Declaration in Support (non-motion)
Thu 05/31 12:15 PM
DECLARATION of Tara Crescent in Support re:15 Memorandum of Law in Opposition. Document filed by Kevin Kneupper, Jennifer Watson. |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I | ||
19 | 19
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 05/31 12:10 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Hop Hop Productions, Inc., Faleena Hopkins.(Cardillo, Christopher) |
|
18 | 18
respoth
Declaration in Support (non-motion)
Thu 05/31 12:08 PM
DECLARATION of Lauren Beth Emerson in Support re:15 Memorandum of Law in Opposition. Document filed by Kevin Kneupper, Jennifer Watson. |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit L | ||
17 | 17
respoth
Declaration in Support (non-motion)
Thu 05/31 12:03 PM
DECLARATION of Penny Reid in Support re:15 Memorandum of Law in Opposition. Document filed by Kevin Kneupper, Jennifer Watson. |
|
16 | 16
respoth
Declaration in Support (non-motion)
Thu 05/31 12:02 PM
DECLARATION of Jennifer Watson in Support re:15 Memorandum of Law in Opposition. Document filed by Kevin Kneupper, Jennifer Watson. |
|
15 | 15
30+
pgs
respoth
Memorandum of Law in Opposition (non-motion)
Thu 05/31 12:00 PM
JOINT MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order . Document filed by Kevin Kneupper, Jennifer Watson. |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 05/31 10:35 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lauren Beth Emerson on behalf of Kevin Kneupper. (Emerson, Lauren) |
|
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
30+
pgs
respm
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Wed 05/30 5:23 PM
Lp_prefix_1 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:5 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference (Preliminary Injunction Hearing) addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Scott J. Sholder (Counsel for Tara Crescent) dated May 29, 2018. . Document filed by Hop Hop Productions, Inc., Faleena Hopkins. (Cardillo, Christopher) |
|
12 | 12
respm
Affidavit in Support of Motion
Wed 05/30 5:15 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Faleena Hopkins in Support re:5 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference (Preliminary Injunction Hearing) addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Scott J. Sholder (Counsel for Tara Crescent) dated May 29, 2018.. Document filed by Hop Hop Productions, Inc., Faleena Hopkins. (Cardillo, Christopher) |
|
11 | 11
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Wed 05/30 5:11 PM
DECLARATION of Chris Cardillo, Esq. in Support re:5 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference (Preliminary Injunction Hearing) addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Scott J. Sholder (Counsel for Tara Crescent) dated May 29, 2018.. Document filed by Hop Hop Productions, Inc., Faleena Hopkins. (Cardillo, Christopher) |
|
9 | 9
service
Affidavit of Service Other
Wed 05/30 1:31 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of OSC and Supporting Documents served on Defendants on 05/25/18. Document filed by Hop Hop Productions, Inc., Faleena Hopkins.(Cardillo, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Kneupper Service Docs, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Crescent Service Docs, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Watson Service Docs | ||
8 | 8
misc
AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney
Wed 05/30 12:42 AM
AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Cardillo, Christopher) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Wed 05/30 12:28 AM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Christopher Scott Cardillo on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: C. Cardillo, P.C., 9728 3rd Avenue, Suite 308, Brooklyn, NY, USA 11209, 347-309-0000. (Cardillo, Christopher) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Letter
Wed 05/30 12:02 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Chris Cardillo, Esq. dated 05/30/18 re: Opposition to Letter Motion of Defendants to Adjourn Hearing Date. Document filed by Hop Hop Productions, Inc., Faleena Hopkins.(Cardillo, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Adjourn Conference
Tue 05/29 8:44 PM
JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference (Preliminary Injunction Hearing) addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Scott J. Sholder (Counsel for Tara Crescent) dated May 29, 2018. Document filed by Kevin Kneupper, Jennifer Watson |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/29 8:25 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cameron Sean Reuber on behalf of Kevin Kneupper. |
|
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 05/29 5:22 PM
ORDER: Having read Plaintiffs' motion and supporting papers and having read Defendants' petition for cancellation before the Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, and observing that there are serious issues of fact and law that have to be decided before a preliminary injunction can be granted, it is hereby ordered: 1. The preliminary injunction granted on May 25, 2018 is dissolved. 2. The obligation on part of Plaintiffs to file a bond by Wednesday, May 30, 2018 is dissolved. 3. The motion for temporary restraining order and/or preliminary injunction will be heard before me in courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY, 10007, on Friday, June 1, 2018 at 11:00 A.M. The schedule of briefing set out in the order dated May 25, 2018 will be kept. Set Deadlines/Hearing: (Motion Hearing set for 6/1/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/29/2018) (ras) |
|
misc
Cashiers Registry Deposit
Fri 06/01 9:27 AM
CASHIERS OFFICE REGISTRY DEPOSIT as per10 Order to Show Cause, Set Deadlines, Terminate Motions, dated 5/25/2018, from Judge Edgardo Ramos, received $5,000.00 from Hop Hop Productions, Inc. Receipt Number 465401210211 on 5/29/2018. (nm) |
||
Friday, May 25, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
4
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 05/30 3:12 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. IT IS HEREBY, ORDERED, that the above-named Defendants show cause before a motion term of this Court, at Room 14D, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, in the City, County and State of New York, on Friday, June 1, at 2:00 o'clock in the afternoon thereof, or as soon thereafter as counsel may be heard, why an order should not be issued pursuant to Rule 65 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure permanently enjoining and restraining defendants TARA CRESCENT (hereinafter "CRESCENT") and JENNIFER WATSON (hereinafter "WATSON") during the pendency of this action from promoting, advertising, selling, and/or distributing any works which infringe upon the Plaintiffs' Marks, including but not limited to the "Cocktales, The Cockiest Anthology" (hereinafter "Cocktales"), or any publications which include the Plaintiff's Marks, or any similar variations thereof meant to confuse the public, and it is ORDERED that, Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED, and as further specified and set forth in this Order to Show Cause. It is ORDERED that any opposing papers, if any, shall be served by Thursday May 31, 2018 at 12 noon, along with electronic courtesy copies by email, on C. Cardillo, P.C., counsel for Plaintiffs by to overnight mail and email, and publicly filed on the docket of this case, and it is ORDERED that any reply papers, if any, shall be served by hand, along with electronic courtesy copies by Friday June 1, 2018 at 10:00am, to Defendants or Defendants' counsel by overnight mail and email, and publicly filed on the docket of this case, and it is ORDERED that Plaintiff post security, in the amount of $ be posted by the plaintiff prior to Wed. May 30, at 5:00 o'clock in the noon of that day, in the amount of $5,000.00. It is so ordered. (Show Cause Hearing set for 6/1/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Show Cause Response due by 5/31/2018). . Motions terminated:5 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference (Preliminary Injunction Hearing) addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Scott J. Sholder (Counsel for Tara Crescent) dated May 29, 2018 filed by Kevin Kneupper, Jennifer Watson. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos in Part I on 5/25/2018) (rjm) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 05/25 5:13 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (laq) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 05/25 5:12 PM
COMPLAINT against Kevin Kneupper, Jennifer Watson. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 1210180)Document filed by Hop Hop Productions, Inc., Faleena Hopkins.(laq) |
|
utility
Case Designation
Fri 05/25 5:12 PM
Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (laq) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 05/25 5:12 PM
Case Designated ECF. (laq) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney to Submit AO 120 Form/AO 121 Form
Fri 05/25 5:14 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney Christopher Scott Cardillo to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (laq) |