Krayn Wind LLC v. Federal Energy Regulatory Commission
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sara Lioi |
Case #: | 5:18-cv-01244 |
Nature of Suit | 422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158 |
Cause | 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA |
Case Filed: | Jun 01, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 10, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 28, 2018 3:59 AM EST |
Appellant
Krayn Wind LLC
|
Represented By
|
Appellee
Federal Energy Regulatory Commission
|
Represented By
|
Appellee
FirstEnergy Generation, LLC
341 White Pond Dr.
Akron, OH 44320 |
Represented By
|
Appellee
FirstEnergy Solutions Corporation
341 White Pond Dr.
Akron, OH 44320 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, August 10, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
3
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 08/10 10:34 AM
Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal: Pursuant to the provisions of Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8023, the undersigned Krayn, FirstEnergy Solutions Corp. and FirstEnergy Generation, LLC, who are the parties to this appeal, stipulate and agree that this appeal should be dismissed, with prejudice. Krayn, FirstEnergy Solutions Corp. and FirstEnergy Generation, LLC further stipulate and agree that the parties shall bear their own costs. In an abundance of caution because it was docketed as Appellee, Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC) does not oppose the stipulation and thus signs below. . Judge Sara Lioi on 8/10/2018. (P,J) |
|
Thursday, August 09, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Stipulation
Thu 08/09 10:49 AM
Proposed Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8023 filed by Krayn Wind LLC. (Atkinson, Todd) |
|
Tuesday, July 31, 2018 | ||
order
Order
Tue 07/31 7:22 AM
Order [non-document] staying all briefing; opening briefs, if required, are due 30 days after the date upon which the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals rules on the direct certification petition in this and related cases 5:18-cv-1251 and 5:18-cv-1259. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/31/2018. (D,S) |
||
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice
Tue 07/10 8:18 AM
List of Exhibits received from U.S Bankruptcy Court. Five (5) binders of exhibits on file in the Akron Clerk's Office. (M,TL) |
|
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
transc
Transcript - Official Court Transcript filed by Court Reporter
Tue 07/03 3:32 PM
Transcript of U.S. Bankruptcy Court Hearing held on 06/08/2018. (M,TL) |
|
18 | 18
transc
Transcript - Official Court Transcript filed by Court Reporter
Tue 07/03 3:29 PM
Transcript of U.S. Bankruptcy Court Hearing held on 05/14/2018. (M,TL) |
|
17 | 17
transc
Transcript - Official Court Transcript filed by Court Reporter
Tue 07/03 3:26 PM
Transcript of U.S. Bankruptcy Court Hearing held on 05/11/2018. (M,TL) |
|
16 | 16
transc
Transcript - Official Court Transcript filed by Court Reporter
Tue 07/03 3:22 PM
Transcript of U.S. Bankruptcy Court Hearing held on 05/03/2018. (M,TL) |
|
15 | 15
transc
Transcript - Official Court Transcript filed by Court Reporter
Tue 07/03 3:19 PM
Transcript of U.S. Bankruptcy Court Hearing held on 04/24/2018. (M,TL) |
|
14 | 14
transc
Transcript - Official Court Transcript filed by Court Reporter
Tue 07/03 3:14 PM
Transcript of U.S. Bankruptcy Court Hearing held on 04/10/2018. (M,TL) |
|
13 | 13
transc
Transcript - Official Court Transcript filed by Court Reporter
Tue 07/03 3:11 PM
Transcript of U.S. Bankruptcy Court Hearing held on 04/10/2018. (M,TL) |
|
12 | 12
transc
Transcript - Official Court Transcript filed by Court Reporter
Tue 07/03 3:07 PM
Transcript of U.S. Bankruptcy Court Hearing held on 04/09/2018. (M,TL) |
|
11 | 11
transc
Transcript - Official Court Transcript filed by Court Reporter
Tue 07/03 3:03 PM
Transcript of U.S. Bankruptcy Court Hearing held on 04/09/2018. (M,TL) |
|
10 | 10
transc
Transcript - Official Court Transcript filed by Court Reporter
Tue 07/03 2:55 PM
Transcript of U.S. Bankruptcy Court Hearing held on 04/02/2018. (M,TL) |
|
9 | 9
transc
Transcript - Official Court Transcript filed by Court Reporter
Tue 07/03 2:50 PM
Transcript of U.S. Bankruptcy Court Hearing held on 04/02/2018 . (M,TL) |
|
8 | 8
appeal
Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability
Tue 07/03 1:43 PM
Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (M,TL) |
|
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 06/15 2:26 PM
Motion for attorney James E. Tysse to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8759716, filed by FirstEnergy Generation, LLC, FirstEnergy Solutions Corporation.(DelGrosso, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of James E. Tysse in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice | ||
6 | 6
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 06/15 2:23 PM
Motion for attorney Pratik A. Shah to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8759699, filed by FirstEnergy Generation, LLC, FirstEnergy Solutions Corporation.(DelGrosso, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Pratik A. Shah in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice | ||
order
Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
Fri 06/15 5:05 PM
Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Pratik A. Shah for FirstEnergy Generation, LLC, and FirstEnergy Solutions Corporation. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. . Judge Sara Lioi on 6/15/2018.(T,Je) |
||
order
Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
Fri 06/15 5:07 PM
Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney James E. Tysse for FirstEnergy Generation, LLC, and FirstEnergy Solutions Corporation. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. . Judge Sara Lioi on 6/15/2018.(T,Je) |
||
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
Thu 06/14 8:42 AM
Order [non-document] granting motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Brian T. Carney for FirstEnergy Generation, LLC and FirstEnergy Solutions Corporation. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. . Judge Sara Lioi on 6/14/2018.(P,J) |
||
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 06/13 2:19 PM
Motion for attorney Brian T. Carney to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8755057, filed by FirstEnergy Generation, LLC, FirstEnergy Solutions Corporation.(DelGrosso, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Brian T. Carney in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice | ||
Monday, June 04, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Attorney Appearance
Mon 06/04 3:23 PM
Attorney Appearance by Lisa S. DelGrosso filed by on behalf of FirstEnergy Solutions Corporation, FirstEnergy Generation, LLC. (DelGrosso, Lisa) |
|
3 | 3
order
Initial Order
Mon 06/04 10:00 AM
Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 6/4/2018. (P,J) |
|
Friday, June 01, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
order
Administrative Track DCM Initial Order
Fri 06/01 10:12 AM
Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (M,TL) |
|
1 | 1
7
pgs
cmp
Bankruptcy Appeal
Fri 06/01 9:58 AM
Appeal from Bankruptcy Court of Order dated May 11, 2018 filed by Krayn Wind LLC. (M,TL) (M,TL) |
|
Att: 1 Bankruptcy Preliminary Injunction against the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission, | ||
Att: 2 Bankruptcy Memorandum Decision Supporting Order Granting Preliminary Injunction, | ||
Att: 3 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet | ||
Att: 4 (6/1/2018) Bankruptcy Transmission Form | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Fri 06/01 9:59 AM
Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (M,TL) |
||
oth_evt
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge
Fri 06/01 10:11 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,TL) |
||
oth_evt
Notice of Filing Appeal from Bankruptcy Decision
Fri 06/01 10:13 AM
Notice [non-document] to the parties that an appeal from the order of U.S. Bankruptcy Judge Alan M. Koschik, U.S. Bankruptcy Case No. 18-05021 has been filed with the U.S. District Court. All further correspondence and filings relating to the appeal should bear the civil action number of the U.S. District Court. (M,TL) |