Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Pension Fund et al v. Verticon, Inc.
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Ellen L Hollander |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-01593 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1145 E.R.I.S.A. |
Case Filed: | Jun 04, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 31, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 01, 2018 4:41 AM EST |
Defendant
Verticon, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
M. Eddie Moore Scholarship Trust Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steamfitters Local Union No. 602
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Medical Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Pension Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Training Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Industry Promotion Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the International Training Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Local 602 Communications and Productivity Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 76 minutes ago |
Tuesday, August 20, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Judgment
Tue 08/20 11:19 AM
ORDER granting17 Plaintiff's MOTION for Judgment against Garnishee Wells Fargo, N.A. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 8/20/2019. (ol, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Thursday, May 09, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Judgment
Thu 05/09 12:41 PM
MOTION for Judgment against Garnishee Wells Fargo, N.A. by M. Eddie Moore Scholarship Trust Fund, Steamfitters Local Union No. 602, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Medical Fund, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Pension Fund, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Training Fund, Trustees of the Industry Promotion Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Local 602 Communications and Productivity Fund, Trustees of the Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund(Kelser, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, May 08, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
respoth
Answer to Writ of Garnishment
Wed 05/08 2:20 PM
ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Wells Fargo, N.A.. (bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
respoth
Answer to Writ of Garnishment
Wed 04/10 2:52 PM
ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Wells Fargo, N.A. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, March 04, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
order
Writ Issued
Mon 03/04 9:28 AM
WRIT of Garnishment issued (jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, March 01, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Application/Request for Writ
Fri 03/01 2:22 PM
APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment of Account in Financial Institution (Wells Fargo N.A.)(Kelser, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Writ of Garnishment | ||
12 | 12
misc
Application/Request for Writ
Fri 03/01 1:33 PM
FILED IN ERROR, COUNSEL WILL REFILE - APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment of Account in Financial Institution (Wells Fargo N.A.)(Kelser, Andrew) Modified on 3/1/2019 (jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Writ of Garnishment | ||
Friday, August 31, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
order
Judgment - Consent
Fri 08/31 12:12 PM
CONSENT JUDGMENT entered in favor of plaintiffs against Verticon, Inc. in the amount of $151,516.19 Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 8/31/2018. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Judgment
Fri 08/31 8:51 AM
Consent MOTION for Judgment and to Close Case by M. Eddie Moore Scholarship Trust Fund, Steamfitters Local Union No. 602, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Medical Fund, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Pension Fund, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Training Fund, Trustees of the Industry Promotion Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Local 602 Communications and Productivity Fund, Trustees of the Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund(Kelser, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Settlement Agreement and Release, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, August 15, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 08/16 8:21 AM
ORDER granting8 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Randall Richard Hopp terminated. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 8/15/2018. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 08/15 2:15 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (R. Richard Hopp only) by M. Eddie Moore Scholarship Trust Fund, Steamfitters Local Union No. 602, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Medical Fund, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Pension Fund, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Training Fund, Trustees of the Industry Promotion Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Local 602 Communications and Productivity Fund, Trustees of the Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund(Hopp, Randall) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/15 1:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Kelser on behalf of M. Eddie Moore Scholarship Trust Fund, Steamfitters Local Union No. 602, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Medical Fund, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Pension Fund, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Training Fund, Trustees of the Industry Promotion Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Local 602 Communications and Productivity Fund, Trustees of the Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund(Kelser, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, July 30, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 07/30 12:02 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by M. Eddie Moore Scholarship Trust Fund, Steamfitters Local Union No. 602, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Medical Fund, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Pension Fund, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Training Fund, Trustees of the Industry Promotion Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Local 602 Communications and Productivity Fund, Trustees of the Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund re5 Clerk's Entry of Default served on Defendant Verticon, Inc. (Hopp, Randall) |
|
5 | 5
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Mon 07/30 11:52 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Verticon, Inc. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Default - Clerk's Entry of
Wed 07/25 2:55 PM
MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense against Defendant Verticon, Inc., by M. Eddie Moore Scholarship Trust Fund, Steamfitters Local Union No. 602, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Medical Fund, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Pension Fund, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Training Fund, Trustees of the Industry Promotion Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Local 602 Communications and Productivity Fund, Trustees of the Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund(Hopp, Randall) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default against Defendant Verticon, Inc., | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 07/03 10:37 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Local 602 Communications and Productivity Fund, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Training Fund, Trustees of the Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund, Steamfitters Local Union No. 602, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Medical Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, M. Eddie Moore Scholarship Trust Fund, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Pension Fund, Trustees of the Industry Promotion Fund. Verticon, Inc. served on 6/28/2018, answer due 7/19/2018.(Hopp, Randall) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service on Defendant Verticon, Inc., | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, June 04, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/04 8:43 AM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Verticon, Inc.(jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/04 8:08 AM
COMPLAINT against Verticon, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7364551.), filed by Trustees of the Local 602 Communications and Productivity Fund, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Training Fund, Trustees of the Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund, Steamfitters Local Union No. 602 of the United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada, AFL-CIO, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Medical Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, M. Eddie Moore Scholarship Trust Fund, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Pension Fund, Trustees of the Industry Promotion Fund.(Hopp, Randall) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |