Lacy et al v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | William L Campbell, Jr |
Referred: | Barbara D Holmes |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-00500 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:1981 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | May 29, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 13, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Nov 25, 2018 2:47 AM CST |
Defendant
Jeff O'Bryan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U.S. Bank National Association
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brandy D. Lacy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mearleen Zakhary
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc.
Terminated: 09/18/2018
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, May 13, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Entry of Judgment
Mon 05/13 2:57 PM
ENTRY OF JUDGMENT re:22 Order. (jm) |
|
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 05/13 2:56 PM
ORDER: Pending before the Court is the parties' Joint Stipulation of Dismissal (Doc. No.21 ), indicating all claims in this case have been resolved, and this case should be dismissed with prejudice. Accordingly, this case is DISMISSED, with prejudice. The trial scheduled for October 29, 2019, and the pretrial conference scheduled for October 21, 2019, are cancelled. The Clerk is directed to close the file. This order shall constitute the final judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 58. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 5/13/2019. (jm) |
|
Friday, May 10, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 05/10 12:13 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal by Jeff O'Bryan, U.S. Bank National Association.(McKnight, Anne) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 08, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Judge
Mon 04/08 4:36 PM
ORDER: A settlement conference was held in this action on April 5, 2018, before the undersigned. Plaintiff Lacy and Defendants were able to settle her claims. But, Plaintiff Zakhary did not reach an agreement with Defendants. Unless otherwise directed by the Court or upon motion of the parties, there will be no further proceedings before this Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 4/8/2019. (jm) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2019 | ||
minutes
Settlement Conference
Mon 04/08 10:44 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley: Settlement Conference held on 4/5/2019. Plaintiff Lacy settled her claims. Plaintiff Zakhary and Defendants will continue the settlement talks. (hv) |
||
Tuesday, February 12, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
4
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 02/12 4:07 PM
ORDER: Pursuant to the Order of Judge Holmes entered on the docket on January 31, 2019 (Docket No.17 ), this action was referred to the undersigned to conduct a settlement conference. The parties have agreed to schedule the settlement conference on April 5, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 2/12/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (jm) |
|
Monday, February 04, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 02/04 4:17 PM
ORDER: A telephonic status/case management conference was held on January 30, 2019. The deadlines for completion of fact discovery and filing of discovery motions is extended to May 19, 2019. The deadline for filing dispositive motions is extended to May 31, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 2/4/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (jm) |
|
Thursday, January 31, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Thu 01/31 3:52 PM
ORDER: During the status/case management conference held telephonically on January 30, 2019, counsel for the parties requested that this case be referred for a settlement conference with Magistrate Judge Jeffery Frensley. After consultation with Judge Frensley, this case is REFERRED to Judge Frensley for a settlement conference. Counsel should promptly contact Ms. Holly Villa, Courtroom Deputy for Judge Frensley, to schedule the settlement conference. Judge Frensley will enter a separate order setting the settlement conference and detailing his procedures and requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 1/31/2019. (jm) |
|
Wednesday, January 30, 2019 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Mon 02/04 11:51 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes: Telephone Conference held on 1/30/2019. (Tape #not recorded.) (jwc) |
||
Monday, December 03, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Status Report
Mon 12/03 4:43 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Case Resolution by Jeff O'Bryan, U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association. (Wright, Luther) |
|
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Wed 09/19 9:18 AM
AGREED ORDER: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 21, the parties hereby advise the Court that it is agreed that U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc. should be and is dismissed from this case because this entity did not employ Plaintiffs and is not a proper Defendant in this litigation. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 9/18/2018. (jm) |
|
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Proposed Order of Dismissal
Mon 09/17 5:06 PM
PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL filed by U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc.. (Wright, Luther) |
|
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 09/13 3:35 PM
ORDER: The previous deadline of August 31 is therefore extended to September 21, 2018, and by that date, either the parties must submit an agreed order dismissing U.S. Bancorp Investments pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 21 or U.S. Bancorp Investments must file a motion to dismiss. If, however, the parties again fail to comply with this deadline, further action by the Court will result, which may include ordering counsel to appear in court with their respective clients to address the lack of attention to deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 9/13/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (jm) |
|
Friday, August 24, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
Trial Management Order
Fri 08/24 2:58 PM
ORDER: Jury Trial set for 10/29/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A826 before District Judge William L. Campbell Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2019 at 10:30 AM before District Judge William L. Campbell Jr. Exhibit List due by 10/14/2019. Witness List due by 10/14/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/14/2019. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/24/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (dt) |
|
Wednesday, August 22, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
order
Case Management Order
Wed 08/22 3:05 PM
INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Motion to Amend Pleadings due by 10/15/2018. Discovery due by 4/15/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 5/15/2019. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 1/30/2019 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 8/22/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (dt) |
|
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
minutes
Case Management Conference
Mon 08/13 4:32 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes: Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/13/2018; ORDER to enter. (Tape #digital recording.) (jwc) |
||
Wednesday, August 08, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Proposed Case Management Order
Wed 08/08 4:20 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Brandy D. Lacy. (Chamness, Jay) |
|
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Mon 08/06 12:43 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Luther Wright, Jr, Anne Todd McKnight and Corletra Mance. (dt) |
||
misc
Annotation - Docket
Mon 08/06 12:44 PM
Notice to Filer re DE9 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, all filings shall include a Certificate of Service and it shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel SHALL FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document using the Certificate event located under Other Documents. (dt) |
||
Tuesday, July 31, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/31 1:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Corletra Mance on behalf of Mearleen Zakhary (Mance, Corletra) |
|
Tuesday, July 24, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 07/24 4:25 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Jeff O'Bryan, U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association.(Wright, Luther) |
|
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 06/22 1:53 PM
SUMMONS returned executed U.S. Bank National Association served on 6/4/2018. (afs) |
|
Thursday, May 31, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 06/01 8:57 AM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 5/31/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (afs) |
|
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Wed 05/30 12:26 PM
Summons issued as to Jeff O'Bryan, U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association, Mearleen Zakhary to be picked up by counsel for service. (afs) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Case Management Conference
Wed 05/30 12:24 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/13/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (afs) |
|
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ
Tue 05/29 4:51 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (afs) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement
Tue 05/29 4:51 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (afs) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 05/29 4:50 PM
COMPLAINT against Jeff O'Bryan, U.S. Bancorp Investments, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2680834), filed by Brandy D. Lacy, Mearleen Zakhary. (afs) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Tue 05/29 4:52 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for David L. King, Jay N. Chamness. (afs) |