BONDS v. FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Mark E Walker |
Referred: | Charles A Stampelos |
Case #: | 4:18-cv-00276 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Jun 08, 2018 |
Terminated: | Feb 14, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 05, 2018 4:27 AM EST |
Defendant
FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
YOLANDA BONDS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, February 14, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
2
pgs
order
Judgment (Signed by Clerk: Not an Opinion)
Thu 02/14 1:33 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re 30 Order for Dismissal. 90 Day Exhibit Return Deadline set for 5/15/2019 (rcb) |
|
30 | 30
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 02/14 1:19 PM
ORDER FOR DISMISSAL. The parties must comply with their settlement agreement.All claims other than for enforcement of the settlement agreement are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41. Jurisdiction is retained to enforce the order to comply with the settlement agreement. The clerk must enter judgment stating, "The parties are ordered to comply with their settlement agreement. The court reserves jurisdiction to enforce the order to comply with the settlement agreement. All claims in this case are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41." The clerk must close the file. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 02/14/2019. (rcb) |
|
29 | 29
1
pgs
misc
Mediation Report - Settled
Thu 02/14 10:17 AM
MEDIATION REPORT - Settled. (CALLEN, RYAN) |
|
28 | 28
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Settlement
Thu 02/14 6:23 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by YOLANDA BONDS (MATTOX, MARIE) |
|
Tuesday, February 12, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Tue 02/12 2:05 PM
NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH (THOMPSON, THOMAS) |
|
Monday, February 11, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
order
Pretrial Order
Mon 02/11 9:03 AM
ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 02/11/2019.Attorney Conference to take place by 6/14/2019 . Pretrial Stipulation due by 6/21/2019 . Jury Trial set for 7/22/2019 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. Pretrial Conference set for 6/28/2019 01:30 PM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. (rcb) |
|
Tuesday, January 22, 2019 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 01/22 9:42 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/22/2019 . (rcb) |
||
Friday, January 18, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
2
pgs
misc
Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting
Fri 01/18 12:18 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (THOMPSON, THOMAS) |
|
Wednesday, December 19, 2018 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 12/19 9:49 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 1/18/2019 . (rcb) |
||
Tuesday, December 18, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Status Report
Tue 12/18 1:22 PM
STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT ON DISCOVERY by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH. (THOMPSON, THOMAS) |
|
Monday, November 26, 2018 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 11/26 8:56 AM
Reset Deadline re4 Initial Scheduling Order; Joint Status Report due by 12/21/2018 . (ckm) |
||
Wednesday, November 21, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
2
pgs
misc
Status Report
Wed 11/21 1:42 PM
STATUS REPORT by YOLANDA BONDS. (ELLIS, ADAM) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 11/21 11:46 AM
Reset Deadline re:4 Initial Scheduling Order: Joint Status Report due by 12/6/2018 . (No report filed since 10/8/2018.) (ckm) |
||
Tuesday, October 09, 2018 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 10/09 9:31 AM
Reset Deadline re4 Initial Scheduling Order: Joint Status Report due by 11/8/2018 . (ckm) |
||
Monday, October 08, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Status Report
Mon 10/08 12:26 PM
STATUS REPORT on Discovery (Joint) by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH. (THOMPSON, THOMAS) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Rule 26 Disclosures
Mon 10/08 11:01 AM
RULE 26 Disclosures by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH. (THOMPSON, THOMAS) |
|
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Notice of Mediation re Scheduling
Wed 09/12 1:24 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATION re Scheduling by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH (THOMPSON, THOMAS) |
|
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Compel
Tue 09/11 12:59 PM
ORDER ON MOTION TO COMPEL - Defendant's motion to compel, ECF No. 13 , is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff must answer the interrogatories at issue in Defendant's motion. Defendant is not entitled to attorney's fees for filing and arguing its motion. The Clerk is directed to cancel the hearing scheduled in this matter for September 12, 2018. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 9/11/2018. (vkm) |
|
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 09/10 1:48 PM
Reset Deadline re4 Initial Scheduling Order: Joint Status Report due by 10/9/2018 . (ckm) |
||
Thursday, August 30, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
respoth
Response/Reply
Thu 08/30 10:02 AM
REPLY by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH re16 Response to Motion Compel by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH. (THOMPSON, THOMAS) |
|
Tuesday, August 28, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion
Tue 08/28 1:50 PM
NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing on Motion13 MOTION to Compel Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2018 at 11:00 AM before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. ALL PARTIES are directed to call the AT&T Conference Line (see below) Conference Call Information You may dial into the conference call up to five minutes before start time. Call in number: 888-684-8852 When prompted for an access code, enter: 3853136# If you are asked to join as the host, just ignore and wait until you are asked for a security code. When asked for a security code, enter: 4565# Say your name, when prompted. You are now in the conference call. Remember to mute your phone when you are not speaking. The Court also asks that counsel NOT use cell phones or speaker phones during the call as the quality of the audioconnection is comprised by these devices. Note: If you or any party, witness or attorney in this matter has a disability that requires special accommodations, such as a hearing impairment that requires a sign-language interpreter or a wheelchair restriction that requires ramp access, please contact the Clerk's Office at least one week prior to the hearing (or as soon as possible) so arrangements can be made. s/ TiAnn Stark Courtroom Deputy Clerk (tss) |
|
16 | 16
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 08/28 8:48 AM
RESPONSE to13 Motion to Compel filed by YOLANDA BONDS. (ELLIS, ADAM) |
|
Friday, August 24, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines 1 - Terminate Deadlines
Fri 08/24 1:30 PM
ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE EXPEDITED RESPONSE - The Clerk is directed to set a telephonic hearing on Defendant's motion after the deadline for Plaintiff's expedited response. (Plaintiff's Response due by 8/31/2018) .) Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 8/24/2018. (ckm) |
|
Thursday, August 23, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Thu 08/23 5:06 PM
NOTICE of Plaintiff's Statement of Compliance With Rule 26 by YOLANDA BONDS (MATTOX, MARIE) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Compel
Thu 08/23 4:06 PM
MOTION to Compel by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH. (THOMPSON, THOMAS) |
|
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 08/24 11:15 AM
Set Deadline as to13 MOTION to Compel . (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 9/6/2018 .) (ckm) |
||
Wednesday, August 08, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Status Report
Wed 08/08 8:52 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT ON DISCOVERY by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH. (THOMPSON, THOMAS) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 08/08 11:21 AM
Reset Deadline re:4 Initial Scheduling Order: Joint Status Report due by 9/7/2018 . (ckm) |
||
Tuesday, August 07, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - Case Referred to Mediation
Tue 08/07 12:05 PM
SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER re: 8 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Jury Trial set for 7/22/2019 at 8:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. Discovery extended to 3/1/2019 . Dispositive Motions to be filed by 3/22/2019 . Mediation Report due by 4/12/2019 .) Case referred to mediation. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 8/7/2018. (ckm) |
|
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Tue 08/07 12:01 PM
ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION . Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 8/7/2018. (ckm) |
|
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Mon 08/06 3:33 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH. (THOMPSON, THOMAS) |
|
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 08/07 8:36 AM
Set Response Deadline as to9 Motion for Extension of Request for Production Deadline . (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 8/20/2018 .) (ckm) |
||
Friday, July 27, 2018 | ||
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Fri 07/27 8:52 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed re:8 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (cle) |
||
Thursday, July 26, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting
Thu 07/26 11:12 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (THOMPSON, THOMAS) |
|
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Thu 07/26 10:28 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed re:4 Initial Scheduling Order. The deadline for filing the Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Report has expired. No Report has been filed. (cle) |
||
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 07/13 8:32 AM
Reset Deadline re:4 Initial Scheduling Order: Joint Status Report due by 8/10/2018 . (ckm) |
||
Thursday, June 21, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/21 9:05 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM JAMES ELLIS on behalf of YOLANDA BONDS (ELLIS, ADAM) |
|
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 06/19 3:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MALLORY R BENNETT on behalf of FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH (BENNETT, MALLORY) |
|
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 06/19 8:15 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH. (THOMPSON, THOMAS) |
|
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 06/11 12:59 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER (Discovery due by 10/9/2018 . Joint Status Report due by 7/11/2018 . Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/25/2018 . Dispositive Motions to be filed by 10/30/2018 .) Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/11/2018. (ckm) |
|
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 06/08 3:29 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (THOMPSON, THOMAS) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Fri 06/08 3:26 PM
NOTICE of Filing by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH re1 Notice of Removal (THOMPSON, THOMAS) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 06/08 3:11 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH from Second Judicial Circuit, case number 2018-CA-663. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4200423.), filed by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH. (THOMPSON, THOMAS) |