LONGSTREET v. POOL
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Mark E Walker |
Referred: | Charles A Stampelos |
Case #: | 4:18-cv-00268 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 05, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 04, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 02, 2018 4:46 AM EST |
Defendant
SHAVONYA POOL
|
|
Defendant
R W IVEY
|
|
Defendant
ROBERT R KYNOCH
|
|
Plaintiff
ANTHONY O LONGSTREET
3301 CIVIC CENTER DRIVE UNIT 8-D
NORTH LAS VEGAS, NV 89030 |
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 04, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
order
Judgment (Signed by Clerk: Not an Opinion)
Wed 09/04 1:36 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT pursuant to 32 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation. (blb) |
|
32 | 32
1
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendation Order on Report and Recommendation
Wed 09/04 1:31 PM
ORDER ACCEPTING AND ADOPTING 29 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The report and recommendation is accepted and adopted as this Court's opinion. The Clerk shall enter judgment stating, "This case is DISMISSED for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with a Court order." The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 9/4/19. (blb) |
|
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Wed 09/04 10:12 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re:29 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. *No objections filed* (toy) |
||
Tuesday, August 20, 2019 | ||
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Tue 08/20 9:40 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re:30 Mail Returned,31 Mail Returned. (toy) |
||
Monday, August 19, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 08/20 9:39 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to ANTHONY O LONGSTREET Re:29 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. "Return To Sender - Attempted - Not Known - Unable to Forward." (toy) |
|
30 | 30
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 08/20 9:37 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to ANTHONY O LONGSTREET Re:20 ORDER. "Return to Sender - Attempted - Not Known - Unable to Forward" (toy) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Report and Recommendation
Tue 08/06 1:46 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Complaint filed by ANTHONY O LONGSTREET - It is recommended this case be DISMISSED for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with a Court Order.R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 08/06/2019. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 9/3/2019 . (toy) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 08/02 3:16 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. "Return to Sender, No Deliverable As Addressed, Unable to Forward." Mail sent to ANTHONY O LONGSTREET Re:26 ORDER. (toy) |
|
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Fri 08/02 3:16 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re:28 Mail Returned. (toy) |
||
Wednesday, July 31, 2019 | ||
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Wed 07/31 7:18 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re:27 Notice (Other). (toy) |
||
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 07/31 7:19 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings Status Report due by 10/31/2019 . (toy) |
||
Tuesday, July 30, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Tue 07/30 10:35 AM
NOTICE OF CASE STATUS by R W IVEY, ROBERT R KYNOCH, SHAVONYA POOL re26 Order,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,, Set/Clear Flags,, (STAFFORD, WILLIAM) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Docket Sheet | ||
Thursday, July 11, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
7
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Thu 07/11 10:25 AM
ORDER. Defendants' motion, ECF No. 24 , is GRANTED in part and this case shall be STAYED. No later than August 1, 2019, Plaintiff and Defendants shall file a "status update" concerning the pending state criminal proceeding, and must file an additional status update every three months thereafter. The Clerk of Court shall refer this file upon the filing of a status update, or no later than August 1, 2019. ( Notify Chambers on 8/1/2019 ., Status Report due by 8/1/2019 .), Set "STAYED" Flag. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 07/11/2019. (toy) |
|
Wednesday, June 05, 2019 | ||
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Wed 06/05 7:54 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re:25 Order. *No response filed* (toy) |
||
Friday, May 03, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
3
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 05/03 9:14 AM
ORDER. Ruling on Defendants' motion, ECF No. 24 , is DEFERRED. Plaintiff has until June 4, 2019, in which to file a response in opposition to Defendant's motion. The Clerk of Court shall refer this file upon Plaintiff's filing of a response to the pending motion, or no later than June 4, 2019. (Notify Chambers on 6/4/2019 ., Plaintiff's Response to motion due by by 6/4/2019 .). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 05/03/2019. (toy) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2019 | ||
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Tue 04/30 7:37 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re:24 MOTION to Dismiss . Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (toy) |
||
Monday, April 29, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Dismiss
Mon 04/29 7:44 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by R W IVEY, ROBERT R KYNOCH, SHAVONYA POOL. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 5/13/2019) . (STAFFORD, WILLIAM) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Wednesday, April 17, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 04/17 1:59 PM
ORDER. The second motion for an extension of time, ECF No. 22 , is GRANTED. Defendants have until April 30, 2019, in which to file an answer or other response to Plaintiff's amended complaint. The Clerk shall refer this file upon the Defendants' filing of an answer or other responsive pleading, or no later than April 30, 2019. R W IVEY answer due 4/30/2019; ROBERT R KYNOCH answer due 4/30/2019; SHAVONYA POOL answer due 4/30/2019.( Notify Chambers on 4/30/2019 ., Answers due by 4/30/2019 .) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 04/17/2019. (toy) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2019 | ||
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Tue 04/16 7:58 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re:22 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to8 Amended Complaint . Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (toy) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 04/15 9:23 AM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to8 Amended Complaint by R W IVEY, ROBERT R KYNOCH, SHAVONYA POOL. (STAFFORD, WILLIAM) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2019 | ||
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Thu 04/04 7:53 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re:21 Summons Returned Executed. (toy) |
||
Wednesday, April 03, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 04/04 7:52 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to R W Ivey (toy) |
|
Att: 1 Kynoch Summons Returned, | ||
Att: 2 Pool Summons Returned | ||
20 | 20
3
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 04/03 1:11 PM
ORDER. The motion for an extension of time, ECF No. 19 , is GRANTED. Defendants have until April 15, 2019, in which to file an answer or other response to Plaintiff's amended complaint.The Clerk shall refer this file upon the Defendants' filing of an answer or other responsive pleading, or no later than April 15, 2019. R W IVEY answer due 4/15/2019; ROBERT R KYNOCH answer due 4/15/2019; SHAVONYA POOL answer due 4/15/2019.( Notify Chambers on 4/15 /2019 ., Answer due by 4/15/2019 .) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 04/03/2019. (toy) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2019 | ||
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Tue 04/02 7:56 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re:19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to8 Amended Complaint . Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (toy) |
||
Monday, April 01, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 04/01 2:19 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to8 Amended Complaint by R W IVEY, ROBERT R KYNOCH, SHAVONYA POOL. (STAFFORD, WILLIAM) |
|
Friday, March 01, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/01 8:21 AM
Summons Issued as to R W IVEY, ROBERT R KYNOCH, SHAVONYA POOL - and forwarded to USM. (toy) |
|
Thursday, February 28, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
5
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 03/01 8:16 AM
ORDER. The Clerk of Court shall issue a summons for each named Defendant: Shavonya Pool, Robert R. Kynoch, and R.W. Ivey. The Clerk shall provide the summonses and service copies of the 8 amended complaint to the United States Marshals Service along with a copy of this Order. The Clerk shall refer this file if a signed waiver form Plaintiff previously mailed to the Defendants is filed, if service on a Defendant is returned unexecuted, if the Marshals Service has filed a statement of costs incurred for making personal service, or no later than April 15, 2019. ( Notify Chambers on 4/15/2019 .). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 02/28/2019. *Copies provided as instructed* (toy) |
|
Friday, February 22, 2019 | ||
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Fri 02/22 10:25 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re:16 Notice - Service copies of complaint not provided. (toy) |
||
Thursday, February 21, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Fri 02/22 10:23 AM
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH COURT ORDER by ANTHONY O LONGSTREET re15 Order. ( 3 copies of notice provided - not service copies of complaint) (toy) |
|
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
5
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 01/16 8:26 AM
ORDER GRANTING 14 MOTION FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY US MARSHAL. (Service Copies and notice of request to waive service of process due by 2/15/2019 ., Notify Chambers on 2/15/2019 . ). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 01/15/2019. (toy) |
|
Monday, January 14, 2019 | ||
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Mon 01/14 2:12 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re:14 MOTION. Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (rcb) |
||
Friday, January 11, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 01/14 2:10 PM
PLAINTIFF MOTION FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY US MARSHAL by ANTHONY O LONGSTREET. (rcb) |
|
Friday, December 21, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order on Report and Recommendation
Fri 12/21 12:45 PM
ORDER REJECTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND REMANDING TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR FURTHER CONSIDERATION. This Court has considered, without hearing, the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation, ECF No. 11 , and has also reviewed de novo Plaintiff's objections to the report and recommendation, ECF No. 12 . This Court rejects the report and remands this action to the Magistrate Judge to consider Plaintiffs explanation in the first instance. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 12/21/2018. (kjw) |
|
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Fri 12/21 12:47 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re:13 ORDER REJECTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND REMANDING TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR FURTHER CONSIDERATION. (kjw) |
||
Thursday, December 20, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Thu 12/20 4:01 PM
OBJECTION to11 Report and Recommendations by ANTHONY O LONGSTREET. (pll) |
|
Monday, December 03, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Report and Recommendation
Mon 12/03 1:06 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. It is respectfully RECOMMENDED that this case be DISMISSED for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with court orders. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 12/3/2018. (kjw) |
|
Monday, November 26, 2018 | ||
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Mon 11/26 8:07 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re:10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. No Response has been filed. (kjw) |
||
Monday, October 29, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 10/30 8:00 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Plaintiff's Show Cause Response due by 11/15/2018 . Notify Chambers on 11/15/2018 ). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 10/29/2018. (vkm) |
|
Friday, October 26, 2018 | ||
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Fri 10/26 2:19 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re:9 Order -- Notify Chambers on 10/16/2018. (kdm) |
||
Tuesday, August 14, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
6
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 08/15 9:27 AM
ORDER - Plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint, ECF No. 7 , is GRANTED and the Clerk of Court shall file the amended complaint. The Clerk of Court shall issue summonses for Defendants POOL, IVEY AND KYNOCH. The Clerk shall also forward to Plaintiff three copies of AO Form 399, six copies of AO Form 398 along with this Order (Notify Chambers on 10/16/2018 ). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 8/14/2018. (vkm) |
|
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 08/13 2:51 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against SHAVONYA POOL, R W IVEY, ROBERT R KYNOCH, filed by ANTHONY O LONGSTREET. (vkm) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Amend/Correct - for Requesting Leave of Court to Amend
Mon 08/13 2:48 PM
MOTION FOR LEAVE to Amend1 Complaint by ANTHONY O LONGSTREET. (vkm) |
|
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Mon 08/13 2:54 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re:8 FIRST Amended Complaint,7 MOTION to Amend1 Complaint,5 Order - NO SUMMONS RETURN FILED. Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (vkm) |
||
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Fri 06/08 1:07 PM
Summons Issued as to SHAVONYA POOL. (vkm) |
|
Thursday, June 07, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 06/08 1:06 PM
ORDER - Plaintiff's motion for in forma pauperis status, ECF No. 2 , is GRANTED and Plaintiff is not required to pay the filing fee. The Clerk of Court shall issue a summons for Defendant POOL, and deliver the summons along with a copy of AO Form 399, two copies of AO Form 398, a form for consenting to trial by the magistrate judge and this Order to Plaintiff (Notify Chambers on 8/6/2018 ). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 6/7/2018. (vkm) |
|
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Thu 06/07 1:56 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: 3 Filing Fee Received. (vkm) |
||
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice to Pro Se
Wed 06/06 4:20 PM
Notice to Pro Se. (vkm) |
|
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Wed 06/06 4:22 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re:1 Complaint,2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (vkm) |
||
Tuesday, June 05, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Filing Fee Received
Wed 06/06 4:19 PM
Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number FLN400034294. Fee status updated to paid. (vkm) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 06/06 4:18 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ANTHONY O LONGSTREET. (vkm) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/06 4:16 PM
COMPLAINT against SHAVONYA POOL, filed by ANTHONY O LONGSTREET. (vkm) |