Szakacs v. Commissioner of Social Security
New York Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Therese Wiley Dancks |
Case #: | 5:18-cv-00664 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Jun 06, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 05, 2019 |
Defendant
Commissioner of Social Security
|
|
Interested Party
Social Security Administration
|
|
Plaintiff
Chad Joseph Szakacs
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 13, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
9
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Tue 10/13 10:29 AM
DECISION AND ORDER: that Mr. Olinsky's Dkt. No.15 motion for an award of attorney's fees pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 406(b) is Granted in the amount of $12,536.40; that the amount of $12,536.40 in attorney's fees pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 406(b) shall be paid to Mr. Olinsky out of the sums that Defendant has withheld from Plaintiff's and his dependents' past-due benefits; that, upon his receipt of attorney's fees in the amount of $12,536.40, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 406(b), Mr. Olinsky shall immediately refund to Plaintiff the previously awarded EAJA sum of $5,300.00. This case remains closed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 10/13/2020. (hmr) |
|
Friday, May 15, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 05/15 12:32 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re15 First MOTION for Attorney Fees pursuant to 42 U.S.C. §406(b)(1) filed by Chad Joseph Szakacs. (Olinsky, Howard) |
|
Friday, May 08, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order on Letter Request
Fri 05/08 3:34 PM
TEXT ORDER granting Plaintiff's21 Letter Request for permission to file a Reply to Defendant's response (Dkt. Nos.19 and20 ) re:15 Motion for Attorney's Fees: Plaintiff's Reply to Response to Motion due by 5/15/2020, and shall be no more than 5 pp, 12pt font, single spaced. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 5/8/2020. (sg) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Letter Request/Motion
Fri 05/08 2:43 PM
Letter Motion from Howard Olinsky for Chad Joseph Szakacs requesting Leave to File A Reply to Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees submitted to Judge Dancks . (Olinsky, Howard) |
|
Wednesday, May 06, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Amended Document - NOT Motion
Wed 05/06 11:16 AM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Commissioner of Social Security. Amendment to19 LETTER BRIEF to include Attachment which was mistakenly not filed earlier .(Fernandez, Sixtina) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) | ||
19 | 19
misc
Letter Brief
Wed 05/06 9:44 AM
LETTER BRIEF in response to Plaintiff's 406(b) fees petition by Commissioner of Social Security. (Fernandez, Sixtina) |
|
Wednesday, April 08, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Letter Request
Wed 04/08 9:17 AM
TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's17 Letter Request for extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's15 Motion for Attorney Fees pursuant to 42 U.S.C. §406(b)(1): Response to Motion due by 5/5/2020. Counsel are reminded that requests for extensions of court ordered deadlines must include a good cause reason for the requested extension. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 4/8/2020. (sg) |
|
Tuesday, April 07, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Letter Request/Motion
Tue 04/07 5:04 PM
Letter Motion from Sixtina Fernandez for Commissioner of Social Security requesting extension of time submitted to Judge Dancks . (Fernandez, Sixtina) |
|
Tuesday, March 24, 2020 | ||
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 03/24 8:57 AM
Set Deadline as to15 First MOTION for Attorney Fees pursuant to 42 U.S.C. §406(b)(1) . Response to Motion due by 4/7/2020. (see) |
||
Monday, March 23, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice - Other
Mon 03/23 3:46 PM
NOTICE by Chad Joseph Szakacs re15 First MOTION for Attorney Fees pursuant to 42 U.S.C. §406(b)(1) Corrected Exhibit F (Olinsky, Howard) |
|
notice
Notice - Other
Mon 03/23 1:40 PM
TEXT NOTICE to Attorney Howard Olinsky, re:15 First MOTION for Attorney Fees pursuant to 42 U.S.C. §406(b)(1) . Exhibit F is only the exhibit marker, there is no further document that follows. Please electronically file this full exhibit ASAP. (see) |
||
Friday, March 20, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Attorney Fees
Fri 03/20 4:50 PM
First MOTION for Attorney Fees pursuant to 42 U.S.C. §406(b)(1) filed by Chad Joseph Szakacs. (Olinsky, Howard) |
|
Att: 1 Affirmation, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) A Notice of Decision Fully Favorable, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) B Executed Fee Agreement, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) C SSD Important Information Letter, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) D SSD Notice in Change in Benefits Letter Lilliana Grace Szakacs, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) E D SSD Notice in Change in Benefits Letter K.E.S., | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) F All FDC Professional Time breakdown, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) G Attorney Time breakdown, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) H Paralegal Time breakdown, | ||
Att: 10 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, November 21, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
order
Stipulation and Order
Thu 11/21 11:09 AM
Consent Order for Payment of Fees Pursuant to the EAJA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 11/21/2019. (sg ) |
|
Wednesday, November 13, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Stipulation
Wed 11/13 7:15 AM
STIPULATION for Payment of EAJA Fees by Commissioner of Social Security submitted to Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. (Fernandez, Sixtina) |
|
Friday, October 25, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Attorney Fees
Fri 10/25 4:20 PM
First MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412 filed by Chad Joseph Szakacs. (Olinsky, Howard) |
|
Att: 1 Affirmation, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) A CPI Table, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) B All Professional Time, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) C Attorney Time, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) D Paralegal Time, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) E Costs, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) F Affirmation and Waiver of Direct Payment of EAJA Fees, | ||
Att: 8 Memorandum of Law, | ||
Att: 9 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, August 05, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
order
Judgment
Mon 08/05 2:48 PM
JUDGMENT remanding action pursuant to sentence 4 of 42 U.S.C. 405(g), in accordance with the10 Decision & Order of Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. (see) |
|
10 | 10
23
pgs
order
Order
Mon 08/05 2:36 PM
DECISION & ORDER that pltf's motion for judgment on the pleadings is GRANTED; deft's motion for judgment on the pleadings is DENIED; and the decision of the Commissioner be REVERSED and this case REMANDED, pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g), for a proper determination of pltf's residual functional capacity and other further proceedings, consistent with this Decision & Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 8/5/2019. (see) |
|
Monday, December 10, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Social Security Defendant Brief
Mon 12/10 1:31 PM
DEFENDANT'S BRIEF by Commissioner of Social Security. (Fernandez, Sixtina) |
|
Friday, October 26, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Social Security Plaintiff Brief
Fri 10/26 3:05 PM
PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF by Chad Joseph Szakacs. Defendant Brief due by 12/10/2018. (Olinsky, Howard) |
|
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Social Security Administrative Record / Transcript - Pilot
Tue 09/11 10:34 AM
Social Security Administrative Record / Transcript. Plaintiff Brief due by 10/26/2018. (Fernandez, Sixtina) |
|
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Consent / Declination Form - Pilot
Wed 06/20 7:12 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY CONSENT / DECLINATION FORM filed by Commissioner of Social Security advising of consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (Fernandez, Sixtina) |
|
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Consent / Declination Form - Pilot
Tue 06/19 4:59 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY CONSENT / DECLINATION FORM filed by Chad Joseph Szakacs advising of consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (Olinsky, Howard) |
|
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Commissioner - Pilot
Wed 06/13 7:05 AM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Sixtina Fernandez appearing for Commissioner of Social Security . Social Security Administrative Transcript due by 9/11/2018. (Fernandez, Sixtina) |
|
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
misc
G.O. 18 & SSA Case Assignment Form - Pilot
Wed 06/06 2:15 PM
Social Security Appeal Case Assignment Form and General Order #18 Issued. Pursuant to General Order #18, in the event the Plaintiff does not timely consent, or if the United States timely withdraws its consent, the case will be reassigned to a District Judge consistent with General Order #12 . Social Security Consent/Declination Form due by 6/27/2018. (see) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Social Security Identification Form - Pilot [LODGED] Social Security Identification Form - Pilot [LODGED]
Wed 06/06 2:12 PM
Social Security Identification Form [LODGED] [Pursuant to General Order #18, this document has been electronically lodged with the Court and will be removed from the docket upon the filing of the Administrative Transcript. Viewable by case participants and court personnel only, it is not a filed document, therefore is not available for public inspection. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited] . (see) |
|
1 | 1
cmpssa
Complaint - Social Security Appeal
Wed 06/06 2:10 PM
COMPLAINT - Social Security Appeal. [Pursuant to General Order #18, Section B(3), the CM/ECF system will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing to the USAO-NDNY and Regional Counsel for the Social Security Administration. Service of a Complaint along with the Social Security Identification Form under the Pilot Program will be considered complete only when the three steps in paragraph 3(A), 3(B) and 3(C) of General Order #18 have been completed.] (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4408656).(see) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |