ANTOINE v. SEARS, ROEBUCK & CO. et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Gerald A Mchugh |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-02308 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Jun 01, 2018 |
Re-opened: | Jun 02, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jun 02, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 28, 2018 4:26 AM EST |
Defendant
SEARS, ROEBUCK & CO.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NIKOLE VILE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
WEDY ANTOINE
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
SEARS HOLDINGS CORPORATION
Terminated: 08/28/2018
3333 BEVERLY ROAD
HOFFMAN ESTATES, IL 60179 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, June 02, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 06/02 12:47 PM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR CASE CLOSURE (ECF 26) IS GRANTED, AND THE CLERK IS DIRECTED TO REMOVE THIS CASE FROM SUSPENSE AND CLOSE THIS MATTER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 6/1/23. 6/2/23 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL; E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 05/23 8:21 AM
ORDER THAT A STATUS CONFERENCE CALL IS SCHEDULED FOR THURSDAY, JUNE 1, 2023, AT 1:30 P.M. CALL-IN INFORMATION WILL BE EMAILED TO COUNSEL.SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 5/22/23. 5/23/23 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL; E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Fri 05/05 3:08 PM
RESPONSE in Support re26 MOTION for Case Closure filed by SEARS HOLDINGS CORPORATION, SEARS, ROEBUCK & CO., NIKOLE VILE. (BALDWIN, RAYMOND) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 04/28 11:52 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re26 MOTION for Case Closure filed by WEDY ANTOINE. (CARSON, SETH) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 04/10 4:04 PM
MOTION for Case Closure filed by SEARS HOLDINGS CORPORATION, SEARS, ROEBUCK & CO., NIKOLE VILE.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(BALDWIN, RAYMOND) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Case Closure, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, June 26, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Status Report
Fri 06/26 10:48 AM
STATUS REPORT Regarding Bankruptcy by SEARS, ROEBUCK & CO.. (BALDWIN, RAYMOND) |
|
Tuesday, April 28, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Status Report
Tue 04/28 1:44 PM
STATUS REPORT Regarding Bankruptcy by SEARS, ROEBUCK & CO.. (BALDWIN, RAYMOND) |
|
Friday, February 28, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Status Report
Fri 02/28 10:03 AM
STATUS REPORT RE BANKRUPTCY by SEARS, ROEBUCK & CO.. (BALDWIN, RAYMOND) |
|
Tuesday, December 31, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Status Report
Tue 12/31 1:04 PM
STATUS REPORT RE BANKRUPTCY by SEARS, ROEBUCK & CO.. (BALDWIN, RAYMOND) |
|
Friday, November 01, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Status Report
Fri 11/01 10:49 AM
STATUS REPORT REGARDING BANKRUPTCY by SEARS, ROEBUCK & CO.. (BALDWIN, RAYMOND) |
|
Thursday, September 05, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Status Report
Thu 09/05 1:03 PM
STATUS REPORT Regarding Bankruptcy by SEARS, ROEBUCK & CO.. (BALDWIN, RAYMOND) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Status Report
Wed 07/03 11:23 AM
STATUS REPORT Regarding Bankruptcy by SEARS, ROEBUCK & CO.. (BALDWIN, RAYMOND) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Status Report
Fri 04/12 10:24 AM
STATUS REPORT Regarding Bankruptcy by SEARS, ROEBUCK & CO..(BALDWIN, RAYMOND) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, February 13, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Status Report
Wed 02/13 11:16 AM
STATUS REPORT RE BANKRUPTCY by SEARS, ROEBUCK & CO.. (BALDWIN, RAYMOND) |
|
Friday, December 14, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Status Report
Fri 12/14 9:53 AM
STATUS REPORT Regarding Bankruptcy by SEARS, ROEBUCK & CO.. (BALDWIN, RAYMOND) |
|
Tuesday, October 16, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
order
Suspense Order
Tue 10/16 11:51 AM
ORDER THAT THIS CASE BE PLACED IN CIVIL SUSPENSE PENDING THE OUTCOME OF THE BANKRUPTCY. COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT SEARS, ROEBUCK & CO. SHALL ADVISE THE COURT EVERY 60 DAYS AS TO THE STATUS OF THE BANKRUPTCY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 10/15/2018. 10/16/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
Monday, October 15, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Suggestion of Bankruptcy
Mon 10/15 3:38 PM
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY by SEARS, ROEBUCK & CO. under Chapter Number 11 of the Bankruptcy Code in the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Southern District of New York filed under case number 18-23537 . (JANSON, ERIC) |
|
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 10/12 11:23 AM
ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF HAVEN L. CLAYTOR, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 10/12/18. 10/12/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED & E-MAILED. ECF APPLICATION MAILED TO CLAYTOR.(fdc) |
|
Thursday, October 11, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
Thu 10/11 3:28 PM
APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Haven L. Claytor by SEARS HOLDINGS CORPORATION, SEARS, ROEBUCK & CO., NIKOLE VILE. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13103883.). (JANSON, ERIC) |
|
Wednesday, October 10, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 10/10 2:24 PM
ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF RAYMOND C. BALDWIN, ESQ. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 10/10/2018. 10/10/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 10/10 10:41 AM
(SEE DOC. NO.9 FOR FEE INFORMATION) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Raymond C. Baldwin by SEARS HOLDINGS CORPORATION, SEARS, ROEBUCK & CO., NIKOLE VILE.. (JANSON, ERIC) Modified on 10/10/2018 (amas) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
Wed 10/10 10:16 AM
(FILED IN ERROR, ATTY TO RE-FILE WITH CORRECT ATTACHMENTS) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Raymond C. Baldwin by SEARS HOLDINGS CORPORATION, SEARS, ROEBUCK & CO., NIKOLE VILE. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13098477.). (JANSON, ERIC) Modified on 10/10/2018 (amas) |
|
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 09/19 4:13 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by NIKOLE VILE.(JANSON, ERIC) |
|
Thursday, August 30, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
service
Affidavit of Service
Thu 08/30 1:23 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Robert Campbell re: served Summons & Complaint upon Nikole Vile by personal service on 08/29/2018 (CARSON, SETH) |
|
Tuesday, August 28, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
Tue 08/28 5:35 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER R. BOOTH, JR on behalf of WEDY ANTOINE(BOOTH, CHRISTOPHER) |
|
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 08/28 5:27 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WEDY ANTOINE. SEARS, ROEBUCK & CO. waiver sent on 8/24/2018, answer due 10/23/2018. (CARSON, SETH) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 08/28 5:19 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Sears Holdings Corporation by WEDY ANTOINE. (CARSON, SETH) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/28 4:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SETH CARSON on behalf of WEDY ANTOINE with Certification of Service(CARSON, SETH) |
|
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/08 1:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER R. BOOTH, JR on behalf of WEDY ANTOINE with Certificate of Service(BOOTH, CHRISTOPHER) |
|
Friday, June 01, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Fri 06/01 6:22 PM
COMPLAINT against SEARS HOLDINGS CORPORATION, SEARS, ROEBUCK & CO., NIKOLE VILE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-12843253.), filed by WEDY ANTOINE.(MILLER, CAROLINE) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form, | ||
Att: 3 Case Management Track Form | ||
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/04 8:45 AM
Summons Issued as to SEARS HOLDINGS CORPORATION, SEARS, ROEBUCK & CO., NIKOLE VILE. 3 Forwarded To: Counsel on 6/4/2018. (ahf) |
||
misc
Jury Demand
Mon 06/04 8:45 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by WEDY ANTOINE. (ahf) |