EDWARDS v. JONES
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Lacey A Collier |
Referred: | Elizabeth M Timothy |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-01400 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa |
Case Filed: | Jun 07, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 11, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Acknowledgment
Wed 06/13 2:55 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT re 4 Case Transferred Out to Another District. Case transferred from Florida Northern has been opened in Southern District of Florida as case 1:18-cv-22335, filed 06/12/2018. (djb) |
|
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY)
Mon 06/11 2:18 PM
Interdistrict Transfer to the Florida Southern, Miami Division located at Wilkie D. Ferguson, Jr. United States Court House, 400 North Miami Ave, Miami, FL 33128. (alb) |
|
3 | 3
3
pgs
order
Order
Mon 06/11 2:02 PM
ORDER re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The clerk of court shall transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida for all further proceedings. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 6/11/2018. (alb) |
|
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice to Pro Se
Fri 06/08 10:00 AM
Notice to Pro Se Litigant (alb) |
|
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Fri 06/08 10:01 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (alb) |
||
Thursday, June 07, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Fri 06/08 9:59 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by DOUGLAS TARON EDWARDS.(no service copies, IFP motion or fee) (alb) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement |