Hipp v. Moody et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | John J Tuchi |
Referred: | Eileen S Willett |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-08113 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | May 29, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 14, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Friday, December 21, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 12/26 3:40 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Aaron Allan Hipp. Reason for return: Not in Custody. Document number11 . NOTE: ADOC website says Plaintiff is located at ASPC Red Rock. Doc7 and8 were mailed to ASPC Red Rock. (DXD) |
|
Friday, December 14, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
order
Clerks Judgment
Fri 12/14 11:39 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the Court's order filed October 15, 2018, Plaintiff to take nothing, and the complaint and action are dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim. This dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). (REK) |
|
Wednesday, October 31, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 10/31 4:14 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Aaron Allan Hipp at Yavapai County Detention Center. Reason for return: Not in Custody. Document number8 and9 . (DXD) |
|
Monday, October 15, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order Directing Prisoner Payment
Mon 10/15 2:04 PM
ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Aaron Allan Hipp. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 10/15/18. (DXD) |
|
8 | 8
18
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 10/15 2:03 PM
ORDER granting5 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff must pay the $350.00 filing fee and is not assessed an initial partial filing fee. The Complaint (Doc.1 ) is dismissed for failure to state a claim with 30 days leave to file a first amended complaint. The Clerk shall enter judgment of dismissal with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g) and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot if Plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 10/15/18. (DXD) |
|
Friday, August 31, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 09/04 1:54 PM
NOTICE re: Future Address Change by Aaron Allan Hipp. (1 page) (GMP) |
|
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Tue 07/03 10:26 AM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Aaron Allan Hipp. (SLQ) (4 pages) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/03 10:25 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Aaron Allan Hipp. (SLQ) (2 pages) |
|
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
6
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 06/11 4:02 PM
ORDER - Within 30 days of the date this Order, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. If Plaintiff fails to either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 6/11/18. (MSA) |
|
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 05/31 4:48 PM
Amended Notice of Assignment. (BAS) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Assignment
Thu 05/31 3:20 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: (MSA) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 05/31 3:15 PM
PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Aaron Allan Hipp. (5 pages)(MSA) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |