MILLER v. JOLLY ROGERS MARINE SERVICES LLC ET AL
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Roger Vinson |
Referred: | Elizabeth M Timothy |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-01402 |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Cause | 28:1333 Admiralty |
Case Filed: | Jun 08, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 14, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 05, 2018 3:57 AM EST |
Defendant
DANIEL L ADAMS
|
|
Defendant
CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOLLY ROGERS MARINE SERVICES LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DAVID E MILLER
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 14, 2020 | ||
35 | 35
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 09/14 11:24 AM
ORDER. This case is hereby dismissed, with prejudice and without taxation of costs. In the event settlement is not consummated for any reason, the Courtreserves the power, upon motion filed by either side within sixty (60) days after this date, to amend, alter or vacate and set aside this order of dismissal. The bench trial scheduled for September 21, 2020, is CANCELLED. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 9/14/2020. (mb) |
|
Friday, September 11, 2020 | ||
34 | 34
notice
Notice of Settlement
Fri 09/11 12:57 PM
JOINT NOTICE of Settlement by JOLLY ROGERS MARINE SERVICES LLC (SHOEMAKER, GREGORY) |
|
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Fri 09/11 2:25 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re:34 JOINT NOTICE of Settlement. (mb) |
||
Monday, August 24, 2020 | ||
33 | 33
order
Pretrial Order
Mon 08/24 1:49 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER. The trial of this case is set to begin Monday, September 21, 2020, in the Second Floor Courtroom at the Arnow Federal Building, at 100 North Palafox St., Pensacola, Florida. This is a bench trial and is expected to last one day. (Please see order.) Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 08/24/2020. Bench Trial set for 9/21/2020 before SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON. (alb) |
|
Thursday, August 20, 2020 | ||
32 | 32
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Final
Thu 08/20 3:09 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON:Final Pretrial Conference held on 8/20/2020. (Court Reporter Cindy Law.) (kli) |
|
31 | 31
motion
Discovery
Thu 08/20 1:17 PM
MOTION for Discovery by DAVID E MILLER. (HAUSFELD, M.) |
|
Tuesday, August 18, 2020 | ||
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Tue 08/18 2:18 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re:30 Proposed Findings of Fact. (alb) |
||
Monday, August 17, 2020 | ||
30 | 30
trial
Proposed Findings of Fact
Mon 08/17 2:25 PM
Proposed Findings of Fact by DAVID E MILLER. (HAUSFELD, M.) |
|
Friday, August 14, 2020 | ||
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Fri 08/14 9:24 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re:27 Proposed Findings of Fact,29 Notice JOINT PRE-TRIAL STIPULATION,28 Trial Brief. (alb) |
||
Thursday, August 13, 2020 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Thu 08/13 4:51 PM
NOTICE JOINT PRE-TRIAL STIPULATION by JOLLY ROGERS MARINE SERVICES LLC (SHOEMAKER, GREGORY) |
|
28 | 28
trial
Trial Brief/Memorandum
Thu 08/13 4:49 PM
TRIAL BRIEF MEMORANDUM WITH CITATION OF AUTHORITIES by JOLLY ROGERS MARINE SERVICES LLC. (SHOEMAKER, GREGORY) |
|
27 | 27
trial
Proposed Findings of Fact
Thu 08/13 4:44 PM
Proposed Findings of Fact by JOLLY ROGERS MARINE SERVICES LLC. (SHOEMAKER, GREGORY) |
|
Friday, June 26, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
order
Pretrial Order
Fri 06/26 2:13 PM
ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND SETTING TRIAL. This case is set for pretrial conference before me in Courtroom 2, Arnow Federal Building, 100 N. Palafox Street, Pensacola, Florida, on Thursday, 8/20/2020 , at 2:00 p.m. The attorneys' conference required by section II shall be held no later than 8/6/2020 . The joint pretrial stipulation and other papers required by sections III and IV shall be filed with the Clerk on or before 8/13/2020 . Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 06/26/2020. Pretrial Conference set for before SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON. (alb) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 07/02 10:14 AM
ORDER re 24 Stipulation of Dismissal. The claims against Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing to Policy Number B0621MASRSWV15BND, d/b/a/ Seawave Yacht Insurance, are hereby dismissed, with prejudice and without taxation of costs. the Court reserves the power, upon motion filed by either side within 60 days after this date, to amend, alter or vacate and set aside this order of dismissal. The claims against defendant Jolly Rogers Marine Services remain pending. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 7/1/2019. (alb) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2019 | ||
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Fri 06/28 7:56 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re:24 Stipulation of Dismissal. (alb) |
||
Wednesday, June 26, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 06/26 1:51 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by DAVID E MILLER. (HAUSFELD, M.) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Mediation Report - Impasse
Wed 04/17 3:00 PM
MEDIATION REPORT - Impasse. (KIRKLAND, BRIAN) |
|
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Wed 04/17 4:36 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re:23 Mediation Report - Impasse. (All deadlines have expired.) (alb) |
||
Friday, March 08, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Notice of Mediation re Scheduling
Fri 03/08 1:53 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATION re Scheduling . (KIRKLAND, BRIAN) |
|
Thursday, December 06, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Thu 12/06 3:57 PM
ANSWER to17 Amended Complaint by JOLLY ROGERS MARINE SERVICES LLC. (SHOEMAKER, GREGORY) |
|
Monday, November 26, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Mon 11/26 3:49 PM
ANSWER to17 Amended Complaint by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON. (SUSIK, KRISTEN) |
|
Thursday, November 15, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Thu 11/15 2:39 PM
ORDER granting 18 Motion to Extend Time. The deadline for Defendant Underwriters expert disclosures is extended by thirty (30) days. s/Elizabeth M. Timothy Chief United States Magistrate Judge on 11/15/18. (tsm) |
|
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Thu 11/15 11:35 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re:18 MOTION to Extend Time to File Expert Disclosure . Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (alb) |
||
Wednesday, November 14, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Extend Time
Wed 11/14 12:10 PM
MOTION to Extend Time to File Expert Disclosure by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON. (SUSIK, KRISTEN) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
Tuesday, November 13, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 11/13 4:06 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT MILLER, DAVID E. against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by DAVID E MILLER. (HAUSFELD, M.) |
|
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 11/13 3:18 PM
ORDER granting 15 MOTION for Leave to File Amended 1 Complaint. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 11/13/2018. (djb) |
|
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Tue 11/13 10:29 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re:15 First MOTION For Leave to File Amended1 Complaint 3:18-CV-1402 by DAVID E MILLER. (please see proposed R&O). (MB) |
||
Att: 1 Supplement MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT | ||
Friday, November 09, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Amend/Correct - for Requesting Leave of Court to Amend
Fri 11/09 3:30 PM
First MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint 3:18-CV-1402 by DAVID E MILLER. (HAUSFELD, M.) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT | ||
Friday, September 07, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 09/07 12:20 PM
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER re 11 Joint Report: Discovery due by 3/10/2019 . Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 9/7/2018. (sdw) |
|
Thursday, August 30, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Discovery Advisory
Thu 08/30 2:39 PM
DISCOVERY ADVISORY: Re12 Request for Production filed by DAVID E MILLER. Counsel's attention is directed to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5 (d), which prohibits the filing of discovery materials (including notices of deposition, deposition transcripts, interrogatories and interrogatory responses and notices thereof, production requests and responses and notices thereof, and admissions requests and responses and notices thereof) and disclosures under Rules 26(a)(1) and 26(a)(2), unless and until needed for consideration of pending motions by the court. This advisory serves as notice that no further discovery materials should be filed and all discovery posting options have been removed from CMECF. (sdw) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Request/Demand
Thu 08/30 2:14 PM
REQUEST PRODUCTION by DAVID E MILLER. (HAUSFELD, M.) |
|
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Thu 08/30 9:12 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re:11 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (MB) |
||
Wednesday, August 29, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting
Wed 08/29 2:49 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (SHOEMAKER, GREGORY) |
|
Friday, July 27, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons
Fri 07/27 2:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON identifying Corporate Parent THE TRAVELERS COMPANIES INC for CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON.. (SUSIK, KRISTEN) |
|
Thursday, July 26, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons
Thu 07/26 3:48 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by JOLLY ROGERS MARINE SERVICES LLC. (SHOEMAKER, GREGORY) |
|
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 07/17 11:26 AM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 7/30/2018 . Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/29/2018 . Discovery due by 12/10/2018 . Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 7/16/2018. (alb) |
|
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 07/13 2:53 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON. (SUSIK, KRISTEN) |
|
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Fri 07/13 1:21 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re:6 Answer to Complaint (please see proposed initial scheduling order) (djb) |
||
Thursday, July 12, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 07/12 4:46 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by JOLLY ROGERS MARINE SERVICES LLC. (SHOEMAKER, GREGORY) |
|
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/20 8:30 AM
Summons Issued as to DANIEL L ADAMS, CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON, JOLLY ROGERS MARINE SERVICES LLC. (alb) |
|
Att: 1 JOLLY ROGERS, | ||
Att: 2 UNDERWRITERS | ||
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Tue 06/19 2:05 PM
NOTICE Notice of Summons by DAVID E MILLER re1 Complaint (HAUSFELD, M.) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement | ||
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Docket Annotation
Fri 06/08 3:04 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (alb) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 06/08 11:56 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (HAUSFELD, M.) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/08 11:49 AM
COMPLAINT MILLER against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4199934.), filed by David E. Miller. (HAUSFELD, M.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A SeaWave Yacht Insurance Policy |