Snipes v. Wilkie et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas S Hixson |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-03259 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | May 31, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 09, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 27, 2018 1:24 AM PST |
Defendant
Elizabeth Turner-Nichols
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert Wilkie
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Allison Snipes
Pierce & Shearer LLP 2055 Woodside Road Suite 110
Redwood City, CA 94061 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Peter O'Rourke
Terminated: 08/21/2018
Washington, DC 20420
|
Docket last updated: 41 minutes ago |
Friday, April 09, 2021 | ||
121 | 121
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Fri 04/09 12:49 PM
STIPULATION re120 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings filed by United States of America, Denis McDonough. (Bernardoni, Jevechius) |