Idaho District Court
Judge:B Lynn Winmill
Case #: 1:18-cv-00239
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 31, 2018
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 27, 2018 2:03 AM MST
Defendant
Russell Barron
Represented By
W Scott Zanzig
Office Of The Idaho Attorney General, Civil Litigation
contact info
Defendant
Lawrence Denney
Represented By
W Scott Zanzig
Office Of The Idaho Attorney General, Civil Litigation
contact info
Defendant
Attorney General Lawrence Wasden
Represented By
W Scott Zanzig
Office Of The Idaho Attorney General, Civil Litigation
contact info
Plaintiff
Micaela Akasha De Loyola-Carkin
Represented By
Alison C Hunter
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Sara L. Ainsworth
contact info
Richard C Boardman
Perkins Coie
contact info
Kevin Diaz
Compassion & Choices
contact info
Kim Clark
Legal Voice
contact info
Sara L Ainsworth
Legal Voice
contact info
Plaintiff
Anna Almerico
Represented By
Alison C Hunter
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Sara L. Ainsworth
contact info
Richard C Boardman
Perkins Coie
contact info
Kevin Diaz
Compassion & Choices
contact info
Kim Clark
Legal Voice
contact info
Sara L Ainsworth
Legal Voice
contact info
Plaintiff
Chelsea Gaona-Lincoln
Represented By
Alison C Hunter
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Sara L. Ainsworth
contact info
Richard C Boardman
Perkins Coie
contact info
Kevin Diaz
Compassion & Choices
contact info
Kim Clark
Legal Voice
contact info
Sara L Ainsworth
Legal Voice
contact info
Plaintiff
Hannah Sharp
Represented By
Alison C Hunter
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Sara L. Ainsworth
contact info
Richard C Boardman
Perkins Coie
contact info
Kevin Diaz
Compassion & Choices
contact info
Kim Clark
Legal Voice
contact info
Sara L Ainsworth
Legal Voice
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
State of Idaho
Terminated: 06/22/2018
Represented By
W Scott Zanzig
Office Of The Idaho Attorney General, Civil Litigation
contact info

GPO Mar 28 2019
MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 17) is GRANTED, with leave to amend. If no amended complaint is filed within 30 days, the case will be closed. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
GPO Jun 17 2019
MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration (Dkt. 34) is DENIED. The stay in this case (Dkt. 36) is LIFTED. Plaintiffs have thirty days from the date of this Memorandum Decision and Order to file an amended complaint. If an amended complaint is not filed, the Clerk of the Court is hereby ORDERED to close this case. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)

Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Thursday, November 14, 2019
51 51 notice Notice of Filing of Official Transcript Thu 11/14 7:11 AM
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript (th)
Related: [-]
50 50 misc Transcript Thu 11/14 7:11 AM
Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/08/19 before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Court Reporter/Transcriber Tamara I. Hohenleitner, Email tammy_hohenleitner@id.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. This transcript is not available to the general public and as such is sealed. Redaction Request due 12/5/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/16/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2020. (th)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2019
49 49 minutes Motion Hearing Wed 11/13 5:30 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge B. Lynn Winmill: Motion Hearing held on 11/8/2019 re 44 Motion to Dismiss. The Court denied the Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. (Court Reporter Tammy Hohenleitner.) (jlb)
Related: [-]