The United States of America v. Morales George et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Ursula Ungaro |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-22264 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1345 USA Plaintiff |
Case Filed: | Jun 07, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 15, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 04, 2018 4:07 AM EST |
Defendant
Barbara Morales George
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
Bob Zwicky
|
|
Plaintiff
The United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Receiver
George Richards
|
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
BankUnited
Terminated: 07/19/2018
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
34 | 34
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 02/25 11:32 AM
NOTICE by George Richards re23 Administrative Order,, Add Parties, Notice of Filing Receiver's Final Report and Accounting (Smith, Chapman) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Receiver's Final Report and Accounting | ||
Thursday, February 20, 2020 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 02/20 1:18 PM
NOTICE by George Richards re27 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,28 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction - Chambers and Clerks of Depositing Proceeds of Sale (Smith, Chapman) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Deposit Receipt | ||
Tuesday, February 18, 2020 | ||
32 | 32
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 02/18 11:47 AM
ORDER granting31 Motion to Award Final Fees and Costs to the Receiver and Receiver's Counsel. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 2/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (cbr) |
|
Thursday, February 13, 2020 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 02/13 3:40 PM
Unopposed MOTION Motion to Award Final Fees and Costs of Receivership re23 Administrative Order,, Add Parties, by George Richards.(Smith, Chapman) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit D | ||
Monday, February 03, 2020 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 02/03 2:07 PM
NOTICE by George Richards re27 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief of Closing on Receiver's Sale (Smith, Chapman) |
|
29 | 29
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 02/03 2:02 PM
NOTICE by George Richards re28 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction - Chambers and Clerks of Closing on Receiver's Sale (Smith, Chapman) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Clerks Notice of Docket Correction - Chambers and Clerks
Thu 07/25 1:25 PM
Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re 26 Order Approving Sale of Receivership Property. Document Restricted Due to Error ; The correct document has been attached to this notice. (drz) |
|
27 | 27
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 07/25 12:02 PM
ORDER Approving25 Motion for Sale of Receivership Property. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 7/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) Modified title text on 7/25/2019 (asl) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 07/22 3:18 PM
Unopposed MOTION Motion to Approve Sale of Real Property re23 Administrative Order,, Add Parties, by George Richards.(Smith, Chapman) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit B | ||
24 | 24
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 07/22 3:17 PM
Unopposed MOTION Motion to Approve Sale of Real Property re23 Administrative Order,, Add Parties, by George Richards. Attorney Chapman Smith added to party George Richards (pty:rc).(Smith, Chapman) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit B | ||
Monday, October 15, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
order
Administrative Order ~Util - Add Parties
Mon 10/15 3:40 PM
ORDER ON STIPULATION REGARDING RESTITUTION. The parties' Stipulation Regarding Restitution is hereby APPROVED. George Richards of National Auction Company is appointed as Receiver to sell the properties owned by the Defendant. The case is CLOSED for administrative purposes. All hearings are CANCELLED, all motions DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/15/2018. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Stipulation
Fri 10/12 2:31 PM
STIPULATION of Settlement by The United States of America(Croke, Danielle) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 28, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
adr
Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing
Tue 08/28 11:08 AM
NOTICE of Mediator Hearing. Mediation Hearing set for 10/16/2018 at 1:00 p.m.. (drz) |
|
Monday, August 27, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order Scheduling Mediation
Mon 08/27 3:48 PM
ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Bob Zwicky. Mediation Hearing set for 10/16/2018 at 1:00 PM Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/23/2018. See attached document for full details. (pes) |
|
Wednesday, August 22, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 08/22 4:12 PM
NOTICE by The United States of America re18 Order Referring Case to Mediation of Selection of Mediator (Croke, Danielle) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 07, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
4
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Mediation
Tue 08/07 3:36 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation.. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/6/2018. See attached document for full details. (ls) |
|
17 | 17
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 08/07 3:35 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER:. Pretrial Conference set for 1/11/2019 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Jury Trial set for 2/4/2019 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Calendar Call set for 1/30/2019 01:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Amended Pleadings due by 9/7/2018. Discovery due by 11/9/2018. Expert Discovery due by 11/9/2018. Joinder of Parties due by 9/7/2018. Motions due by 11/30/2018. Pretrial Stipulation due by 12/7/2018. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/6/2018. See attached document for full details. (ls) |
|
Friday, July 20, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1
Fri 07/20 2:45 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by The United States of America(Croke, Danielle) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Party
Thu 07/19 3:13 PM
Order on14 Stipulation to Dismiss Defendant, BankUnited, Only. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 7/19/2018. See attached document for full details. (ls) |
|
Wednesday, July 18, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation
Wed 07/18 5:15 PM
STIPULATION Joint Stipulation for Dismissal as to Defendant BankUnited, Only by The United States of America(Croke, Danielle) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 12, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 07/12 3:55 PM
BANKUNITED, N.A. ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by BankUnited. (Carman, Gary) |
|
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 07/12 8:10 AM
Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Barbara Morales George. (Fleites, Carlos) |
|
Wednesday, July 11, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Wed 07/11 2:42 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gary Michael Carman on behalf of BankUnited. Attorney Gary Michael Carman added to party BankUnited(pty:dft). (Carman, Gary) |
|
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Wed 07/11 12:54 PM
ORDER denying9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 7/10/2018. See attached document for full details. (yha) |
|
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Mon 07/09 6:01 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint, by Barbara Morales George.(Fleites, Carlos) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 07/09 5:57 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carlos M. Fleites on behalf of Barbara Morales George. Attorney Carlos M. Fleites added to party Barbara Morales George(pty:dft). (Fleites, Carlos) |
|
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Fri 06/29 2:10 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by The United States of America. BankUnited served on 6/25/2018, answer due 7/16/2018. (Croke, Danielle) |
|
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Fri 06/29 12:55 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 7/2/2018. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 6/29/2018. (yha) |
|
Tuesday, June 26, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 06/26 9:58 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by The United States of America. Barbara Morales George served on 6/21/2018, answer due 7/12/2018. (Croke, Danielle) |
|
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 06/12 2:29 PM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 8/3/2018 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. -Joint Scheduling Report due by 7/20/2018 Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 6/12/2018. (yha) |
|
Thursday, June 07, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/07 11:15 AM
Summons Issued as to BankUnited, Barbara Morales George. (rms1) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Thu 06/07 11:12 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (rms1) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/07 9:47 AM
COMPLAINT to Foreclose against BankUnited, Barbara Morales George. Filing fees $ 400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by The United States of America.(Croke, Danielle) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s) Barbara Moraels George, | ||
Att: 3 Summon(s) BankUnited, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Complaint Cover Sheet |