HTC Corporation et al v. Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson et al
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rodney Gilstrap |
Case #: | 6:18-cv-00243 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jun 01, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 22, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 28, 2018 2:58 AM CST |
Defendant
Ericsson Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
David Folsom
dfolsom@jw.com Jackson Walker, LLP 6002-B Summerfield Drive
Texarkana, TX 75503 |
|
Plaintiff
HTC America Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
HTC Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 28, 2021 | ||
577 | 577
appeal
USCA Judgment
Tue 09/28 9:20 AM
USCA JUDGMENT as to548 Notice of Appeal filed by HTC America Inc, HTC Corporation. Ordered and adjudged that the judgment of the District Court is Affirmed. (gsg) (gsg, ) |
|
Att: 1 30 pgs (9/28/2021) Opinion, | ||
Att: 2 (9/28/2021) Cover Letter |