Vielma et al v. Gruler et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Paul G Byron |
Referred: | Karla R Spaulding |
Case #: | 6:18-cv-00884 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 07, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 14, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 04, 2018 4:09 AM EST |
Defendant
John Does 1-15
|
|
Defendant
John Does 21-30
|
|
Defendant
John Does 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Adam Todd Gruler
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
City of Orlando
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rodney Sumter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose Vielma
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria Sanfeliz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carlos Sanfeliz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nelson Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nereida Ribot
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yazmin Reyes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Diana Montes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mavelyn Merced
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Littlestar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christine Leinonen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jackson J. Josaphat
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aracelis Maria Jimenez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Juan Guerrero
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Gonzalez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marissa Delgado
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Digna Rosa-Fernandez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bienvenido Aracena
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Miguel Vega
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jammy Valentin Fernandez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronise Rose Celestin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mercedes A. McQuery
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Victor Maldonado
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ruben Enrique Garcia-Tejada
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mercedes Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Olga M. Disla-Mencia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Omar Delgado
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bernice DeJesus
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Juan Jose Cufino Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bernedette Cruz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Texidor-Carrasquillo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Norman Estevent Casiano-Mojica
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keinon Carter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carmen Nilda Capo-Quinones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jordan M. Botelho
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Juan Antonetti
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Javier Antonetti
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kaliesha M. Andino
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edwin Rivera Alvarez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marely Menendez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carleen Thomas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joaquin Rojas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rolando Jose Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dimarie Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sandy Roberts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Corey Richards
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kadim Ramos
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose Carlos Ramirez-Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Emily Ann Portalatin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carlos Javier Perez-Anglero
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nicholas Perez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose Elmer Pacheco Andrade
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christian Ortiz-Cardona
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nathan Orozco
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carlos B. Muniz-Torres
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ismail Morales
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leonel Melendez
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
The Estate of Jean Carlos Nieves
Terminated: 06/25/2018
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Estate of Simon Adrian Carrillo Fernandez
Terminated: 06/25/2018
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Estate of Rodolfo Ayala
Terminated: 06/25/2018
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Estate of Peter O. Gonzalez-Cruz
Terminated: 06/25/2018
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Estate of Luis Omar Ocasio-Capo
Terminated: 06/25/2018
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Estate of Louis S. Vielma
Terminated: 06/25/2018
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Estate of Leroy Valentin Fernandez
Terminated: 06/25/2018
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Estate of Angel Candelario Padro
Terminated: 06/25/2018
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Estate of Javier J. Reyes
Terminated: 06/25/2018
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Estate of Gilberto R. Silva Menendez
Terminated: 06/25/2018
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Estate of Gerardo Antonio Ortiz-Jiminez
Terminated: 06/25/2018
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Estate of Franky Jimmy DeJesus Velasquez
Terminated: 06/25/2018
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Estate of Christopher Sanfeliz
Terminated: 06/25/2018
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Estate of Christopher Leinonen
Terminated: 06/25/2018
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Estate of Antonio Brown
Terminated: 06/25/2018
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Estate of Anthony Laueano-Disla
Terminated: 06/25/2018
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 05, 2020 | ||
76 | 76
appeal
USCA Mandate
Tue 05/05 2:28 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to70 Notice of Appeal filed by Corey Richards, The Estate of Simon Adrian Carrillo Fernandez, Diana Montes, Bernedette Cruz, Leonel Melendez, Christian Ortiz-Cardona, Dimarie Rodriguez, Marissa Delgado, The Estate of Anthony Laueano-Disla, The Estate of Luis Omar Ocasio-Capo, Nelson Rodriguez, The Estate of Louis S. Vielma, The Estate of Peter O. Gonzalez-Cruz, The Estate of Rodolfo Ayala, Carlos Sanfeliz, Robert Texidor-Carrasquillo, Carlos B. Muniz-Torres, The Estate of Franky Jimmy DeJesus Velasquez, Ronise Rose Celestin, Aracelis Maria Jimenez, Jackson J. Josaphat, Maria Sanfeliz, Digna Rosa-Fernandez, Ismail Morales, Sandy Roberts, Carlos Javier Perez-Anglero, Omar Delgado, Mercedes A. McQuery, Nathan Orozco, The Estate of Javier J. Reyes, Juan Guerrero, Jordan M. Botelho, Juan Jose Cufino Rodriguez, Bernice DeJesus, Jose Elmer Pacheco Andrade, Victor Maldonado, Norman Estevent Casiano-Mojica, Jammy Valentin Fernandez, Kaliesha M. Andino, Javier Antonetti, Marely Menendez, Edwin Rivera Alvarez, The Estate of Gerardo Antonio Ortiz-Jiminez, Nicholas Perez, The Estate of Leroy Valentin Fernandez, Christopher Littlestar, The Estate of Christopher Sanfeliz, Nereida Ribot, The Estate of Jean Carlos Nieves, Donald Brown, The Estate of Christopher Leinonen, The Estate of Angel Candelario Padro, Michael Gonzalez, Emily Ann Portalatin, Rolando Jose Rodriguez, The Estate of Gilberto R. Silva Menendez, Carmen Nilda Capo-Quinones, Mavelyn Merced, Yazmin Reyes, Carleen Thomas, Olga M. Disla-Mencia, Joaquin Rojas, Christine Leinonen, The Estate of Antonio Brown, Jose Carlos Ramirez-Martinez, Kadim Ramos, Ruben Enrique Garcia-Tejada, Rodney Sumter, Jose Vielma, Miguel Vega, Juan Antonetti, Keinon Carter, Mercedes Garcia, Bienvenido Aracena Issued as Mandate: 05/05/2020 USCA number: 18-15162 AFFIRMED. Defendants' motion for sanctions is DENIED. (ALL) |