Securities and Exchange Commission v. Alderson et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Valerie E Caproni |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-04930 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:77 Securities Fraud |
Case Filed: | Jun 04, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 08, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 24, 2019 7:01 AM EDT |
Defendant
Benjamin Alderson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bradley Hamilton
|
Represented By
|
Miscellaneous
Non-party Brite Advisors USA, Inc. f/k/a deVere USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Securities and Exchange Commission
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Wednesday, July 08, 2020 | ||
131 | 131
order
Memo Endorsement
Wed 07/08 5:50 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re:126 Letter filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. ENDORSEMENT: Judgment having been entered against all Defendants, the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate all motions and deadlines and close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/08/2020) (ama) |
|
130 | 130
order
Judgment - Consent ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Wed 07/08 5:47 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT ON CONSENT AS TO DEFENDANT BENJAMIN ALDERSON: IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Defendant is liable for disgorgement of $265,000, representing profits gained as a result of the conductalleged in the Complaint, together with prejudgment interest thereon in the amount of $10,060.57, and a civil penalty in the amount of $125,000 pursuant to Advisers Act Section 209(e), 15 U.S.C. § 80b-9(e). Defendant shall satisfy this obligation by paying $400,060.57 to the Securities and Exchange Commission pursuant to the terms of the payment schedule set forth in paragraph VI below after entry of this Final Judgment. Defendant shall pay the total of disgorgement, prejudgment interest, and penalty due of $400,060.57 in two installments to the Commission according to the following schedule: (1) the$125,000 civil penalty within 30 days of entry of this Final Judgment; (2) the $275,060.57 disgorgement and prejudgment interest within 364 days of the entry of this Final Judgment. Payments shall be deemed made on the date they are received by the Commission and shall be applied first to post judgment interest, which accrues pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1961 on any unpaid amounts due after 30 days of the entry of Final Judgment. Prior to making the final payment set forth herein, Defendant shall contact the staff of the Commission for the amount due for the final payment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that this Court shall retain jurisdiction of this matter for the purposes of enforcing the terms of this Final Judgement. There being no just reason for delay, pursuant to Rule 54(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Clerk is ordered to enter this Final Judgment forthwith and without further notice., Benjamin Alderson terminated. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/08/2020) (ama) |
|
129 | 129
order
Judgment - Consent ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Wed 07/08 5:39 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT ON CONSENT AS TO DEFENDANT BRADLEY HAMILTON: IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Defendant is liable for disgorgement of $265,000, together with prejudgment interest thereon in the amount of $10,060.57, and a civil penalty in the amount of $75,000 pursuant to Advisers Act Section 209(e), 15 U.S.C. § 80b-9(e). Defendant shall satisfy this obligation by paying $350,060.57 to the Securities and Exchange Commission pursuant to the terms of the payment schedule set forth in paragraph III below after entry of this Final Judgment. Defendant shall pay the total of disgorgement, prejudgment interest, and penalty due of $350,060.57 in two installments to the Commission according to the following schedule: (1) the$75,000 civil penalty within 30 days of entry of this Final Judgment; (2) the $275,060.57 disgorgement and prejudgment interest within 364 days of the entry of this Final Judgment. Payments shall be deemed made on the date they are received by the Commission and shall be applied first to post judgment interest, which accrues pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1961 on any unpaid amounts due after 30 days of the entry of Final Judgment. Prior to making the final payment set forth herein, Defendant shall contact the staff of the Commission for the amount due for the final payment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that this Court shall retain jurisdiction of this matter for the purposes of enforcing the terms of this Final Judgement. There being no just reason for delay, pursuant to Rule 54(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Clerk is ordered to enter this Final Judgment forthwith and without further notice., Bradley Hamilton terminated. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/08/2020) (ama) |
|
128 | 128
misc
Proposed Judgment
Wed 07/08 4:26 PM
PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Bliss, Dugan) |
|
Att: 1 8 pgs Exhibit Consent to Judgment by Bradley Hamilton | ||
127 | 127
misc
Proposed Judgment
Wed 07/08 4:24 PM
PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Bliss, Dugan) |
|
Att: 1 6 pgs Exhibit Consent to Judgment by Benjamin Alderson | ||
126 | 126
misc
Letter
Wed 07/08 4:21 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Dugan Bliss, Ross Carmel, and Mark Landau dated July 8, 2020 re: Settlement. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Bliss, Dugan) |
|
misc
Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order
Wed 07/08 4:34 PM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document No. 127 Proposed Judgment, was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt) |
||
misc
Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order
Wed 07/08 4:35 PM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document No. 128 Proposed Judgment, was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt) |
||
utility
Case Stay Lifted
Wed 07/08 5:51 PM
Case Stay Lifted. (ama) |
||
utility
Terminate Transcript Deadlines
Wed 07/08 5:52 PM
Terminate Transcript Deadlines (ama) |