GREEN v. BRANNON
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Mark E Walker |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-00101 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 05, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 09, 2018 |
Defendant
BRANNON
|
|
Plaintiff
ZACHARY D GREEN
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 15, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 08/15 10:51 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to ZACHARY D GREEN Re:5 ORDER ACCEPTING AND ADOPTING4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION,6 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (**Return to sender - Insufficient address - Unable to forward.**) (kdm) |
|
Thursday, August 09, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
order
Judgment (Signed by Clerk: Not an Opinion)
Thu 08/09 11:09 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re 5 ORDER ACCEPTING AND ADOPTING 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (kdm) |
|
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendation
Thu 08/09 11:06 AM
ORDER ACCEPTING AND ADOPTING 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 8/9/2018. The Clerk shall enter judgment stating, "This case is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to comply with an order of the Court and failure to prosecute." The Clerk shall close the file. (kdm) |
|
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Report and Recommendation
Fri 07/13 1:56 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION -- It is recommended that this case be DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to comply with an order of the Court and failure to prosecute. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 7/13/2018. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 8/10/2018 . (kdm) |
|
Wednesday, July 11, 2018 | ||
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Wed 07/11 8:52 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re:3 Order - Complaint and Motion for IFP or Fee due by 7/6/2018. (None filed to date.) (kdm) |
||
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for TRO
Wed 06/06 1:34 PM
ORDER striking 1 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 6/6/2018. The Clerk must send Plaintiff a blank Complaint form and a blank IFP motion and Prisoner Consent and Financial Certificate form. (Mailed as directed above.) (kdm) |
|
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 06/06 1:38 PM
Set Deadlines per3 Order: Complaint due by 7/6/2018 ., Motion for IFP or Fee due by 7/6/2018 . (kdm) |
||
Tuesday, June 05, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice to Pro Se
Tue 06/05 2:30 PM
Notice to Pro Se. Mailed to: ZACHARY D GREEN, A128531, LANCASTER CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, 3449 SW SR26, TRENTON, FL 32693. (kdm) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Temporary Restraining Order
Tue 06/05 2:23 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by ZACHARY D GREEN. (kdm) |
|
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Tue 06/05 2:31 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re:1 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Referred to GARY R JONES. (kdm) |