ARCHIE v. JONES
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Charles A Stampelos |
Case #: | 5:18-cv-00134 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Jun 05, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 13, 2018 |
Petitioner
ERNEST L ARCHIE JR
|
|
Respondent
JULIE JONES
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
Judgment (Signed by Clerk: Not an Opinion)
Thu 09/13 9:56 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re 7 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation. (90 Day Deadline set for 12/12/2018 to dispose working file pursuant to retention policy). (MB) |
|
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendation
Thu 09/13 9:45 AM
ORDER adopting 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The § 2254 petition for writ of habeas corpus, ECF No. 1 , is DISMISSED. A certificate of appealability is DENIED and leave to appeal in forma pauperis is also DENIED. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 09/13/2018. (MB) |
|
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Wed 09/12 12:05 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:4 Report and Recommendations. Objections deadline has expired; mail was returned undelivered. (ckm) |
||
Tuesday, September 04, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 09/05 4:06 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to ERNEST L ARCHIE, JR at 4415 Florelle Way in Pensacola re:3 Order and4 Report and Recommendation returned. (ckm) |
|
Att: 1 Mail Sent to Petitioner at Northwest Florida Reception Center re: | ||
Att: 4 Report and Recommendation returned. | ||
Friday, August 24, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Mail Returned
Mon 08/27 10:27 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to ERNEST L ARCHIE, JR at Northwest Florida Reception Center re:3 Order returned. (ckm) |
|
Tuesday, August 14, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Report and Recommendation
Tue 08/14 10:38 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - It is therefore, respectfully RECOMMENDED that this case be DISMISSED without prejudice. R&R flag set. (Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 9/11/2018 .) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 8/14/2018. (ckm) |
|
Tuesday, July 17, 2018 | ||
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Tue 07/17 12:18 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re:3 Order. No fee/IFP received; deadline has expired. (ckm) |
||
Thursday, June 07, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Thu 06/07 10:31 AM
ORDER - The Clerk of Court shall forward to Petitioner an application for leave to proceed IFP. (Fee/IFP due by 7/9/2018 .) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 6/7/2018. (ckm) |
|
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice to Pro Se
Wed 06/06 7:49 AM
Notice to Pro Se. (kjw) |
|
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Wed 06/06 7:50 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (kjw) |
||
Tuesday, June 05, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Wed 06/06 7:47 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by ERNEST L ARCHIE, JR. (No fee paid. No Motion for IFP filed. Two service copies provided.) (kjw) |