SANCHEZ-TIBO v. SESSIONS et al
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert L Hinkle |
Referred: | Charles A Stampelos |
Case #: | 4:18-cv-00272 |
Nature of Suit | 463 Immigration - Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa |
Case Filed: | Jun 07, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 16, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 04, 2018 3:35 AM EST |
Petitioner
REYNALDO SANCHEZ-TIBO
A023215915 AKA REINALDO SANCHEZ-TIBO KROME DETENTION CENTER 18201 SW 12TH ST
MIAMI, FL 33194 |
|
Respondent
KIRSTJEN NIELSEN
|
|
Respondent
JEFF B SESSIONS
|
|
Respondent
DAVID HARDIN
|
|
Respondent
MARC J MOORE
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Mail Returned
Mon 08/06 2:56 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to REYNALDO SANCHEZ-TIBO at Krome Detention Center re:8 Order for Transfer and 9 Interdistrict Transfer to the Middle District of Florida returned. The clerk is unable to locate updated address for petitioner. (ckm) |
|
Tuesday, July 24, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Acknowledgment
Thu 07/26 8:13 AM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT re 9 Case Transferred Out to Another District - Middle District of Florida case 2:18-cv-00503. (vkm) |
|
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY)
Tue 07/17 8:30 AM
Interdistrict Transfer to the Middle District of Florida Fort Myers Division located at 2110 First Street, Ft. Myers, Florida 33901. (ckm) |
|
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendation Order on Report and Recommendation
Tue 07/17 8:19 AM
ORDER FOR TRANSFER - The report and recommendation is accepted and adopted as the court's opinion. This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Ft. Myers Division. The clerk must take all steps necessary to effect the transfer. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 7/16/2018. (ckm) |
|
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Fri 07/13 8:30 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE notified that action is needed Re:4 Report and Recommendation. Objections deadline has expired; all mail addressed to Petitioner has been returned. (ckm) |
||
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 07/03 3:52 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to REYNALDO SANCHEZ-TIBO at Krome Detention Center re: 3 Notice to Pro Se and4 Report and Recommendation returned. Unable to locate new address for Petitioner. (ckm) |
|
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Tue 07/03 3:55 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re:7 Mail Returned. (ckm) |
||
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 06/27 11:46 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to REYNALDO SANCHEZ-TIBO at Glades County Detention Facility Re:4 Report and Recommendation returned, "no longer here." (ckm) |
|
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Mail Returned
Thu 06/21 9:48 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to REYNALDO SANCHEZ-TIBO at Glades County Detention Facility Re: 3 Notice to Pro Se returned. (ckm) |
|
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Report and Recommendation
Wed 06/13 10:12 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Petition. It is respectfully RECOMMENDED that Petitioners petition for writ of habeas corpus, ECF No. 1 , filed under 28 U.S.C. § 2241 be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Ft. Myers Division, for all further proceedings, and the Clerk of Court be directed to CLOSE this case. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 6/13/2018. (Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 7/11/2018 .) (tdl) |
|
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice to Pro Se
Fri 06/08 9:49 AM
Notice to Pro Se (tdl) |
|
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Fri 06/08 10:25 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, 2 Filing Fee Received. (tdl) |
||
Thursday, June 07, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Filing Fee Received
Fri 06/08 9:48 AM
HABEAS Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 4-34321 Fee status updated to paid. (tdl) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Fri 06/08 9:48 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by REYNALDO SANCHEZ-TIBO. (tdl) |