GALVEZ-ECHAZABAL v. SESSIONS et al
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Mark E Walker |
Referred: | Charles A Stampelos |
Case #: | 4:18-cv-00256 |
Nature of Suit | 463 Immigration - Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa |
Case Filed: | May 25, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 31, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 21, 2018 4:14 AM EST |
Petitioner
IGNACIO GALVEZ-ECHAZABAL
A024458802/18001529 13305 SW 171 TERRACE
MIAMI, FL 33177 |
|
Respondent
JARED F MILLER
|
|
Respondent
MARC J MOORE
|
|
Respondent
JEFF B SESSIONS
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
THOMAS D HOMAN
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Respondent
KIRSTJEN NIELSEN
Terminated: 06/04/2018
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 15, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 08/15 12:00 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to IGNACIO GALVEZ-ECHAZABAL at Miami address re:11 Order of Dismissal returned as "no such number." (ckm) |
|
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Mail Returned
Mon 08/06 2:51 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to IGNACIO GALVEZ-ECHAZABAL at Wakulla County Jail re:11 Order of Dismissal returned. (ckm) |
|
Tuesday, July 31, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
3
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 07/31 2:44 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL - The supplemental motion to dismiss, ECF No. 9 , is GRANTED, the first motion to dismiss, ECF No. 7 , is DENIED, and this case is DISMISSED as moot since Petitioner is no longer in custody. The Clerk shall provide this Order to Petitioner at both addresses provided in Respondents' certificate of service, ECF No. 9 at 3, and close the file. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 7/31/2018. (ckm) |
|
Monday, July 23, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 07/27 1:59 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Ignacio Galvez-Echazabal returned:8 ORDER. The court was able to find an alternate address in Miami for the Petitioner. The8 Order was re-sent to the Miami address. (cle) |
|
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss
Thu 07/19 8:47 AM
Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss Petition as Moot by THOMAS D HOMAN, JEFF B SESSIONS. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 8/2/2018) . (FISHER, PETER) Modified on 7/19/2018 to reflect complete document title (ckm) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Thu 07/19 9:16 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re:9 Supplemental Motion to Dismiss Petition as Moot. Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (ckm) |
||
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
3
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines 1 - Terminate Deadlines
Mon 07/16 3:11 PM
ORDER re 7 Motion to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Petitioner reply to motion due by 8/31/2018 . Notify Chambers by 8/31/2018 .) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 7/16/2018. (ckm) |
|
Saturday, June 30, 2018 | ||
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Sat 06/30 6:16 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re:7 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus . Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (pll) |
||
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss
Fri 06/29 8:41 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by THOMAS D HOMAN, JEFF B SESSIONS. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 7/13/2018) . (FISHER, PETER) |
|
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Thu 06/14 8:25 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re:6 Notice of Appearance. (ckm) |
||
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 06/13 2:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by PETER GUNNAR FISHER on behalf of THOMAS D HOMAN, JEFF B SESSIONS (FISHER, PETER) |
|
Tuesday, June 05, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Tue 06/05 9:01 AM
Summons Issued as to THOMAS D HOMAN, JEFF B SESSIONS, and U.S. Attorney. (kjw) |
|
Monday, June 04, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
4
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 06/05 8:57 AM
ORDER. The Clerk of Court shall substitute ICE Acting Director Thomas D. Homan in place of named Respondent Kirstjen Nielsen. The Clerk of Court shall prepare and send sufficient copies of this Order, the petition, ECF No. 1 , and summons to Attorney General of the United States Jeff Sessions and ICE Acting Director Thomas D. Homan. The Clerk of Court shall also prepare a copy of this Order, the petition, ECF No. 1 , and summons, and send those copies to the United States Attorney for this District who shall have until 8/3/2018 in which to file an answer or similar response to the petition. Petitioner shall have until 8/31/2018 in which to file a reply to the answer or response filed by Respondents. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 6/4/2018. (kjw) |
|
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice to Pro Se
Tue 05/29 8:19 AM
Notice to Pro Se (ckm) |
|
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Tue 05/29 8:21 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, 2 Filing Fee Received. (ckm) |
||
Friday, May 25, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Filing Fee Received
Tue 05/29 8:18 AM
Filing fee: $5.00, receipt number FLN400034208. Fee status updated to paid. (ckm) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Tue 05/29 8:17 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by IGNACIO GALVEZ-ECHAZABAL. (ckm) |