FERGUSON v. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-01396 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jun 05, 2018 |
Re-opened: | Jun 25, 2021 |
Terminated: | Dec 08, 2021 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 02, 2018 3:30 AM EST |
Defendant
BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
|
|
Defendant
OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
|
|
Plaintiff
BRADLEY FERGUSON
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, December 08, 2021 | ||
39 | 39
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Wed 12/08 9:43 AM
CLERK'S DISMISSAL re38 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice. (djb) |
|
Tuesday, December 07, 2021 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 12/07 2:54 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY. (HILL, THOMAS) |
|
Wednesday, August 04, 2021 | ||
37 | 37
appeal
USCA Mandate
Fri 08/06 8:58 AM
MANDATE of USCA. The enclosed copy of this Court's Order of Dismissal is issued as the mandate of this court. re:32 Notice of Appeal filed by BRADLEY FERGUSON. USCA Case Number 21-11914 AA. (djb) |
|
Friday, June 25, 2021 | ||
36 | 36
1
pgs
order
Order Reopening Case
Fri 06/25 3:15 PM
ORDER - On May 3, 2021, the above-referenced case was mistakenly dismissed with prejudice for failure to submit a case-specific expert report. See ECF No. 30 . Consequently, the Court vacates the Order entered on May 3, 2021, reopens this case and directs the Clerk to transmit a copy of this Order to the Eleventh Circuit. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 6/25/2021. (order sent as directed) (djb) |
|
Friday, June 18, 2021 | ||
appeal
~Util Terminate Appeal Deadlines
Fri 06/18 7:51 AM
Appeal Deadlines Terminated re32 Notice of Appeal filed by BRADLEY FERGUSON Transcript Order Form Due 06/17/2021 (djb) |
||
appeal
~Util - Set Appeal Deadlines
Fri 06/18 7:52 AM
Set Deadlines re32 Notice of Appeal : Clerk to check status of Appeal on 8/17/2021 . (djb) |
||
Monday, June 07, 2021 | ||
35 | 35
appeal
USCA Case Number
Mon 06/07 1:23 PM
USCA Case Number 21-11914 AA for32 NOTICE OF APPEAL. (jcw) |
|
Thursday, June 03, 2021 | ||
34 | 34
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Thu 06/03 1:27 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re32 Notice of Appeal. (djb) |
|
33 | 33
appeal
Appeal Instructions
Thu 06/03 1:09 PM
Appeal Instructions re:32 Notice of Appeal : The Transcript Request Form is available on the Internet at http://www.flnd.uscourts.gov/forms/Attorney/ECCA_transcript_form_fillable.pdf **PLEASE NOTE** Separate forms must be filed for each court reporter. Transcript Order Form due by 6/17/2021 . (djb) |
|
32 | 32
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Thu 06/03 1:07 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to30 Order Dismissing Case, by BRADLEY FERGUSON. ( (Filing fee $ 505. Receipt #FLN300014642) (djb) |
|
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Thu 06/03 12:45 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by BRADLEY FERGUSON to 1532 Menard St., St. Louis, MO 63104. (djb) |
|
Monday, May 03, 2021 | ||
30 | 30
4
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 05/04 8:17 AM
ORDER - This case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for the plaintiffs' failure to comply with Court orders. The Clerk is directed to close the case in its entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/3/3021. (djb) |
|
Monday, March 23, 2020 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order - Sealed PDF ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 03/23 1:25 PM
SEALED ORDER granting 24 Ex Parte MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel of Record Without Substitution. T. Christopher Pinedo, Esq. and the law firm of Hilliard Martinez Gonzalez are relieved of any further obligation for representation of Plaintiff Bradley Ferguson in this matter. Mr. Ferguson will be permitted 30 days from the entry of this Order to retain substitute counsel. Additionally, Mr. Ferguson must produce an expert report on specific causation that fully complies with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) to Defendants, in accordance with the Courts Order dated March 4, 2020, Case No. 3:16md2734, ECF No. 1263, by Friday, May 22, 2020 . Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/23/2020. (order mailed to plaintiff as directed) (Substitution of Counsel Deadline - by 4/22/2020 .) (djb) |
|
Friday, March 20, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Sealed Document - Sealed PDF
Fri 03/20 2:03 PM
Sealed Document. (djb) |
|
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Fri 03/20 2:04 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:28 Sealed Document,24 Ex Parte MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel of Record Without Substitution (djb) |
||
Tuesday, March 10, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Sealed Document - Sealed PDF
Tue 03/10 7:24 AM
Sealed Document. (djb) |
|
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Tue 03/10 7:26 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:24 Ex Parte MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel of Record Without Substitution,27 Sealed Document (djb) |
||
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Response to Motion 1 - Exparte Document - Use ONLY in Conjunction with Other Selection
Wed 02/26 10:32 AM
Ex Parte Objection to24 Ex Parte MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel of Record Without Substitution filed by BRADLEY FERGUSON. (djb) |
|
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Wed 02/26 10:33 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:26 Ex parte Objection to Motion24 Ex Parte MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel of Record Without Substitution (djb) |
||
Friday, February 21, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order - Sealed PDF
Fri 02/21 3:37 PM
SEALED ORDER REGARDING EX PARTE MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL. Mr. Fergusons case is hereby removed from the fast-track schedule, and discovery in this case is STAYED until the issue of representation is resolved. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/21/2020. (djb) |
|
Thursday, February 20, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 02/20 3:59 PM
Ex Parte MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel of Record Without Substitution by BRADLEY FERGUSON. (PINEDO, THOMAS) Modified on 2/20/2020 (djb) |
|
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Thu 02/20 4:06 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:24 Ex Parte MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel of Record Without Substitution (djb) |
||
Tuesday, December 31, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 12/31 9:24 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN S COLTON on behalf of BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (COLTON, LAUREN) |
|
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 12/31 9:11 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JULIE SCHINDEL on behalf of BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (SCHINDEL, JULIE) |
|
Friday, December 20, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Amended Document - NOT Motion
Fri 12/20 2:10 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by BRADLEY FERGUSON. NOTICE REGARDING ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTS . (PINEDO, THOMAS) |
|
Tuesday, December 17, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
7
pgs
order
Order
Tue 12/17 2:12 PM
ORDER re 15 MOTION to Strike Certifications and Dismiss Claims of Plaintiffs with Insufficient Documentation. The following motions pending on individual dockets are likewise DENIED, for the reasons stated in the body of this Order: Smith, 3:17cv474 ECF No. 16; Hutt, 3:17cv634 ECF No. 15; Monet, 3:18cv043 ECF No. 13; Odeh, 3:18cv44, ECF No. 18; Bandur, 3:18cv126 ECF No. 17; Jahn, 3:18cv398 ECF No. 12; Crawford, 3:18cv2069 ECF No. 36; Santucci and Valcourt-Taylor, 3:18cv2071 ECF No. 47. In Ferguson, 3:18cv1396 the Clerk is directed to terminate the pending motion, ECF No. 15, as moot. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 12/17/2019. (djb) |
|
Wednesday, December 11, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 12/11 12:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANAND AGNESHWAR on behalf of BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (AGNESHWAR, ANAND) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 12/11 12:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by PAIGE SHARPE on behalf of BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (SHARPE, PAIGE) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 12/11 12:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW A EISENSTEIN on behalf of BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (EISENSTEIN, MATTHEW) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 12/11 12:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MITCHELL RUSSELL STERN on behalf of BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (STERN, MITCHELL) |
|
Friday, December 06, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Strike
Fri 12/06 5:57 PM
MOTION to Strike Certifications and Dismiss Claims of Plaintiffs with Insufficient Documentation by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 12/20/2019) . (CAMPBELL, MATTHEW) |
|
Wednesday, November 27, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 11/27 9:04 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (CONNELLY, LUKE) |
|
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 11/27 9:03 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC. (CONNELLY, LUKE) |
|
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 11/27 6:28 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY. (STERN, MITCHELL) |
|
Monday, November 25, 2019 | ||
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Mon 11/25 8:36 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:11 NOTICE of Defendants' Submission Regarding Lexecon Rights,10 AMENDED DOCUMENT by BRADLEY FERGUSON. PLAINTIFFS STATEMENT THAT LEXECON IS NOT WAIVED, filed per9 ORDER. (MB) |
||
Friday, November 22, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Fri 11/22 6:39 PM
NOTICE of Defendants' Submission Regarding Lexecon Rights by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD (CAMPBELL, MATTHEW) |
|
Thursday, November 21, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Amended Document - NOT Motion
Thu 11/21 11:01 AM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by BRADLEY FERGUSON. PLAINTIFFS STATEMENT THAT LEXECON IS NOT WAIVED . (PINEDO, THOMAS) |
|
Wednesday, November 13, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
5
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 11/14 9:21 AM
ORDER - By Friday, November 22, 2019 , each plaintiff must file a statement on his or her individual docket advising whether Lexecon will be waived. By that same date, Defendants must file a statement in each case advising whether they waive Lexecon. Individual cases will be set for trial, or remanded to the district where venue is proper, in early summer 2020. The Clerk is directed enter a copy of this Order on the individual docket for each of the cases identified on Exhibit A. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/13/2019. (djb) |
|
Monday, October 28, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 10/29 8:53 AM
ORDER - Defendants are granted 30 days from the date of this Order to file a case-specific response to the complaints of the plaintiffs identified on Exhibit A. For any case in which Defendants move to dismiss certain counts in the complaint, the plaintiff's response is due within 14 days after service of the motion. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/28/2019.(Defendants Responses due by 11/27/2019 .) (djb) |
|
Monday, October 14, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 10/14 2:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS LARRY HILL on behalf of BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (HILL, THOMAS) |
|
Thursday, October 03, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
respoth
Response/Reply
Thu 10/03 11:30 AM
RESPONSE by BRADLEY FERGUSON re1 Complaint PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE AND COUNSELS CERTIFICATION . (PINEDO, THOMAS) |
|
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Thu 10/03 2:27 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:6 Plaintiff's Response and Counsel's Certification (djb) |
||
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/06 12:59 PM
Summons Issued as to BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (djb) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Wed 06/06 10:14 AM
NOTICE OF SUMMONS by BRADLEY FERGUSON re1 Complaint (PINEDO, THOMAS) |
|
Att: 1 SUMMONS, | ||
Att: 2 SUMMONS | ||
3 | 3
misc
Docket Annotation
Wed 06/06 9:49 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Note to Attorney T. Christopher Pinedo, to please review MDL 2734 ORDER No. 252 for instructions regarding "New Attorneys of Record" and file your PHV motion in the Lead case, 3:16md2734. Re2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4196854.) filed by BRADLEY FERGUSON. (This motion will be terminated and the finance department will be notified regarding a refund of the PHV filing fee once the motion is filed in the correct case) (djb) |
|
Tuesday, June 05, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 06/05 4:30 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4196854.) by BRADLEY FERGUSON. (PINEDO, THOMAS) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/05 4:10 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4196809.), filed by BRADLEY FERGUSON. (PINEDO, THOMAS) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 06/06 9:37 AM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR no longer assigned to case. (djb) |